This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 07:58:14 (UTC).

Campbell v. Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2014 Campbell filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker Moore LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Ruben Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-10003

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Ruben Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safornia Campbell

Defendants

Portfolio Recovery Associates L.L.C.

Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Matthew H. Hector

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Daniel John McGarry

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Mohammed Omar Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

900 Jorie Boulevard, Suite 150

Oak Brook, IL 60523

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

222 North Lasalle Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601-1081

Avanti Deepak Bakane

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

222 N. Lasalle, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60601

Lindsey A.L. Conley

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

222 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60601

Helen Deborah Arnold

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

David Luther Hartsell

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

Susan E. Groh

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Ste. 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Matthew H. Hector (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First (Sulaiman, Ahmad) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Daniel John McGarry (McGarry, Daniel) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safornia Campbell as to Portfolio Recovery Associates L.L.C. on 12/18/2014, answer due 1/8/2015. (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 1/20/2015 at 9:45 a.m.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safornia Campbell as to Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC on 12/29/2014, answer due 1/19/2015. (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Motion by David Luther Hartsell for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings 28 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/29/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Hartsell, David) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#31

(#31) MOTION by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates L.L.C. to join Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Motion by Lindsey A.L. Conley for presentment of motion to join 31 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/29/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#33

(#33) AGREED Confidentiality Order signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/20/2015. (jh, ) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

#34

(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Motion hearing held on 4/29/2015. Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's motion for leave to join Defendant Blatt's motion for judgment on the pleadings 31 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 28 is due 5/21/2015. Defendants' reply will be due 6/5/2015. The Court will rule by mail. The settlement conference set for 5/6/2015 is stricken.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#35

(#35) MOTION by Defendant Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC for leave to file Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Motion by David Luther Hartsell for presentment of motion for leave to file 35 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/13/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Hartsell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's motion for leave to submit supplemental authority 35 is granted. The motion hearing set for 5/13/2015 is stricken.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#38

(#38) Notice of Supplemental Authority by Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, David) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Notice of Supplemental Authority by Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, David) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's motion for leave to submit supplemental authority 35 is granted. The motion hearing set for 5/13/2015 is stricken.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Motion by David Luther Hartsell for presentment of motion for leave to file 35 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/13/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Hartsell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION by Defendant Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC for leave to file Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Motion hearing held on 4/29/2015. Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's motion for leave to join Defendant Blatt's motion for judgment on the pleadings 31 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 28 is due 5/21/2015. Defendants' reply will be due 6/5/2015. The Court will rule by mail. The settlement conference set for 5/6/2015 is stricken.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) AGREED Confidentiality Order signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/20/2015. (jh, ) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Motion by Lindsey A.L. Conley for presentment of motion to join 31 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/29/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates L.L.C. to join Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Conley, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Motion by David Luther Hartsell for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings 28 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/29/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Hartsell, David) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MEMORANDUM by Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings 28 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Hartsell, David) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates L.L.C. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safornia Campbell as to Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC on 12/29/2014, answer due 1/19/2015. (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 1/20/2015 at 9:45 a.m.Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safornia Campbell as to Portfolio Recovery Associates L.L.C. on 12/18/2014, answer due 1/8/2015. (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Daniel John McGarry (McGarry, Daniel) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First (Sulaiman, Ahmad) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Safornia Campbell by Matthew H. Hector (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Safornia Campbell; Yes. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10151742. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Hector, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.