This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:24:35 (UTC).

Carr et al v. BP Corporation North America et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2015 Carr filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BP Corporation North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-03121

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Carr

Defendants

Goulds Pumps, Incorporated

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP

Dover Corporation

Ingersoll Rand Corporation

ExxonMobil Corporation

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Sterling Fluid Systems USA, Inc.

Viking Pump, Inc.

Sulzer Pumps USA, Inc.

Montello, Inc.

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Pentair Pump Group, Inc.

BP Corporation North America

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Roper Pump Company

Weir Minerals North America

Marathon Oil Company

Sawyer Drilling & Service, LLC

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Donna M. Young

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker &Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kathleen F. Drew

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Shelley K. Napolitano

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson, LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

Ebony Shadae Morris

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson, LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

Joseph Benjamin Morton, III

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson, LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

James McClendon Williams

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Ellis,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLP

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Stacey Leigh Strain

Attorney at Hubbard, Mitchell, Williams & Strain, PLLC

1062 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 222

Ridgeland, MS 39157

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner & Richeson, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Perrey S. Lee

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner & Richeson, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner & Richeson, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner & Richeson, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Beverly Klundt Baudouin

Attorney at Baldwin, Haspel, Burke & Mayer, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163-2200

David Louis Carrigee

Attorney at Baldwin, Haspel, Burke & Mayer, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163-2200

Forrest Ren Wilkes

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 1530

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tim Gray

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Kurtz LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Other Attorneys

Christopher Matthew Hannan

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.

Attorney at Kean Miller (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Gregory M. Anding

Attorney at Kean Miller (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Barrye Panepinto Miyagi

Attorney at Kean Miller (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Notice of Compliance by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. re 3 Order, 1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit C-3, # 6 Exhibit C-4, # 7 Exhibit C-5, # 8 Exhibit C-6, # 9 Exhibit C-7, # 10 Exhibit D)(Viator, John) Modified to correct text on 8/14/2015 (cms). (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#2

(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Guidry, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#31

(#31) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ExxonMobil Corporation (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#9

(#9) Notice of Compliance by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 ANSWER filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. in state court)(Elam, Jason) Modified on 9/4/2015 (jrc). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#6

(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 5 Amendment/Supplement to Document; Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance which is found under Other Filings/Notices. Clerk took corrective action. (cms) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#38

(#38) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Murphy Exploration and Production Company-USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Emmett, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (NEF: MBN, bwn)(gec) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#8

(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sunoco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc., Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. for Sunoco, Inc. (Anding, Gregory) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, case number 2013-10569 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4959686) filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)Attorney John Allain Viator added to party Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.(pty:dft).(Viator, John) Modified text on 7/31/2015 (cms). (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#7

(#7) Notice of Compliance by Sunoco, Inc.. (Anding, Gregory) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#39

(#39) ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss MurphyExploration & Production Company-USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#34

(#34) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Shelley K. Napolitano by Ingersoll Rand Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Joseph) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#32

(#32) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2016 2:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 10/24/2016 9:00 AM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form, # 2 Standing Order)(jrc) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#36

(#36) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/25/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B)(Viator, John) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#37

(#37) STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs, ExxonMobil Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Marathon Oil Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&B), Ingersoll Rand Company, Union Carbide Company, Montello, Inc., Chevron Oronite Company (Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Texaco Inc.), and Goulds Pumps, Inc. by ExxonMobil Corporation (Viator, John) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#3

(#3) Directive of the Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re 1 Notice of Removal.(cms) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#33

(#33) Notice of Compliance by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Exceptions and Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages (State Court))(Viator, John) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#35

(#35) ORDER granting 34 Motion to Enroll additional counsel Shelley K. Napolitano for Ingersoll Rand Corporation. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER granting 38 Motion to Dismiss MurphyExploration & Production Company-USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Murphy Exploration and Production Company-USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Emmett, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs, ExxonMobil Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Marathon Oil Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&B), Ingersoll Rand Company, Union Carbide Company, Montello, Inc., Chevron Oronite Company (Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Texaco Inc.), and Goulds Pumps, Inc. by ExxonMobil Corporation (Viator, John) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/25/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B)(Viator, John) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER granting 34 Motion to Enroll additional counsel Shelley K. Napolitano for Ingersoll Rand Corporation. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Shelley K. Napolitano by Ingersoll Rand Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Joseph) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Notice of Compliance by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Exceptions and Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages (State Court))(Viator, John) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2016 2:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 10/24/2016 9:00 AM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form, # 2 Standing Order)(jrc) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ExxonMobil Corporation (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2015 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings inc., Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Elam, Jason) Modified to corporate parents on 9/4/2015 (cms). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Compliance by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 ANSWER filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. in state court)(Elam, Jason) Modified on 9/4/2015 (jrc). (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sunoco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc., Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. for Sunoco, Inc. (Anding, Gregory) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Compliance by Sunoco, Inc.. (Anding, Gregory) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 5 Amendment/Supplement to Document; Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance which is found under Other Filings/Notices. Clerk took corrective action. (cms) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Compliance by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. re 3 Order, 1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit C-3, # 6 Exhibit C-4, # 7 Exhibit C-5, # 8 Exhibit C-6, # 9 Exhibit C-7, # 10 Exhibit D)(Viator, John) Modified to correct text on 8/14/2015 (cms). (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (NEF: MBN, bwn)(gec) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Directive of the Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re 1 Notice of Removal.(cms) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Guidry, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, case number 2013-10569 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4959686) filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)Attorney John Allain Viator added to party Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.(pty:dft).(Viator, John) Modified text on 7/31/2015 (cms). (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.