This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2016 at 18:54:22 (UTC).

Carpenter v. Cruz et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2014 Carpenter filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Cruz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Judith C. Herrera and Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Judith C. Herrera

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelli Carpenter

Defendants

Victor Cruz

Mimbres Memorial Hospital

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Turner W. Branch

Attorney at Branch Law Firm

2025 Rio Grande Blvd, Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87104

Adam T. Funk

Attorney at Branch Law Firm

2025 Rio Grande Blvd., Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87104

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence A VandenBout

Attorney at Madison & Mroz, P.A.

P.O. Box 25467

Albuquerque, NM 87125-5467

Jacqueline A Olexy

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service by Mimbres Memorial Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corporate Information, # 2 Exhibit B - Complaint in State Court, # 3 Exhibit C - Answer in State Court, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice in State Court, # 5 Exhibit E - Order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in State Court)(Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Victor Cruz, Mimbers Memorial Hospital ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kelli Carpenter.(Branch, Turner) (Entered: 01/22/2014)

#3

(#3) FILED IN ERROR: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - Mimbres Memorial Hospital Acknowledgement filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified on 3/5/2014, Incorrect event used. (iad). (Entered: 03/04/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline A Olexy on behalf of Mimbres Memorial Hospital (Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#5

(#5) FILED IN ERROR: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - Victor Cruz, M.D. Acknowledgement filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified on 3/5/2014, Incorrect event used (iad). (Entered: 03/04/2014)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Mimbres Memorial Hospital re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Mimbres Memorial Hospital (Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (mjr). (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelli Carpenter. Mimbres Memorial Hospital served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Branch, Turner) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelli Carpenter. Victor Cruz served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/6/2014. (Branch, Turner) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#4

(#4) FILED IN ERROR: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - Mimbres Memorial Hospital Acknowledgement filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified on 3/5/2014, Incorrect event used. (iad). (Entered: 03/04/2014)

#10

(#10) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A VandenBout on behalf of Mimbres Memorial Hospital (VandenBout, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

#2

(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bap) (Entered: 01/22/2014)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Mimbres Memorial Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Mimbres Memorial Hospital re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Mimbres Memorial Hospital (Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Mimbres Memorial Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (mjr). (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A VandenBout on behalf of Mimbres Memorial Hospital (VandenBout, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service by Mimbres Memorial Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corporate Information, # 2 Exhibit B - Complaint in State Court, # 3 Exhibit C - Answer in State Court, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice in State Court, # 5 Exhibit E - Order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in State Court)(Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline A Olexy on behalf of Mimbres Memorial Hospital (Olexy, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelli Carpenter. Victor Cruz served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/6/2014. (Branch, Turner) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelli Carpenter. Mimbres Memorial Hospital served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Branch, Turner) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILED IN ERROR: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - Victor Cruz, M.D. Acknowledgement filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified on 3/5/2014, Incorrect event used (iad). (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILED IN ERROR: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - Mimbres Memorial Hospital Acknowledgement filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified on 3/5/2014, Incorrect event used. (iad). (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILED IN ERROR: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - Mimbres Memorial Hospital Acknowledgement filed by Kelli Carpenter. (Branch, Turner) Modified on 3/5/2014, Incorrect event used. (iad). (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bap) (Entered: 01/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Victor Cruz, Mimbers Memorial Hospital ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kelli Carpenter.(Branch, Turner) (Entered: 01/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.