This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 08:44:34 (UTC).

Bermuda v. Beibu Gulf Shipping Ltd.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Bermuda filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Beibu Gulf Shipping Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby and Judge Eldon E. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05284

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby

Judge

Judge Eldon E. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sinotrans Bermuda, LTD

Defendant

Beibu Gulf Shipping, LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adelaida J. Ferchmin

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Daniel Alfred Tadros

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Laura Beck Knoll

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#3

(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Motion to Allow Vessel to Load or Discharge Cargo, Burn Fuel and Move Within the Port by Sinotrans (Bermuda), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tadros, Daniel) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). (3ccUSM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

1 #10

Exhibit G

1 #3

Summons

1 #8

Exhibit E

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sinotrans Bermuda, LTD served on 10/21/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Tadros, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

1 #5

Exhibit B

#5

(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jls) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Beibu Gulf Shipping Ltd.. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #1

Affidavit Rule B

#2

(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment by Sinotrans (Bermuda), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tadros, Daniel) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). (3ccUSM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

1 #7

Exhibit D

#7

(#7) WRIT of Attachment issued. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#12

(#12) Return of Service of Writ of Attachment served on Lili Xintao on 10/20/2015(cml) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion appoint Mark Henry as Special Process Server. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/15. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Docket Call set for 4/27/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. by Clerk(dno) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Return of Service of Writ of Attachment served on Lili Xintao on 10/20/2015(cml) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sinotrans Bermuda, LTD served on 10/21/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Tadros, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Beibu Gulf Shipping Ltd.. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion to allow vessel to load or discharge cargo, burn fuel and move within the port. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/15. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion appoint Mark Henry as Special Process Server. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/15. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WRIT of Attachment issued. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of a Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/15. (dno) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jls) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server by Sinotrans (Bermuda), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tadros, Daniel) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). (3ccUSM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Motion to Allow Vessel to Load or Discharge Cargo, Burn Fuel and Move Within the Port by Sinotrans (Bermuda), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tadros, Daniel) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). (3ccUSM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment by Sinotrans (Bermuda), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tadros, Daniel) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). (3ccUSM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Beibu Gulf Shipping Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5072451) filed by Sinotrans Bermuda, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G)Attorney Daniel Alfred Tadros added to party Sinotrans Bermuda, Ltd.(pty:pla).(Tadros, Daniel) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). Modified on 10/21/2015 (ajn). (3ccUSM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.