This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:55:06 (UTC).

CAO Group v. Magpie Tech

Case Summary

On 09/28/2015 CAO Group filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Magpie Tech. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Dale A. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00697

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Dale A. Kimball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CAO Group

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Magpie Tech

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

H. Dickson Burton

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

J. Jeffrey Gunn

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

Stephen E. Pulley

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

J. Ryan Mitchell

Attorney at MITCHELL BARLOW & MANSFIELD PC

9 Exchange Pl Ste 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Michael L. Meeks

Attorney at BUCHALTER NEMER PC

18400 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 82612

Wesley D. Felix

Attorney at MITCHELL BARLOW & MANSFIELD PC

9 Exchange Pl Ste 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

#23

#24

#25

#26

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(jds) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Patent Case Scheduling Order Regarding E-Discovery)(Burton, H.) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edgar R. Cataxinos withdrawn from case for Plaintiff, Counter Defendant. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/25/2015. (jwt) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to 14 Counterclaim filed by CAO Group.(Burton, H.) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff CAO Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent for Withdrawal by CAO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cataxinos, Edgar) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by H. Dickson Burton on behalf of CAO Group (Burton, H.) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.htmlIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2015 at 10:30 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (jlw) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Magpie Tech. (las) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Ryan Mitchell on behalf of Magpie Tech (Mitchell, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley D. Felix on behalf of Magpie Tech (Felix, Wesley) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant(s) shall answer or respond to the complaint on or before November 4, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/26/2015. No attached document. (dla) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff CAO Group identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Cataxinos, Edgar) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Acceptance of Service by CAO Group re 2 Complaint, (Cataxinos, Edgar) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff CAO Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cataxinos, Edgar) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Magpie Tech. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mms) (Entered: 09/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Magpie Tech (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2349654), filed by CAO Group. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet attached, # 2 Exhibit A - US Patent 6755648, # 3 Exhibit B - US Patent 6783362, # 4 Exhibit C - US Patent 6926524, # 5 Exhibit D - US Patent 6971875) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Cataxinos, Edgar) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff CAO Group is directed to E-File the complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (eat) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less