This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 21:17:43 (UTC).

Biasi v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2015 Biasi filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby

Referral Judge

US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Biasi

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Earlene Schaeffer

Rebecca Paukstela

Ryan Dunphy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan M. Finn

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

28 Second Street

Troy, NY 12180

David I. Iversen

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

28 Second Street

Troy, NY 12180

Defendant Attorneys

Pamela J. Moore

Attorney at McCarter, English Law Firm - Hartford CT Office

185 Asylum Street, Cityplace I

Hartford, CT 06103-3495

Sami Asaad

Attorney at McCarter, English Law Firm - Hartford CT Office

185 Asylum Street, Cityplace I

Hartford, CT 06103-3495

Thomas J. Finn

Attorney at McCarter, English Law Firm - Hartford CT Office

185 Asylum Street, Cityplace I

Hartford, CT 06103-3495

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#24

#25

#26

#27

#28

#29

#30

#31

#32

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Plan by Joseph Biasi. (Finn, Ryan) (Entered: 04/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to 28 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ryan Dunphy, Rebecca Paukstela, Earlene Schaeffer, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Moore, Pamela) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DECISION AND ORDER denying # 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's second cause of action in his Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Baxter for a Rule 16 conference and the setting of pretrial scheduling deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/14/16. (lmw) (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) EXHIBIT A to the 28 Second Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Biasi. (mae) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Biasi against Ryan Dunphy, Rebecca Paukstela, Earlene Schaeffer, and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(mae) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION AND ORDER concerning the filing of a second amended complaint and the amendment of the caption of this case. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/19/2015. (mae) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION re 17 Amended Complaint by Joseph Biasi submitted to Judge Suddaby. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Pleading)(Finn, Ryan) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Sur-Reply in Opposition to the 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Second Cause of Action) Sur-reply with permission filed by Joseph Biasi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Pleading, # 2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(Finn, Ryan) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 23 Letter Request. Plaintiff's request for leave to file a sur-reply memorandum of law is granted: Plaintiff's sur-reply, which shall not exceed ten (10) pages in length, is due on or before June 8, 2015. In his sur-reply memorandum of law, Plaintiff is invited to also brief the Court as to how his Amended Complaint could have been filed "as a matter of course" under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), given that it was filed 26 days after service of Defendant Walmart's motion to dismiss, and the automated docket entry for 4/22/2015 set 5/26/2015 as the deadline by which Plaintiff could merely file a "response" to Defendant Walmart's motion (which, under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of Practice, is an opposition memorandum of law). If Plaintiff argues that he erroneously interpreted the automated docket entry for 4/22/2015 and requests an Order granting him, nunc pro tunc, leave to file his Amended Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), Plaintiff is respectfully reminded he must include with his request a version of the Amended Complaint identifying the changes in the original Complaint, either through the submission of a red-lined version of the original Complaint or other equivalent means, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(4). Finally, Plaintiff's request for oral argument is denied: the Court will set a date and time for oral argument should the Court, in deciding Defendant Walmart's motion, determine that a need for oral argument is necessary. Authorized by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 6/1/15. (lmw) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Letter Motion from Ryan M. Finn for Joseph Biasi requesting oral argument or submission of sur-reply submitted to Judge Suddaby . (Finn, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER: The time for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Earlene Schaeffer, Ryan Dunphy, and Rebecca Paukstela to answer or otherwise move against the First Cause of Action in the Complaint is extended to 5/22/2015. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/23/2015. (mae) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Iversen on behalf of Joseph Biasi (Iversen, David) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or otherwise move against the First Cause of Action by Ryan Dunphy, Rebecca Paukstela, Earlene Schaeffer, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. submitted to Judge Hon. Glenn T. Suddaby, USDJ. (Moore, Pamela) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Moore, Pamela) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Second Cause of Action) Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 5/18/2015 Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/26/2015. filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit(s) A (Unpublished Decisions)) (Moore, Pamela) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sami Asaad on behalf of All Defendants (Asaad, Sami) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J. Moore on behalf of All Defendants (Moore, Pamela) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to defendants; Attorneys Pamela J. Moore and Sami Asaad, Email address is pmoore@mccarter.com and sasaad@mccarter.com. Phone number is (860) 275-6700. Admissions due by 4/30/2015. {Letters with blank admission forms mailed to Attorneys Moore and Asaad on 4/16/2015 by regular mail} (see) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/26/2015 at 10:30 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/19/2015. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Montgomery County, case number 000251/2015 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0206-3259362) filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Ryan Dunphy, Rebecca Paukstela, and Earlene Schaeffer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Copy of State Court Complaint, # 2 Copy of State Court Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David I. Iversen(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M Finn