This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2016 at 15:20:40 (UTC).

Blount v. Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2014 Blount filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo and Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00498

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo

Judge

Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlotta Blount

Defendants

Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.

Does 1 through 40

Grant Bunderson

John McCann

Rudy Velasquez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marilynn Mika Spencer

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel M. Glassman

Wendy Sugg

Trina F. Barlow

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from S.D.C.S.C. - Central Division, case number 37-2013-00081818-CU-WT-CTL. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6820333), filed by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. (t/w Complaint in Removal). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Complaint, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:14-cv-498-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Sugg, Wendy)(dls) (ATTNY MAINT) (av1). (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. (dls)(av1). (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service)(Sugg, Wendy) (dls). (Entered: 03/06/2014)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and to File Motion to Remand by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sugg, Wendy) Modified on 3/13/2014-QC mailer sent to attorney regarding proposed order (vam). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting 4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. answer due 5/12/2014. Plaintiffmay file a motion to remand no later than May 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 03/17/2014. (yeb) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint and to File Motion to Remand by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.. (Sugg, Wendy) (yeb). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. answer due 6/11/2014. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 05/09/2014. (yeb) (Entered: 05/09/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Glassman on behalf of Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. (Glassman, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Glassman added to party Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.(pty:dft) (yeb). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. to Withdraw Wendy Sugg as Counsel of Record (Sugg, Wendy) (yeb). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss To Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue, # 2 Declaration Dec of D. Dubia, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Glassman, Daniel) (jao). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc..(Glassman, Daniel) (cxl). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss To Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Carlotta Blount. (Spencer, Marilynn) (yeb). (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss To Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Carlotta Blount. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Carlotta Blount in Support of Opposition to MOtion to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue)(Spencer, Marilynn)(yeb). (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#14

(#14) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 07/10/2014.(ag) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 07/10/2014.(ag) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss To Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Carlotta Blount. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Carlotta Blount in Support of Opposition to MOtion to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue)(Spencer, Marilynn)(yeb). (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss To Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Carlotta Blount. (Spencer, Marilynn) (yeb). (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc..(Glassman, Daniel) (cxl). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss To Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue, # 2 Declaration Dec of D. Dubia, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Glassman, Daniel) (jao). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. to Withdraw Wendy Sugg as Counsel of Record (Sugg, Wendy) (yeb). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Glassman on behalf of Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. (Glassman, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Glassman added to party Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.(pty:dft) (yeb). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. answer due 6/11/2014. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 05/09/2014. (yeb) (Entered: 05/09/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint and to File Motion to Remand by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.. (Sugg, Wendy) (yeb). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting 4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. answer due 5/12/2014. Plaintiffmay file a motion to remand no later than May 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 03/17/2014. (yeb) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and to File Motion to Remand by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sugg, Wendy) Modified on 3/13/2014-QC mailer sent to attorney regarding proposed order (vam). (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service)(Sugg, Wendy) (dls). (Entered: 03/06/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. (dls)(av1). (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from S.D.C.S.C. - Central Division, case number 37-2013-00081818-CU-WT-CTL. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6820333), filed by Northrop Grumman Information Technology Overseas, Inc. (t/w Complaint in Removal). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Complaint, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:14-cv-498-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Sugg, Wendy)(dls) (ATTNY MAINT) (av1). (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less