This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2016 at 12:33:54 (UTC).

Blue Spike, LLC v. Zeitera, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2014 Blue Spike, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zeitera, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-01648

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Blue Spike, LLC

Defendants

Ensequence, Inc.

Zeitera, LLC

Related Content Database, Inc.

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Zeitera, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christopher A Honea

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

218 N. College Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Christopher S Johns

Attorney at Johns Marrs Ellis & Hodge LLP

300 West Sixth Street, Suite 1950

Austin, TX 78701

Eric Miller Albritton

Attorney at Albritton Law Firm

P.O. Box 2649

Longview, TX 75606

Michael A Benefield

Attorney at Williams Morgan & Amerson PC

10333 Richmond Ave, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77042

Peter Stuart Brasher

Attorney at Garteiser Honea

44 N San Pedro Rd.

San Rafael, CA 94903

Randall Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, P.C.

44 N. San Pedro Road

San Rafael, CA 94903

Randall T Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

218 N. College Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Stephen Eugene Edwards

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Julia Elizabeth Markley

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1120 Nw Couch Street, 10Th Floor

Portland, OR 97209-4128

Douglas L Sawyer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Denver

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, TX 80202

Scott D. Eads

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1120 N.W. Couch Street, Tenth Floor

Portland, OR 97209-4128

Bryan A. Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Bryan Alexander Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jeffrey Allen Ware

Attorney at Fenwick and West

1191 Second Ave., 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Alyssa M. Caridis

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Christopher James Higgins

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-1706

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Gabriel M. Ramsey

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Indra Neel Chatterjee

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#79

#80

#81

#82

#83

#84

#85

#86

#87

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 86 Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with prejudice (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Zeitera, LLC., Blue Spike LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 4/23/2015) Modified on 4/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) ORDER[AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 84 Stipulation Extending Deadlines re: Claim Construction Disclosures. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISCLOSURES filed by Zeitera, LLC, Blue Spike LLC (Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 82 Stipulation Extending Deadlines Re: Disclosures (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines Re: Claim Construction Disclosures filed by Zeitera, LLC, Blue Spike LLC. (Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2015) Modified on 3/31/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 80 Third Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) THIRD STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE TIME TO EXCHANGE PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE filed by Zeitera, LLC., Blue Spike LLC (Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 3/23/2015) Modified on 3/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 78 Corrected Second Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015) (Entered: 03/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) Corrected Second STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Time to Exchange Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence filed by Zeitera, LLC., Blue Spike LLC (Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 3/6/2015) Modified on 3/9/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv499 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Ensequence, Inc., Related Content Database, Inc., Zeitera, LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 09/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T Garteiser on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 08/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Johns on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Johns, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher A Honea on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Honea, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Benefield, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Edwards on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Edwards, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Spike, LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ensequence, Inc., Related Content Database, Inc., Zeitera, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3744954.), filed by Blue Spike, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Patent 8214175, # 3 Exhibit B - Patent 7949494, # 4 Exhibit C - Patent 7660700, # 5 Exhibit D - Patent 7346472)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Spike, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Stuart Brasher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen E. Edwards

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Aaron Benefield