This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 21:24:07 (UTC).

BETANCOURT CONSTRUCTION INC. et al v. Beyel Brothers Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 BETANCOURT CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Beyel Brothers Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman and Judge Joan A. Lenard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-23941

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman

Judge

Judge Joan A. Lenard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Westchester Fire Insurance Company

BETANCOURT CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Beyel Brothers Inc.

Counter Defendants

Mr. S. Michael Betancourt

Davie, FL 33324

Westchester Fire Insurance Company

BETANCOURT CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert MCL Boote

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 Four Falls Corporate Center, Suite 400

West Conshohocken, PA 19428-2958

Peter Benjamin Rowell

Attorney at The Barthet Firm

200 S. Biscayne Blvd, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131

Alexander Edward Barthet

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 1800

Miami, FL 33131-2340

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jan Michael Kuylenstierna

Attorney at De Leo & Kuylenstierna P.A.

8950 Sw 74Th Court

Miami, FL 33176

Damon Thomas Hartley

Attorney at De Leon & Kuylenstierna

8950 Sw 74Th Court

Miami, FL 33176

Ryon Lyndon Little

Attorney at De Leo & Kuylenstierna, P.A.

8950 Sw 74Th Court

Miami, FL 33176

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Order Referring Preliminary Status Conference, Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; Notice of Court Practice in Removal Actions; and Directing Parties to File a Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/28/15. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix) (dp) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#7

(#7) BEYEL BROTHERS, INC. ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against BETANCOURT CONSTRUCTION INC., Westchester Fire Insurance Company, S. Michael Betancourt by Beyel Brothers Inc.. Attorney Ryon Lyndon Little added to party Beyel Brothers Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Bond, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Preliminary Bond Notice, # 3 Exhibit 3- Crane Rental Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Landing Craft Charter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Barge Charter, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Notices to Surety, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Notices of Default, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter of Denial from Surety, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Guaranty of Payment)(Little, Ryon) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert MCL. Boote, mailing date October 26, 2015. (ksa) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#2

(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard (srd) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/28/2015. (dp) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BEYEL BROTHERS, INC. ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against BETANCOURT CONSTRUCTION INC., Westchester Fire Insurance Company, S. Michael Betancourt by Beyel Brothers Inc.. Attorney Ryon Lyndon Little added to party Beyel Brothers Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Bond, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Preliminary Bond Notice, # 3 Exhibit 3- Crane Rental Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Landing Craft Charter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Barge Charter, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Notices to Surety, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Notices of Default, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter of Denial from Surety, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Guaranty of Payment)(Little, Ryon) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/28/2015. (dp) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Referring Preliminary Status Conference, Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; Notice of Court Practice in Removal Actions; and Directing Parties to File a Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/28/15. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix) (dp) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert MCL. Boote, mailing date October 26, 2015. (ksa) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard (srd) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8176857, filed by Beyel Brothers Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hartley, Damon) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.