This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 10:17:26 (UTC).

Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc. v. SourceAmerica et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2014 Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against SourceAmerica. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick and Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick

Judge

Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.

Defendants

Job Options, Inc.

Goodwill Industries of Southern California

CW Resources

Corporate Source, Inc.

Kent, Campa & Kate, Inc.

National Council of SourceAmerica Employers

SourceAmerica

Lakeview Center, Inc.

Pride Industries, Inc.

ServiceSource, Inc.

Opportunity Village, Inc.

The Ginn Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark J. Blando

Attorney at Eckland and Blando LLP

10 South Fifth Street, Suite 800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrew Edward Schouten

Attorney at Wright, L'Estrange & Ergastolo

401 West A Street, Suite 2250

San Diego, CA 92101-7928

John H L'Estrange, Jr

Attorney at Wright, L'Estrange & Ergastolo

401 West A Street, Suite 2250

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey M Shohet

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Charles Howard Samel

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Anne B. Beaumont

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11988 El Camino Real, Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92130-2594

Matthew B. du Mee

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Kathleen M Hartman

Attorney at Callahan, Thompson, Sherman & Caudill LLP

2601 Main Street, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Rachel Hadass Zernik

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffrey Alan LeVee

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John W. Treece

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

John P. Cooley

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Kevin W Alexander

Attorney at Gordon and Rees

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Allen R. Bachman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

700 12Th Street Nw, Suite 1050

Washington, DC 20005

Mason R. Winters

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Craig Edward TenBroeck

Attorney at Cooley LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

John D. Dakmak

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226

Jennifer Woods

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

150 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60601

Roger G Perkins

Attorney at Morris Polich and Purdy, LLP

One America Plaza, 600 West Broadway, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101

Devin J. Stone

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. Goodwill Industries of Southern California served. (L'Estrange, John) (Entered: 04/18/2014)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (cap). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#201

(#201) RESPONSE in Opposition re 195 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) MOTION to Stay re 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by CW Resources, Corporate Source, Inc., Goodwill Industries of Southern California, Job Options, Inc., Kent, Campa & Kate, Inc., Lakeview Center, Inc., National Council of SourceAmerica Employers, Opportunity Village, Inc., Pride Industries, Inc., ServiceSource, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attanasio, Michael) (dlg). (Entered: 02/20/2015)

#4

(#4) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Daniel J. Cragg appearing for Plaintiff Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Receipt # 61357. (jao) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc. Pride Industries, Inc. served. (L'Estrange, John) (mdc) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

#206

(#206) ORDER Denying 195 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Order For Interlocutory Appeal And Stay of Proceedings; Vacating Hearing Date: The hearing date set for this matter on March 6, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/4/15. (dlg) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#203

(#203) ORDER Granting 202 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 2/24/15. (dlg) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#3

(#3) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jared M. Reams appearing for Plaintiff Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Receipt # 61359. (jao) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

#209

(#209) NOTICE AND ORDER Re-Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference will be held on April 10, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/13/15.(dlg) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#208

(#208) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 207 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re 167 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File : The Court set a hearing date of May 29, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff shall file a response on or by March 20, 2015. Any reply shall be due by March 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/5/15.(dlg) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. ServiceSource, Inc. served. (L'Estrange, John) (srm). (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#207

(#207) MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re 167 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, 166 Response in Opposition to Motion, 128 Amended Complaint,, by SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Cooley, John) (jao). (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#204

(#204) REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) MOTION to Stay re 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(L'Estrange, John) (dlg). (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. Job Options, Inc. served. (L'Estrange, John) (srm). (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#5

(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Mark J. Blando appearing for Plaintiff Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Receipt # 61358. (jao) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

#202

(#202) Joint MOTION to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Presently Scheduled for March 9, 2015 by CW Resources. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Christenson, Sarah) (dlg). (Entered: 02/23/2015)

199 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#209) NOTICE AND ORDER Re-Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference will be held on April 10, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/13/15.(dlg) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#208) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 207 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re 167 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File : The Court set a hearing date of May 29, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff shall file a response on or by March 20, 2015. Any reply shall be due by March 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/5/15.(dlg) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#207) MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re 167 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, 166 Response in Opposition to Motion, 128 Amended Complaint,, by SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Cooley, John) (jao). (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#206) ORDER Denying 195 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Order For Interlocutory Appeal And Stay of Proceedings; Vacating Hearing Date: The hearing date set for this matter on March 6, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/4/15. (dlg) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#205) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Goodman on behalf of SourceAmerica (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Goodman, Joseph)Attorney Joseph W. Goodman added to party SourceAmerica(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#204) REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) MOTION to Stay re 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(L'Estrange, John) (dlg). (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#203) ORDER Granting 202 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 2/24/15. (dlg) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#202) Joint MOTION to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Presently Scheduled for March 9, 2015 by CW Resources. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Christenson, Sarah) (dlg). (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#201) RESPONSE in Opposition re 195 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) MOTION to Stay re 189 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by CW Resources, Corporate Source, Inc., Goodwill Industries of Southern California, Job Options, Inc., Kent, Campa & Kate, Inc., Lakeview Center, Inc., National Council of SourceAmerica Employers, Opportunity Village, Inc., Pride Industries, Inc., ServiceSource, Inc., SourceAmerica. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attanasio, Michael) (dlg). (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#200) ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 194 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application; (2) Modifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on 195 Plaintiff's Motion For Certification Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b): Responses due by 2/20/2015, Replies due by 2/27/2015. Motion Hearing Reset for 3/6/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/4/2015. (srm) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Attanasio on behalf of Pride Industries, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attanasio, Michael)Attorney Michael A Attanasio added to party Pride Industries, Inc.(pty:dft) (srm). (Entered: 04/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. Goodwill Industries of Southern California served. (L'Estrange, John) (Entered: 04/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc. Pride Industries, Inc. served. (L'Estrange, John) (mdc) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. ServiceSource, Inc. served. (L'Estrange, John) (srm). (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc.. Job Options, Inc. served. (L'Estrange, John) (srm). (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Mark J. Blando appearing for Plaintiff Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Receipt # 61358. (jao) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Daniel J. Cragg appearing for Plaintiff Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Receipt # 61357. (jao) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jared M. Reams appearing for Plaintiff Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc., Receipt # 61359. (jao) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (cap). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CW Resources, Corporate Source, Inc., Goodwill Industries of Southern California, Job Options, Inc., Kent, Campa & Kate, Inc., Lakeview Center, Inc., National Council of SourceAmerica Employers, Opportunity Village, Inc., Pride Industries, Inc., ServiceSource, Inc., SourceAmerica, The Ginn Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6894211.), filed by Bona Fide Conglomerate, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-00751-GPC-DHB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick are assigned to the case. (L'Estrange, John)(cxl) (cap). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.