This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:06:22 (UTC).

Borum et al v. Swisher County

Case Summary

On 05/28/2014 Borum filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Swisher County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Mary Lou Robinson and Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Mary Lou Robinson

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chelsea Rushing

Grady Borum

Justin Borum

Defendant

Swisher County

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeff Edwards

Attorney at The Edwards Law Firm

1101 E. 11Th Street

Austin, TX 78702

Kevin A Isern

Attorney at Lovell Lovell Newsom & Isern

112 W 8Th Ave Suite 1000

Amarillo, TX 79101-2314

Scott Medlock

Attorney at Edwards Law

1101 East 11Th Street

Austin, TX 78702

Timothy D Newsom

Attorney at Lovell Lovell Newsom & Isern

112 W 8Th Ave, Suite 1000

Amarillo, TX 79101-2314

Defendant Attorneys

Mark D White

Attorney at Sprouse Shrader Smith P.C.

701 S Taylor, Suite 500

Amarillo, TX 79101

Malerie T. Anderson

Attorney at Sprouse Shrader Smith PLLC

701 S Taylor, Suite 500

Amarillo, TX 79101

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Frank E Murchison

Attorney at Frank E Murchison PC

Po Box 98600

Lubbock, TX 79499

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Estate of Terry Borum, Chelsea Rushing, Justin Borum, Grady Borum. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6064559) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Estate of Terry Borum, Chelsea Rushing. (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Robinson. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Swisher County. (awc) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Chelsea Rushing. (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

#6

(#6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Swisher County with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (White, Mark) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#7

(#7) ORIGINAL RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall be ready for trial by 3/2/2015. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiations by 10/6/2014. Discovery due by 12/29/2014. Pretrial Materials (designation of expert witnesses) due by 9/2/2014 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 9/22/2014 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2014. Motions for summary judgment due by 12/29/2014. All other motions except motions in limine due by 1/26/2015. Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures due by 2/17/2015. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 6/24/2014) (djs) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Chelsea Rushing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion and extends Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss to 7/18/2014. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 7/11/2014) (awc) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#147

(#147) Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply

#148

(#148) Response/Objection

#149

(#149) Reply

#150

(#150) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply

#151

(#151) Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply

#152

(#152) Motion for Leave to File

#153

(#153) Reply

#154

(#154) Motion for Leave to File

#155

(#155) Order on Motion for Leave to File

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) Order on Motion for Leave to File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) Motion for Leave to File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#153) Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#152) Motion for Leave to File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#151) Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#150) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#149) Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#148) Response/Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#147) Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#146) Order on Motion for Leave to File

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE filed by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Chelsea Rushing re: 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 07/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion and extends Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss to 7/18/2014. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 7/11/2014) (awc) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Chelsea Rushing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORIGINAL RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall be ready for trial by 3/2/2015. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiations by 10/6/2014. Discovery due by 12/29/2014. Pretrial Materials (designation of expert witnesses) due by 9/2/2014 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 9/22/2014 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2014. Motions for summary judgment due by 12/29/2014. All other motions except motions in limine due by 1/26/2015. Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures due by 2/17/2015. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 6/24/2014) (djs) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Swisher County with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (White, Mark) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Chelsea Rushing. (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Swisher County. (awc) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Robinson. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Grady Borum, Justin Borum, Estate of Terry Borum, Chelsea Rushing. (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Estate of Terry Borum, Chelsea Rushing, Justin Borum, Grady Borum. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6064559) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Edwards, Jeff) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less