This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 20:20:44 (UTC).

Boisseau v. Town of Walls, Mississippi et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 Boisseau filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Town of Walls, Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander and District Judge Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander

Judge

District Judge Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary W. Boisseau

Defendants

Ray Denison

Patti Denison

Town of Walls, Mississippi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jim D. Waide, III

Attorney at WAIDE & ASSOCIATES, PA

P.O. Box 1357

Tupelo, MS 38802-1357

Rachel Pierce Waide

Attorney at WAIDE & ASSOCIATES, PA

P.O. Box 1357

Tupelo, MS 38804

Ronnie Lee Woodruff

Attorney at WAIDE & ASSOCIATES, PA

P.O. Box 1357

Tupelo, MS 38804

Defendant Attorneys

Gary E. Friedman

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 16114

Jackson, MS 39236-6114

Gregory Todd Butler

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 16114

Jackson, MS 39236-6114

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (jtm) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary E. Friedman on behalf of Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi (Friedman, Gary)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Butler, Gregory)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 7/31/14. (kbt)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau Town of Walls, Mississippi served on 7/29/2014. (Waide, Jim)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau Patti Denison served on 7/29/2014. (Waide, Jim)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau Ray Denison served on 7/29/2014. (Waide, Jim)

#9

(#9) Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Butler, Gregory)

#64

(#64) ORDER on telephonic hearing held 7/9/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 7/10/15. (mhf)

#65

(#65) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau to Defendants. (Woodruff, Ronnie)

#66

(#66) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Core Disclosures by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau to Defendants. (Waide, Jim)

#67

(#67) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Board of Standards Letter to Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit B. Plaintiffs Employment Application, # 3 Exhibit C. Plaintiffs Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D. Former Mayor Linda Austins Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit E. Memo regarding Plaintiffs Reprimands, # 6 Exhibit F. Video (conventionally filed), # 7 Exhibit G. Pryor Ticket, # 8 Exhibit H. Angela Boisseaus Deposition Excerpts, # 9 Exhibit I. Mike Stricklands Deposition Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit J. Alderman Ray Denisons Deposition Excerpts, # 11 Exhibit K. Pryor Conviction, # 12 Exhibit L. Mayor Patti Denisons Deposition Excerpts, # 13 Exhibit M. July 2, 2013 Board Minutes, # 14 Exhibit N. 6/27/2013 E-mail, # 15 Exhibit O. July 9, 2013 Board Minutes, # 16 Exhibit P. Alderwoman Jenni Doyles Deposition Excerpts, # 17 Exhibit Q. Alderwoman Tammy Patricks Deposition Excerpts, # 18 Exhibit R. Alderwoman Vicky Waddeys Deposition Excerpts, # 19 Exhibit S. Zach Jenkins Narrative, # 20 Exhibit T. 7/19/2013 E-mail, # 21 Exhibit U. 7/24/2013 E-mail, # 22 Exhibit V. 8/21/2013 E-mail, # 23 Exhibit W. 2/7/2014 E-mail, # 24 Exhibit X. 3/5/2014 E-mail, # 25 Exhibit Y. Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel, # 26 Exhibit Z. 12/2/2013 E-mail, # 27 Exhibit AA. 12/10/2013 E-mail, # 28 Exhibit BB. 12/11/2013 E-mail, # 29 Exhibit CC. 12/13/2013 E-mail, # 30 Exhibit DD. 12/20/2013 E-mails, # 31 Exhibit EE. 1/7/2014 E-mail, # 32 Exhibit FF. Text Messages, # 33 Exhibit GG. First ALJ Decision, # 34 Exhibit HH. Second Circuit Order, # 35 Exhibit II. Second ALJ Decision, # 36 Exhibit JJ. Plaintiffs Part-Time Certification, # 37 Exhibit KK. Officer Rosters, # 38 Exhibit LL. Training Academy Exit Statement regarding Plaintiff, # 39 Exhibit MM. Plaintiffs Responses To Second Set of Request for Production of Documents, # 40 Errata NN. Highway Patrol Application To Conduct Breath Analysis by Plaintiff, # 41 Exhibit OO. Stephen Raines Full-Time Law Enforcement Certification, # 42 Exhibit PP. Letter to Plaintiff requesting Voluntary Dismissal, # 43 Exhibit QQ. Walls Police Manual Excerpts, # 44 Exhibit RR. Tammy Patricks Declaration, # 45 Exhibit SS. Ray Denisons Declaration, # 46 Exhibit TT. Vicky Waddeys Declaration, # 47 Exhibit UU. Jenni Doyles Declaration, # 48 Exhibit VV. Beverly Works Declaration, # 49 Exhibit WW. Robert Davis Declaration) (Butler, Gregory)

#68

(#68) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Butler, Gregory)

#69

(#69) NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibit F re 67 Motion for Summary Judgment by Gary E. Friedman on behalf of Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (jtm)

#70

(#70) MOTION to Bifurcate Trial by Gary W. Boisseau. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Deposition of Gary Boisseau, # 2 Exhibit B: July 9, 2013 Board Minutes, # 3 Exhibit C: Subpoena to Mississippi Board of Law Enforcement Office of Standards & Training Agency, # 4 Exhibit D: Documents Produced in Response to Subpoena Served Upon the Mississippi Board of Law Enforcement Office of Standards & Training Agency) (Waide, Jim)

#71

(#71) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 70 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial . (Waide, Jim)

#72

(#72) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 68 Memorandum in Support, 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gary W. Boisseau. (Waide, Jim)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 68 Memorandum in Support, 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gary W. Boisseau. (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 70 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial . (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) MOTION to Bifurcate Trial by Gary W. Boisseau. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Deposition of Gary Boisseau, # 2 Exhibit B: July 9, 2013 Board Minutes, # 3 Exhibit C: Subpoena to Mississippi Board of Law Enforcement Office of Standards & Training Agency, # 4 Exhibit D: Documents Produced in Response to Subpoena Served Upon the Mississippi Board of Law Enforcement Office of Standards & Training Agency) (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibit F re 67 Motion for Summary Judgment by Gary E. Friedman on behalf of Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Butler, Gregory)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Board of Standards Letter to Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit B. Plaintiffs Employment Application, # 3 Exhibit C. Plaintiffs Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D. Former Mayor Linda Austins Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit E. Memo regarding Plaintiffs Reprimands, # 6 Exhibit F. Video (conventionally filed), # 7 Exhibit G. Pryor Ticket, # 8 Exhibit H. Angela Boisseaus Deposition Excerpts, # 9 Exhibit I. Mike Stricklands Deposition Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit J. Alderman Ray Denisons Deposition Excerpts, # 11 Exhibit K. Pryor Conviction, # 12 Exhibit L. Mayor Patti Denisons Deposition Excerpts, # 13 Exhibit M. July 2, 2013 Board Minutes, # 14 Exhibit N. 6/27/2013 E-mail, # 15 Exhibit O. July 9, 2013 Board Minutes, # 16 Exhibit P. Alderwoman Jenni Doyles Deposition Excerpts, # 17 Exhibit Q. Alderwoman Tammy Patricks Deposition Excerpts, # 18 Exhibit R. Alderwoman Vicky Waddeys Deposition Excerpts, # 19 Exhibit S. Zach Jenkins Narrative, # 20 Exhibit T. 7/19/2013 E-mail, # 21 Exhibit U. 7/24/2013 E-mail, # 22 Exhibit V. 8/21/2013 E-mail, # 23 Exhibit W. 2/7/2014 E-mail, # 24 Exhibit X. 3/5/2014 E-mail, # 25 Exhibit Y. Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel, # 26 Exhibit Z. 12/2/2013 E-mail, # 27 Exhibit AA. 12/10/2013 E-mail, # 28 Exhibit BB. 12/11/2013 E-mail, # 29 Exhibit CC. 12/13/2013 E-mail, # 30 Exhibit DD. 12/20/2013 E-mails, # 31 Exhibit EE. 1/7/2014 E-mail, # 32 Exhibit FF. Text Messages, # 33 Exhibit GG. First ALJ Decision, # 34 Exhibit HH. Second Circuit Order, # 35 Exhibit II. Second ALJ Decision, # 36 Exhibit JJ. Plaintiffs Part-Time Certification, # 37 Exhibit KK. Officer Rosters, # 38 Exhibit LL. Training Academy Exit Statement regarding Plaintiff, # 39 Exhibit MM. Plaintiffs Responses To Second Set of Request for Production of Documents, # 40 Errata NN. Highway Patrol Application To Conduct Breath Analysis by Plaintiff, # 41 Exhibit OO. Stephen Raines Full-Time Law Enforcement Certification, # 42 Exhibit PP. Letter to Plaintiff requesting Voluntary Dismissal, # 43 Exhibit QQ. Walls Police Manual Excerpts, # 44 Exhibit RR. Tammy Patricks Declaration, # 45 Exhibit SS. Ray Denisons Declaration, # 46 Exhibit TT. Vicky Waddeys Declaration, # 47 Exhibit UU. Jenni Doyles Declaration, # 48 Exhibit VV. Beverly Works Declaration, # 49 Exhibit WW. Robert Davis Declaration) (Butler, Gregory)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Core Disclosures by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau to Defendants. (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau to Defendants. (Woodruff, Ronnie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER on telephonic hearing held 7/9/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 7/10/15. (mhf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Harrison Evans by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendants' AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Butler, Gregory)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Butler, Gregory)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau Ray Denison served on 7/29/2014. (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau Patti Denison served on 7/29/2014. (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Gary W. Boisseau Town of Walls, Mississippi served on 7/29/2014. (Waide, Jim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 7/31/14. (kbt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (Butler, Gregory)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary E. Friedman on behalf of Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi (Friedman, Gary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Patti Denison, Ray Denison, Town of Walls, Mississippi. (jtm) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1124264, filed by Gary W. Boisseau. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less