This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:14:22 (UTC).

Caspar et al v. Snyder et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2014 Caspar filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Snyder. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-11499

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glenna DeJong

Frank Colasonti, Jr.

Kelly Callison

Samantha Wolf

Jared Haddock

Keith Orr

Martha Rutledge

James Barclay Ryder

Bryan Reamer

Anne Callison

Clint McCormack

Marsha Caspar

Martin Contreras

Carrie Miller

Defendants

Rick Snyder

James Haveman

Maura Corrigan

Phil Stoddard

Not Classified By Court

Shayla Blankenship

Erin Dawn Blankenship

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew A. Nickelhoff

Attorney at Sachs Waldman

2211 E. Jefferson Ave., Ste. 200

Detroit, MI 48207

Daniel S. Korobkin

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan

2966 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48201

John A. Knight

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

180 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60601

Jay Kaplan

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Fund of Michigan

2966 Woodward Ave.

Detroit, MI 48201

Michael J. Steinberg

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Fund of Michigan

2966 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48201

Julian Davis Mortenson

Attorney at Michigan Law School

625 South State Street

Ann Arbor, MI 48109

Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan

2966 Woodward Avenue

Detroit, MI 48201

Defendant Attorneys

Michael F. Murphy

Attorney at MI Dept of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30754

Lansing, MI 48909

Christina M. Grossi

Attorney at Michigan Dept of Attorney General

525 West Ottawa, P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

Joshua O. Booth

Attorney at State of Michigan

P.O. Box 30754

Lansing, MI 48909

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Alec S. Gibbs

Attorney at Law Offices of Gregory T. Gibbs

717 S. Grand Traverse

Flint, MI 48502

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Davis Mortenson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mortenson, Julian) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Merriweather-Tucker, Brooke) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#38

(#38) REPLY to Response re 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by All Defendants. (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Haveman served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John A. Knight appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Knight, John) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#41

(#41) NOTICE by Erin Dawn Blankenship, Shayla Blankenship re 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 28 Notice (Other) (Gibbs, Alec) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

#43

(#43) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 42 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Maura Corrigan, James Haveman, Rick Snyder, Phil Stoddard. (Booth, Joshua) (Entered: 11/14/2014)

#40

(#40) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Phil Stoddard served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

#42

(#42) ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING as to 27 Defendants' MOTION to Consolidate Cases; 17 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; 21 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss; 20 Defendants' MOTION to Stay: (Defendant's briefs due by 12/14/2014; Plaintiffs' briefs due by 12/21/2014). (Refer to image for additional details). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

#45

(#45) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Factual Development (Nickelhoff, Andrew) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#44

(#44) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 42 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Snyder issues statement, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Evans v. Utah - Stipulated Dismissal Order) (Nickelhoff, Andrew) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Nickelhoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nickelhoff, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Korobkin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Korobkin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#46

(#46) OPINION and ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For A Preliminary Injunction 17 , And (2) Denying Defendants' Motions For A Stay 20 , To Dismiss 21 , And To Consolidate Cases 27 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4593819 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Multiple Counties - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): E.D. Mich., 12-cv-10285, Judge Friedman] (Kaplan, Jay) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) OPINION and ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For A Preliminary Injunction 17 , And (2) Denying Defendants' Motions For A Stay 20 , To Dismiss 21 , And To Consolidate Cases 27 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Factual Development (Nickelhoff, Andrew) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 42 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Snyder issues statement, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Evans v. Utah - Stipulated Dismissal Order) (Nickelhoff, Andrew) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 42 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Maura Corrigan, James Haveman, Rick Snyder, Phil Stoddard. (Booth, Joshua) (Entered: 11/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING as to 27 Defendants' MOTION to Consolidate Cases; 17 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; 21 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss; 20 Defendants' MOTION to Stay: (Defendant's briefs due by 12/14/2014; Plaintiffs' briefs due by 12/21/2014). (Refer to image for additional details). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE by Erin Dawn Blankenship, Shayla Blankenship re 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 28 Notice (Other) (Gibbs, Alec) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Davis Mortenson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mortenson, Julian) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) REPLY to Response re 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by All Defendants. (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE OF HEARING on 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 21 MOTION to Dismiss , 20 MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2014 @ 9:30 AM **LOCATION: FLINT, MICHIGAN** before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Goltz, D) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Maura Corrigan served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Haveman served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Phil Stoddard served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Nickelhoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nickelhoff, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John A. Knight appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Knight, John) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 04/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Merriweather-Tucker, Brooke) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Korobkin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Korobkin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4593819 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Multiple Counties - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): E.D. Mich., 12-cv-10285, Judge Friedman] (Kaplan, Jay) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.