This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 09:01:29 (UTC).

Buckman Laboratories, Inc. v. Solenis, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2015 Buckman Laboratories, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Solenis, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham and Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02063

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham

Judge

Judge Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Buckman Laboratories, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Solenis Technologies, LP

Solenis, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brett A. Hughes

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON DUNLAP COBB & RYDER

One Commerce Square, Ste. 2700

Memphis, TN 38103

Mary J. Peal

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON L.L.P.

Jesse Joseph Camacho

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

2555 Grand Blvd

Kansas City, MO 64105-2118

Emily Hamm Huseth

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH, PLLC

40 South Main St., Suite 2700

Memphis, TN 38103

Michael F. Rafferty

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON DUNLAP COBB & RYDER

One Commerce Square, Ste. 2700

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.

Attorney at WYATT TARRANT & COMBS

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38120-4367

Matthew Mahoney Lubozynski

Attorney at WYATT, TARRANT & COMBS LLP

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38120

Eleanor G. Tennyson

Attorney at MORRIS NICHOLS ARSHT & TUNNELL LLP

1201 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Rodger D. Smith

Attorney at MORRIS NICHOLS ARSHT & TUNNELL LLP

1201 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeremy A. Tigan

Attorney at MORRIS NICHOLS ARSHT & TUNNELL LLP

1201 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#103

#104

#105

#106

#107

#108

#109

#110

#111

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 Sealed Response to Motion, [Solenis' Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Inequitable Conduct Counts in Buckman's Second Amended Complaint] filed by Solenis Technologies, LP, Solenis, LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) ORDER granting 109 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/25/2016. (McCalla, Jon) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2276768) by Superior Oil Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit New York State Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit USDC Southern District of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit Texas State Certificate of Good Standing)(Zoeller, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) NOTICE by Buckman Laboratories, Inc. Notice of Service of Subpoena on Tharaldson Ethanol (Rafferty, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/23/2016. (McCalla, Jon) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Buckman Laboratories, Inc. by Solenis Technologies, LP, Solenis, LLC.(Vorder-Bruegge, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference set for Monday, 6/6/2016 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (btg) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Motion Hearing re: 85 Motion to Confirm Order of Presentation at Trial & 82 Motion to Amend/Correct 30 Setting Letter, 35 Scheduling Order held on 2/23/2016. Jesse Joseph Camacho, Michael Rafferty, & Mary Peal appearing for the Plaintiff. Rodger Smith, Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr., Eleanor Tennyson, & Jeremy Tigan appearing for the Defense. 85 Motion to Confirm Order of Presentation at Trial heard & taken under advisement, order to be entered. 82 Motion to Amend/Correct heard & granted, order to be entered. Document Discovery due by 3/29/2016. Completion of all Discovery due by 6/3/2016. Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference set for Monday, 6/6/2016 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (Court Reporter: Lynn Dudley) (btg) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) REPLY to Response to Motion re 97 Response in Opposition to Motion to Confirm Order of Presentation at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rafferty, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) ORDER granting 99 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/18/2016. (McCalla, Jon) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buckman Laboratories, Inc. as to Solenis Technologies, LP. (Hughes, Brett) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Solenis Technologies, LP. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Solenis, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Summons by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of Buckman Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Solenis Technologies, L.P., # 2 Summons to Solenis, L.L.C.)(Hughes, Brett) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of Buckman Laboratories, Inc. (Hughes, Brett) (Entered: 01/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (csf) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Correction to 1 Sealed Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Rafferty, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SEALED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2054813), filed by Buckman Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rafferty, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLENIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael F. Rafferty