This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:48:09 (UTC).

Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc. et al v. City of Boston et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2015 Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-10100

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc.

Raphael Ophir

Joseph Pierre

Defendants

Commonwealth of Massachusetts

William F. Galvin

William Evans

Department of Public Utilities

Massachusetts Department of Transportation

City of Boston

Interested Party

Stevan Johnson

Boston, MA 02117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jenifer M. Pinkham

Attorney at Schlossberg, LLC

35 Braintree Hill Office Park, Suite 204

Braintree, MA 02184

Tiffany L. Stichel

Attorney at Schlossberg, LLC

35 Braintree Hill Office Park, Suite 204

Braintree, MA 02184

Defendant Attorneys

Tori T. Kim

Attorney at Massachusetts Attorney General's Office

One Ashburton Place, Mccormack Building, 20Th Floor

Boston, MA 02108-1598

Annapurna Balakrishna

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1 Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

John J. Boscia

Attorney at City Of Boston Law Department

One City Hall Plaza, Room 615

Boston, MA 02201

Peter M. Geraghty

Attorney at Boston Police Department

One Schroeder Plaza

Boston, MA 02120

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre.(Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#6

(#6) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#7

(#7) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#8

(#8) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#9

(#9) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#58

(#58) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance

#59

(#59) Notice of Appearance

#60

(#60) Letter/request (non-motion)

#61

(#61) Order

#62

(#62) Notice of Appearance

#63

(#63) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance

#64

(#64) Status Report

#65

(#65) Status Report

#66

(#66) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Letter/request (non-motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Opposition to Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Part I, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Part II, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre.(Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5371548 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Boston Taxi Owners Association, Inc., Raphael Ophir, Joseph Pierre. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stichel, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Boston Inspectional Services Department is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiffany L. Stichel