This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2016 at 23:16:56 (UTC).

Buffin et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 Buffin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-04959

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Riana Buffin

Crystal Patterson

Defendants

State of California

City and County of San Francisco

Intervenor Defendant

California Bail Agents Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander Karakatsanis

601 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Phil Telfeyan

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

601 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, South Building Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004

Katherine Claire Hubbard

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law

601 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorneys

Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda

Attorney at California State Attorney General's Office

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Jeremy Michael Goldman

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney's Office

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place

San Francisco, CA 94102

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Brandon D. Baum

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group LLC

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Harmeet K. Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9950110.). Filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 1/26/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#2

(#2) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND Preliminary Injunction filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/30/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/30/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson.. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#5

(#5) Case assigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Certify Class filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/12/2015. Replies due by 11/19/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS [DKT. NO. 7] AS HEARING DATE IS LESS THAN 35 DAYS.Counsel is to file a re-notice of motion for 35 days on a Tuesday at 2:00pm before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson re 1 Complaint, (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#53

(#53) RESPONSE Brief regarding the Inapplicability of Younger Abstention filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 1/13/2016) Modified on 1/14/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#52

(#52) Reply Brief Re: Abstention byState of California. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Filed on 1/13/2016) Modified on 1/14/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#51

(#51) REPLY (re 41 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCalifornia Bail Agents Association. (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 1/11/2016) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

#50

(#50) Supplemental Brief regarding the inapplicability of Younger Abstention filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 1/6/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#49

(#49) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: ABSTENTION filed byState of California. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Filed on 1/6/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#48

(#48) ORDER granting re [45-2] MOTION Allow Pro Hac Vice Admission as to Alexander Karakatsanis representing Plaintiffs filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

#47

(#47) RESPONSE (re 41 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 1/4/2016) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#46

(#46) RESPONSE (re 41 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/4/2016) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#45

(#45) MOTION Allow Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Responses due by 1/14/2016. Replies due by 1/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 12/31/2015) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) RESPONSE Brief regarding the Inapplicability of Younger Abstention filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 1/13/2016) Modified on 1/14/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) Reply Brief Re: Abstention byState of California. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Filed on 1/13/2016) Modified on 1/14/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) REPLY (re 41 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCalifornia Bail Agents Association. (Baum, Brandon) (Filed on 1/11/2016) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) Supplemental Brief regarding the inapplicability of Younger Abstention filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 1/6/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: ABSTENTION filed byState of California. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Filed on 1/6/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER granting re [45-2] MOTION Allow Pro Hac Vice Admission as to Alexander Karakatsanis representing Plaintiffs filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) RESPONSE (re 41 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 1/4/2016) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) RESPONSE (re 41 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/4/2016) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION Allow Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Responses due by 1/14/2016. Replies due by 1/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 12/31/2015) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Statement of Non-Opposition to California Bail Agents Association's Motion to Intervene filed byState of California. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (Filed on 12/30/2015) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson re 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson re 1 Complaint, (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS [DKT. NO. 7] AS HEARING DATE IS LESS THAN 35 DAYS.Counsel is to file a re-notice of motion for 35 days on a Tuesday at 2:00pm before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Certify Class filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/12/2015. Replies due by 11/19/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case assigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson.. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND Preliminary Injunction filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/30/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/30/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9950110.). Filed byRiana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 1/26/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less