This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 06:24:57 (UTC).

Bridges v. New Orleans City et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 Bridges filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against New Orleans City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan and Judge Lance M Africk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-04640

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan

Judge

Judge Lance M Africk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katrina Bridges

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Mitchell J. Landrieu

New Orleans City

Michael S. Harrison

New Orleans Police Department

Terrance Saulny

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Terrance Saulny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonique Martin Hall

Attorney at Law Office of Michael J. Hall, LLC

1010 Common Street, Suite 2340

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael Joseph Hall

Attorney at Law Office of Michael J. Hall

365 Canal Street, Suite 1155

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

William Rembert Henry Goforth

Attorney at City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

1300 Perdido Street, 5Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112

Corwin St. Raymond

Attorney at City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

1300 Perdido Street, 5Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112

Wanda Anderson Davis

Attorney at Leefe, Gibbs, Sullivan, Dupre & Aldous

One Lakeway Center, 3900 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 1470

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Wanda Anderson Davis

Attorney at Leefe, Gibbs, Sullivan, Dupre & Aldous

One Lakeway Center, 3900 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 1470

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Request of Summons Issued as to Terrance Saulny filed by Katrina Bridges re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Defendant, Terrance Saulny)(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#26

(#26) ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/17/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/4/2016.(blg) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#31

(#31) STATUS REPORT by Michael S. Harrison, Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City (St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

#30

(#30) STATUS REPORT by Terrance Saulny (Davis, Wanda) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

#28

(#28) CROSSCLAIM against Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City filed by Terrance Saulny.(gec) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#32

(#32) STATUS REPORT submitted on behalf of Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs (Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

#27

(#27) ORDERED that Terrance Saulny's 22 Motion for Leave to File Crossclaim is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (gec) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party New Orleans Police Department by Katrina Bridges. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of New Orleans Police Department)(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5035031) filed by Katrina Bridges. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jonique Martin Hall added to party Katrina Bridges(pty:pla).(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#29

(#29) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#4

(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 3 Request for Summons Issued. Incomplete document. Form AO 440, Summons, is a 2-page form. Page 2 was not provided. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#2

(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (mmv) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Terrance Saulny. (mmm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans Police Department. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party New Orleans Police Department(pty:dft).(St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#34

(#34) ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/17/2016.(caa) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

#33

(#33) STATUS REPORT Amended and Supplemental by Katrina Bridges (Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City.Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party Michael S. Harrison(pty:dft), Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party Mitchell J. Landrieu(pty:dft), Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Terrance Saulny served on 11/21/2015, answer due 12/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proof of Service - Defendant, Terrance Saulny)(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/17/2016.(caa) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) STATUS REPORT Amended and Supplemental by Katrina Bridges (Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) STATUS REPORT submitted on behalf of Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs (Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STATUS REPORT by Michael S. Harrison, Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City (St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) STATUS REPORT by Terrance Saulny (Davis, Wanda) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CROSSCLAIM against Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City filed by Terrance Saulny.(gec) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDERED that Terrance Saulny's 22 Motion for Leave to File Crossclaim is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (gec) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/17/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/4/2016.(blg) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 24 Notice; Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. (blg) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is RECOMMENDED that the motion of Bridges to dismiss the New Orleans Police Department without prejudice (Rec. doc. 9 ) be GRANTED; and the motion of the New Orleans Police Department to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which be granted (Rec. doc. 7 ) be DISMISSED as MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan.(gec) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party New Orleans Police Department by Katrina Bridges. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of New Orleans Police Department)(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Terrance Saulny served on 11/21/2015, answer due 12/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proof of Service - Defendant, Terrance Saulny)(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans Police Department. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party New Orleans Police Department(pty:dft).(St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Michael S. Harrison, Mitchell J. Landrieu, New Orleans City.Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party Michael S. Harrison(pty:dft), Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party Mitchell J. Landrieu(pty:dft), Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(St. Raymond, Corwin) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Terrance Saulny. (mmm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 3 Request for Summons Issued. Incomplete document. Form AO 440, Summons, is a 2-page form. Page 2 was not provided. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request of Summons Issued as to Terrance Saulny filed by Katrina Bridges re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Defendant, Terrance Saulny)(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (mmv) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5035031) filed by Katrina Bridges. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jonique Martin Hall added to party Katrina Bridges(pty:pla).(Hall, Jonique) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.