This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 06:31:02 (UTC).

Brosnan v. Consolidated World Travel Inc

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Brosnan filed an Other lawsuit against Consolidated World Travel Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. William Alsup. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-MC-80131

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Brosnan

El Sobrante, CA 94820

Defendants

Consolidated World Travel Inc

Donna Higgins

Interested Party

Nolan Moran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Robert Ahdoot

Attorney at Ahdoot & Wolfson, P.C.

1016 Palm Avenue

West Hollywood, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Received Document/Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief pursuant to the Telephone Consumer Protect Act, 47 U.S.C. ss227 Et Seq. by John Brown. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#3

No Description Available

2 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice by John Brosnan. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Nolan Moran of MDL Petition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ahdoot, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

3 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#2

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice by John Brosnan. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Nolan Moran of MDL Petition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ahdoot, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED ORDER RE DEFENDANTS PROPOSED LAWSUIT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/8/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS PROPOSED LAWSUIT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/8/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received Document/Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief pursuant to the Telephone Consumer Protect Act, 47 U.S.C. ss227 Et Seq. by John Brown. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.