This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:53:03 (UTC).

CARCANO et al v. MCCRORY, et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2016 CARCANO filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against MCCRORY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Judge

JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER

Referral Judge

MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H.S.

KELLY TRENT

ANGELA GILMORE

PAYTON GREY MCGARRY

EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA

JOAQUIN CARCANO

H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA

BEVERLY NEWELL

Defendants

UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA

PATRICK MCCRORY

BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE

ROY A. COOPER, III

W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR.

BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUKE C PLATZER

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLC

1099 New York Avenue, Nw Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

PAUL M SMITH

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLC

1099 New York Avenue, Nw Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA

CHASE B. STRANGIO

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad St., 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004-2400

ELIZABETH O. GILL

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO

Attorney at LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCAITON FUND, INC.

105 W. Adams St.

Chicago, IL 60603

PETER C. RENN

Attorney at LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC.

4221 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 280

Los Angeles, CA 90010

TARA L. BORELLI

Attorney at LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC.

730 Peachtree St., Ne, Ste. 1070

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA (BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA (BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TARA L. BORELLI on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (BORELLI, TARA) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH O. GILL on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (GILL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PETER C. RENN on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (RENN, PETER) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (PALAZZOLO, KYLE) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHASE B. STRANGIO on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (STRANGIO, CHASE) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, PATRICK MCCRORY, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, filed by ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER, KELLY TRENT, BEVERLY NEWELL.(BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL M SMITH on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, ANGELA GILMORE, H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, BEVERLY NEWELL, KELLY TRENT (SMITH, PAUL) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LUKE C PLATZER on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, ANGELA GILMORE, H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, BEVERLY NEWELL, KELLY TRENT (PLATZER, LUKE) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LUKE C PLATZER on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, ANGELA GILMORE, H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, BEVERLY NEWELL, KELLY TRENT (PLATZER, LUKE) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL M SMITH on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, ANGELA GILMORE, H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, BEVERLY NEWELL, KELLY TRENT (SMITH, PAUL) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, PATRICK MCCRORY, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, filed by ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, H.S., by her next friend and mother, KATHRYN SCHAFER, KELLY TRENT, BEVERLY NEWELL.(BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHASE B. STRANGIO on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (STRANGIO, CHASE) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (PALAZZOLO, KYLE) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PETER C. RENN on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (RENN, PETER) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH O. GILL on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (GILL, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TARA L. BORELLI on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY (BORELLI, TARA) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA (BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA (BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, THE, ROY A. COOPER, III, PATRICK MCCRORY, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1882104.), filed by ANGELA GILMORE, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BROOK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT GREENSBORO is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION is a litigant