This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 00:45:48 (UTC).

Burris v. The Sherwin-Williams Company

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Burris filed an Other lawsuit against The Sherwin-Williams Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Dean Whipple. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-00343

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Dean Whipple

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wade Burris

Defendant

The Sherwin-Williams Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell L. Burgess

Attorney at Burgess & Lamb PC

1000 Broadway, Ste. 400

Kansas City, MO 64105

Ralph K. Phalen

Attorney at Ralph K. Phalen, Attorney At Law

1000 Broadway, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64105

Blake P. Green

Attorney at BG Law

1600 Genessee Street, Suite 350

Kansas City, MO 64102

Phyllis Norman

Attorney at The Norman Law Firm LLC

1000 Broadway, 4Th Floor

Kansas City, MO 64105

Defendant Attorneys

Eric C Bosset

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Paul Croker

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1516-CV06036, filed by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-4378004. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1--Class Action Petition, # 2 Exhibit 2--Summons, # 3 Exhibit 3--Affidavit of Service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Paul Croker on behalf of Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company.(Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#5

(#5) Rule 16 Notice. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/7/2015. Signed on 05/08/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Notice of Removal, re Plaintiff's Class Action Petition filed by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/1/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER - The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 6 ) is GRANTED. Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before June 15, 2015. Signed on 05/13/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

#8

(#8) MOTION WITHDRAWN PER TEXT ENTRY ONLY ORDER 15 FILED 6/16/15 MOTION to certify class filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Wade Burris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/8/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burgess, Mitchell) Modified on 6/16/2015 (Carr, Lori). (Entered: 05/20/2015)

#9

(#9) SUGGESTIONS in support re 8 MOTION to certify class filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Plaintiff Wade Burris. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

#28

(#28) JUDGMENT AND ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING A CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. Signed on 2/23/16 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#27

(#27) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Dean Whipple: FAIRNESS HEARING held on 2/23/2016. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Barbara Barnard, 816-512-5622. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#26

(#26) MOTION for order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Wade Burris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/26/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit)(Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING set for 2/23/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8B, Kansas City, before District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

#24

(#24) ORDER - The Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Approval of Notice Plan, and Setting a Final Fairness Hearing (Doc. 23 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 11/17/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

#23

(#23) Consent MOTION for order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Wade Burris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Notice, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING and TRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/17/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8B, Kansas City, before District Judge Dean Whipple. Signed on 08/21/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Attachments: # 1 pretrial memo) (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#21

(#21) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Wade Burris. (Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#20

(#20) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) JUDGMENT AND ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING A CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. Signed on 2/23/16 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Dean Whipple: FAIRNESS HEARING held on 2/23/2016. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Barbara Barnard, 816-512-5622. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Wade Burris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/26/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit)(Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING set for 2/23/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8B, Kansas City, before District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER - The Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Approval of Notice Plan, and Setting a Final Fairness Hearing (Doc. 23 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 11/17/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Consent MOTION for order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Wade Burris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Notice, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SCHEDULING and TRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/17/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8B, Kansas City, before District Judge Dean Whipple. Signed on 08/21/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Attachments: # 1 pretrial memo) (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Wade Burris. (Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER - Defendants Motion to Set Aside Order Permitting the Withdrawal without Prejudice of Plaintiffs Motion to Certify or, in the alternative, for Attorneys Fees (Doc. 16 ) is DENIED. Signed on 07/10/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to allow Eric Bosset to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-4408603) filed by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUGGESTIONS in support re 8 MOTION to certify class filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Plaintiff Wade Burris. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Burgess, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION WITHDRAWN PER TEXT ENTRY ONLY ORDER 15 FILED 6/16/15 MOTION to certify class filed by Mitchell L. Burgess on behalf of Wade Burris. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/8/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burgess, Mitchell) Modified on 6/16/2015 (Carr, Lori). (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER - The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 6 ) is GRANTED. Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before June 15, 2015. Signed on 05/13/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Notice of Removal, re Plaintiff's Class Action Petition filed by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/1/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Rule 16 Notice. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/7/2015. Signed on 05/08/2015 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Paul Croker on behalf of Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company.(Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of appearance by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company (Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1516-CV06036, filed by Paul Croker on behalf of The Sherwin-Williams Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-4378004. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1--Class Action Petition, # 2 Exhibit 2--Summons, # 3 Exhibit 3--Affidavit of Service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Croker, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.