This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 04:16:52 (UTC).

Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP et al v. The Republic of Argentina

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Republic of Argentina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Thomas P. Griesa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:08-CV-06978

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Thomas P. Griesa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NML Capital, Ltd.

Appellants

Origenes AFJP S.A.

Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.

Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A.

Unidos S.A. AFJP

Consolidar AFJP S.A.

Maxima AFJP S.A.

Garnishee

Banco De La Nacion Argentina

Interested Parties

Deutsche Bank AG New York Branch

Depository Trust Company

Cede & Co.

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Exchange Bondholder Group

Euro Bondholders

Barclays Bank PLC

Bank for International Settlements

CitiGroup Inc.

Citicorp USA Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Citigroup, Inc.

Intervenor

Bank of America, N.A.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Christopher Kirsch

Attorney at Dechert, LLP (NYC)

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6797

David Scott Hoffner

Attorney at Hoffner PLLC

325 Broadway, Suite 505

New York, NY 10007

Jennings F. Durand

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Dennis H. Hranitzky

Attorney at Dechert, LLP (NYC)

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6797

Charles Richard Jacob, III

Attorney at Miller & Wrubel, P.C.

570 Lexington Avenue,25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Matthew Dempsey McGill

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (DC)

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Robert A. Cohen

Attorney at Dechert, LLP (NYC)

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6797

Interested Party Attorneys

Eric P Heichel

Attorney at Eiseman, Levine, Lehrhaupt & Kakoyiannis, P.C.

805 Third Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

David A. Barrett

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP(NYC)

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Steven Ian Froot

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP(NYC)

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jeff G. Hammel

Attorney at Latham and Watkins (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Edward David Sherwin

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

James Loran Kerr

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorneys

Lauren Emily Aguiar

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Kevin Michael Brennan

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler PC (NJ)

65 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

James C. Martin

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

435 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Alexis Helene Castillo

Attorney at Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

500 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Lindsey Taylor Knapp

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Republic of Argentina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11398952)Document filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Fiscal Agency agreement 1994, # 2 Exhibit B- UBS US040114AR16, # 3 Exhibit C- UBS US040114FC91, # 4 Exhibit D- UBS US040114AR16, # 5 Exhibit E- UBS US040114AV28, # 6 Exhibit F- UBS US040114FB19, # 7 Exhibit G- UBS US040114FC91, # 8 Exhibit H- UBS US040114GD65, # 9 Exhibit I- LAW 26017, # 10 Exhibit J- LAW 26547, # 11 Exhibit K- 12-07-11 order granting summary judgment, # 12 Exhibit L- 02-23-12 Order, # 13 Exhibit M- 11-21-12 Amended 02-23-12 Order, # 14 Exhibit N- 09-29-14 Order, # 15 Exhibit O- 10-03-14 Order)(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Anthony J. Costantini, Esq. re: that this action be filed as related to 08-cv-6978. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Republic of Argentina, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Republic of Argentina. (rch) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. The Republic of Argentina served on 9/18/2015, answer due 11/17/2015. Service was accepted by Roberto Barrigjios, authorized agent. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP; Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#61

(#61) ORDER: On March 2, 2016, the court granted the Republic of Argentina's motion to vacate the pari passu injunctions upon the occurrence of two conditions precedent: (1) The Republic repeals all legislative obstacles to settlement with the FAA bondholders, including the Lock Law and the Sovereign Payment Law; (2) For all plaintiffs that entered into agreements in principle with the Republic on or before February 29, 2016, the Republic must make full payment in accordance with the specific terms of each such agreement. The Republic must also notify the court once those plaintiffs have all received full payment. Some plaintiffs appealed that March 2 vacatur order. On April 13, 2016, the Court of Appeals heard oral argument on the appeal and affirmed the vacatur order from the bench. The Court of Appeals then issued a written order, holding that this court did not abuse its discretion in ordering that the injunctions would be vacated upon satisfaction of the two conditions precedent. Aurelius Capital Master, Ltd. v. Republic of Argentina, No. 16-628, sum. order at 21 (2d Cir. Apr. 15, 2016). The Court of Appeals also noted that, at the time the Republic certifies it has satisfied the conditions precedent, this court should "take steps... to determine whether the conditions have indeed been met." Id. The Republic now certifies that it has satisfied the conditions precedent. In support of certification, the Republic submits two sworn declarations. The first is the declaration of Undersecretary of Finance Santiago Bausili, which shows that the Republic has repealed all legislative obstacles to settlement, including the Lock Law and the Sovereign Payment Law. The second is the declaration of Matthew Dukes, Director of Deutsche Bank Securities, which lists the settlement payments made to every plaintiff that entered into an agreement in principle by February 29, 2016. For each payment, the Dukes declaration confirms the plaintiffs name, settlement amount, and Fedwire reference number. Having carefully reviewed the Republic's submissions, the court now finds that the conditions precedent have been met. Accordingly, the injunctions are vacated in all cases. All stipulations of dismissal are to be filed with the court no later than 2:00 p.m. on April 25, 2016. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/22/2016) (tro) (Entered: 04/22/2016)

#60

(#60) LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated April 22, 2016 re: notifying the Court that the Republic has satisfied the two conditions precedent to vacatur of the injunctions pursuant to this Court's March 2, 2016 Opinion and Order. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Santiago Bausili with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Matthew Dukes, # 3 Exhibit to Dukes Declaration)(tro) (Entered: 04/22/2016)

#59

(#59) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Argentina shall identify promptly all series of Exchange Bonds to be paid by BNY Mellon under the Indenture (the "Exchange Bonds Payments"), listing for each series the interest to be paid and the interest per $1000 or euro 1000 (as applicable) principal amount of each series of Exchange Bonds. Upon the fulfillment of the two conditions precedent referenced in the March 2 Order vacating the Injunctions, Argentina is authorized and directed to perform all of its obligations under the Indenture including, without limitation, payment of all fees, expenses and other amounts owed or payable to BNY Mellon thereunder. Upon determination by this Court that the two conditions precedent referenced in the March 2 Order have been met and receipt of the information set forth in the preceding paragraph, BNY Mellon is authorized and directed to distribute amounts received from Argentina, including, without limitation, the funds which Argentina transferred into BNY Mellon's accounts at Banco Central de la Republica Argentina on June 26, 2014, in accordance with the Indenture. The record date for purposes of such payments shall be the fifth Business Day (as defined in the Indenture) after this Court determines that the two conditions precedent referenced in the March 2 Order have been met and the payment date of such amounts shall be no later than 15 days following such record date, as Argentina shall instruct BNY Mellon with no less than three Business Days written notice, and payments shall be made to Holders (as defined in the Indenture) of record as of the close of business on the record date. In accordance with the Indenture, such payments shall be prefunded by 1:00 p.m. local time on the Business Day (as defined in the Indenture) prior to the Payment Date. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/19/2016) (kl) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

#58

(#58) LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated April 19, 2016 re: requesting that the Court issue the Proposed Order attached hereto as Exhibit A. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Proposed Order)(Paskin, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

#57

(#57) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. USCA Case Number 16-0628(L). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the opinion and Order of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/15/2016. (nd) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

#56

(#56) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. USCA Case Number 16-0628(L). On April 13, 2016, the Court heard oral argument in this consolidated expedited appeal taken from an order of the district court entered March 2, 2016. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the order of the district court is affirmed. A further order will follow in due course. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 04/14/2016. (nd) (Entered: 04/14/2016)

#55

(#55) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. USCA Case Number 16-690. Appellants move to stay enforcement of the District Court's March 2, 2016 order pending resolution of the above-captioned appeals. Appellees consent to the motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 03/11/2016. (nd) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#54

(#54) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 39 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-12032052. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#53

(#53) OPINION AND ORDER: The court appreciates the arguments presented by all parties who spoke at yesterday's hearing. And the court does not take lightly the decision to lift the injunctions. But, ultimately, circumstances have changed so significantly as to render the injunctions inequitable and detrimental to the public interest. For the reasons outlined in the Indicative Ruling and this order, the court grants the Republic's motions to vacate the injunctions in all actions upon the occurrence of the two conditions precedent: (1) The Republic repeals all legislative obstacles to settlement with the FAA bondholders, including the Lock Law and the Sovereign Payment Law; (2) For all plaintiffs that entered into agreements in principle with the Republic on or before February 29, 2016, the Republic must make full payment in accordance with the specific terms of each such agreement. The Republic must also notify the court once those plaintiffs have all received full payment. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/2/2016) (Attachments: # 1 RULE 62.1 INDICATIVE RULING)(kl) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER: On March 2, 2016, the court granted the Republic of Argentina's motion to vacate the pari passu injunctions upon the occurrence of two conditions precedent: (1) The Republic repeals all legislative obstacles to settlement with the FAA bondholders, including the Lock Law and the Sovereign Payment Law; (2) For all plaintiffs that entered into agreements in principle with the Republic on or before February 29, 2016, the Republic must make full payment in accordance with the specific terms of each such agreement. The Republic must also notify the court once those plaintiffs have all received full payment. Some plaintiffs appealed that March 2 vacatur order. On April 13, 2016, the Court of Appeals heard oral argument on the appeal and affirmed the vacatur order from the bench. The Court of Appeals then issued a written order, holding that this court did not abuse its discretion in ordering that the injunctions would be vacated upon satisfaction of the two conditions precedent. Aurelius Capital Master, Ltd. v. Republic of Argentina, No. 16-628, sum. order at 21 (2d Cir. Apr. 15, 2016). The Court of Appeals also noted that, at the time the Republic certifies it has satisfied the conditions precedent, this court should "take steps... to determine whether the conditions have indeed been met." Id. The Republic now certifies that it has satisfied the conditions precedent. In support of certification, the Republic submits two sworn declarations. The first is the declaration of Undersecretary of Finance Santiago Bausili, which shows that the Republic has repealed all legislative obstacles to settlement, including the Lock Law and the Sovereign Payment Law. The second is the declaration of Matthew Dukes, Director of Deutsche Bank Securities, which lists the settlement payments made to every plaintiff that entered into an agreement in principle by February 29, 2016. For each payment, the Dukes declaration confirms the plaintiffs name, settlement amount, and Fedwire reference number. Having carefully reviewed the Republic's submissions, the court now finds that the conditions precedent have been met. Accordingly, the injunctions are vacated in all cases. All stipulations of dismissal are to be filed with the court no later than 2:00 p.m. on April 25, 2016. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/22/2016) (tro) (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated April 22, 2016 re: notifying the Court that the Republic has satisfied the two conditions precedent to vacatur of the injunctions pursuant to this Court's March 2, 2016 Opinion and Order. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Santiago Bausili with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Matthew Dukes, # 3 Exhibit to Dukes Declaration)(tro) (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Argentina shall identify promptly all series of Exchange Bonds to be paid by BNY Mellon under the Indenture (the "Exchange Bonds Payments"), listing for each series the interest to be paid and the interest per $1000 or euro 1000 (as applicable) principal amount of each series of Exchange Bonds. Upon the fulfillment of the two conditions precedent referenced in the March 2 Order vacating the Injunctions, Argentina is authorized and directed to perform all of its obligations under the Indenture including, without limitation, payment of all fees, expenses and other amounts owed or payable to BNY Mellon thereunder. Upon determination by this Court that the two conditions precedent referenced in the March 2 Order have been met and receipt of the information set forth in the preceding paragraph, BNY Mellon is authorized and directed to distribute amounts received from Argentina, including, without limitation, the funds which Argentina transferred into BNY Mellon's accounts at Banco Central de la Republica Argentina on June 26, 2014, in accordance with the Indenture. The record date for purposes of such payments shall be the fifth Business Day (as defined in the Indenture) after this Court determines that the two conditions precedent referenced in the March 2 Order have been met and the payment date of such amounts shall be no later than 15 days following such record date, as Argentina shall instruct BNY Mellon with no less than three Business Days written notice, and payments shall be made to Holders (as defined in the Indenture) of record as of the close of business on the record date. In accordance with the Indenture, such payments shall be prefunded by 1:00 p.m. local time on the Business Day (as defined in the Indenture) prior to the Payment Date. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/19/2016) (kl) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated April 19, 2016 re: requesting that the Court issue the Proposed Order attached hereto as Exhibit A. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Proposed Order)(Paskin, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. USCA Case Number 16-0628(L). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the opinion and Order of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/15/2016. (nd) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. USCA Case Number 16-0628(L). On April 13, 2016, the Court heard oral argument in this consolidated expedited appeal taken from an order of the district court entered March 2, 2016. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the order of the district court is affirmed. A further order will follow in due course. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 04/14/2016. (nd) (Entered: 04/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 54 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. USCA Case Number 16-690. Appellants move to stay enforcement of the District Court's March 2, 2016 order pending resolution of the above-captioned appeals. Appellees consent to the motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 03/11/2016. (nd) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 39 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-12032052. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) OPINION AND ORDER: The court appreciates the arguments presented by all parties who spoke at yesterday's hearing. And the court does not take lightly the decision to lift the injunctions. But, ultimately, circumstances have changed so significantly as to render the injunctions inequitable and detrimental to the public interest. For the reasons outlined in the Indicative Ruling and this order, the court grants the Republic's motions to vacate the injunctions in all actions upon the occurrence of the two conditions precedent: (1) The Republic repeals all legislative obstacles to settlement with the FAA bondholders, including the Lock Law and the Sovereign Payment Law; (2) For all plaintiffs that entered into agreements in principle with the Republic on or before February 29, 2016, the Republic must make full payment in accordance with the specific terms of each such agreement. The Republic must also notify the court once those plaintiffs have all received full payment. (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/2/2016) (Attachments: # 1 RULE 62.1 INDICATIVE RULING)(kl) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael A. Paskin dated 02/29/2016 re: enclosing Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant the Republic of Argentina's Motion for the Entry of Final Orders Conditionally Lifting the Pari Passu Injunctions. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hernandez, Damaris) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLARATION of Anthony J. Costantini, Esq. in Support re: 9 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Position and P & L Report)(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. The Republic of Argentina served on 9/18/2015, answer due 11/17/2015. Service was accepted by Roberto Barrigjios, authorized agent. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP; Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Republic of Argentina. (rch) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Republic of Argentina, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Anthony J. Costantini, Esq. re: that this action be filed as related to 08-cv-6978. Document filed by Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP.(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Republic of Argentina. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11398952)Document filed by Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Fiscal Agency agreement 1994, # 2 Exhibit B- UBS US040114AR16, # 3 Exhibit C- UBS US040114FC91, # 4 Exhibit D- UBS US040114AR16, # 5 Exhibit E- UBS US040114AV28, # 6 Exhibit F- UBS US040114FB19, # 7 Exhibit G- UBS US040114FC91, # 8 Exhibit H- UBS US040114GD65, # 9 Exhibit I- LAW 26017, # 10 Exhibit J- LAW 26547, # 11 Exhibit K- 12-07-11 order granting summary judgment, # 12 Exhibit L- 02-23-12 Order, # 13 Exhibit M- 11-21-12 Amended 02-23-12 Order, # 14 Exhibit N- 09-29-14 Order, # 15 Exhibit O- 10-03-14 Order)(Costantini, Anthony) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.