This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 07:18:40 (UTC).

Capitol Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2014 Capitol Body Shop, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are T. B. Smith and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-06000

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

T. B. Smith

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crystal Car Care, Inc.

Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc.

Alexander Body Shop, LLC

B & W Body Shop, Inc.

Patriot Auto Body, LLC

Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc.

Clinton Body Shop, Inc.

Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc.

Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc.

Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc.

Capitol Body Shop, Inc.

Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc.

Defendants

Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi

Allstate Property and Casualty Company

Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

Progressive Gulf Insurance Company

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Geico Indemnity Company

United Services Automobile Association

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Arthur Eaves, Jr.

Attorney at Eaves Law Firm, LLC

101 North State Street

Jackson, MS 39201

William R. Sevier

Attorney at John Arthur Eaves, Attorneys at Law

101 N. State St.

Jackson, MS 39201-2811

Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.

Attorney at Dockins Turnage & Banks PLLC

6520 Dogwood View Pkwy

Jackson, MS 39213

Defendant Attorneys

Walker Reece Gibson

Attorney at Copeland, Cook, Taylor & Bush, PA

Suite 100, 1076 Highland Colony Pkwy

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Charles G. Copeland

Attorney at Copeland, Cook, Taylor & Bush, PA

Suite 100, 1076 Highland Colony Pkwy

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Richard L. Fenton

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 S Wacker Dr Ste 5900

Chicago, IL 60606-6361

Johanna W. Clark

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

200 S. Orange Ave., Ste 100

Orlando, FL 32801

William C. Griffin

Attorney at Currie, Johnson, Griffin & Myers, PA

P. O. Box 750, 1044 River Oaks Drive (39232)

Jackson, MS 39205-0750

Mark L. Hanover

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 S Wacker Dr Ste 5900

Chicago, IL 60606-6361

Christine A. Hopkinson

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Michael R. Nelson

Attorney at Nelson Law, LLC

200 Park Ave., Suite 1700

New York, NY 10166

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Claire Carothers Oates

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Amelia W. Koch

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Suite 3600, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

Steven F. Griffith, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Suite 3600, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jamie L. Halavais

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP

201 E Washington St

Phoenix, AZ 85015

Other Attorneys

Michael Beekhuizen

Attorney at Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP

280 N High St

Columbus, OH 43215

Emerson Barney Robinson, III

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Michael L. McCluggage

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

Suite 1100, 224 S Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60604

Michael P. Kenny

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

One Atlantic Center Ste 4900, 1201 W Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

38 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#143

#142

#141

#140

#139

#138

#136

#134

#132

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - 1963 Consent Decree

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - List of Procedures & Processes short paid/not paid

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Farm's Dashboard/Scorecard

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Company Market Share Report - 2012

#1

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) REPORT to the Court by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Nelson, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2020 (RDO). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) ORDER directing the Progressive defendants, AutoWorks Collision Specialist, LLP, and Walkers Collision Center, Inc. to confer and advise the Court by July 2, 2020, how they would like to proceed toward a final resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/18/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) MANDATE of USCA as to #132 Notice of Appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 06/17/2020 USCA number: 16-13596. VACATE in part; AFFIRM in part; VACATE and REMAND in part (see order for details). (ALL) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) OPINION of USCA as to #132 Notice of appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc.. EOD: 03/06/2020; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 16-13596. AFFIRM in part; VACATE in part; VACATE and REMAND in part (see order for details). (ALL) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) MANDATE of USCA as to Porter's Auto Body Service, Inc. ONLY re #132 Notice of appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 04/27/2018; USCA number: 16-13596. DISMISSED AS TO PORTER'S BODY SHOP, INC. ONLY. (ALL) Modified on 8/19/2019 (LAM). (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #132 Notice of appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 16-13596-AA (RDO) (Entered: 09/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) REPLY to Response to Motion re #136 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc.. (Fry, Allison) (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) RESPONSE to Motion re #136 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Response in Opposition to Motion to Reconsider filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Goldfine, Dan) (Entered: 08/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc.. (Fry, Allison) (Entered: 07/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) MOTION for Attorney Fees/Specific Fee Request by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Goldfine, Dan) Text modified on 8/1/2016 (RDO). (Entered: 07/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson H. Ables, III on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/14/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 05/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Reissued as to Defendants in re #3 Amended Complaint. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 05/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Barry Lewis, Alexander Body Shop, LLC as to All Defendants. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 05/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ellie F. Turnage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turnage, Ellie) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 03/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Halbert E. Dockins, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dockins, Halbert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 03/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Barry Lewis, Crystal Car Care, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 03/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, and United Services Automobile Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643025398), filed by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Barry Lewis, and Alexander Body Shop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Company Market Share Report - 2012, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Farm's Dashboard/Scorecard, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Procedures & Processes short paid/not paid, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1963 Consent Decree, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crystal Car Care, Inc. is a litigant