This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:47:51 (UTC).

Bentley Holdings v. MPDK et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2014 Bentley Holdings filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against MPDK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Jennifer G Zipps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-02107

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Jennifer G Zipps

 

Party Details

Appellant

Bentley Holdings Inc

Appellees

Kevin McCarthy

Winchester Auto Retail

Gayle Mills

Phillips Lytle LLP

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Debtor / Appellee

MPDK LLC

Not Yet Classified

United States Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Alan Richard Solot

Attorney at Law Office of Alan R Solot

2701 E Speedway Blvd., Ste. 203

Tucson, AZ 85716

Appellee Attorneys

Michael M Neal

Attorney at Law Office of Michael M Neal PC

110 S Church Ave, Ste 4298

Tucson, AZ 85701

Michael William McGrath

Attorney at Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC

259 N Meyer Ave

Tucson, AZ 85701-1090

Peter Akmajian

Attorney at Udall Law Firm LLP

4801 E Broadway Blvd, Ste 400

Tucson, AZ 85711-3609

Jill Leeann Perrella

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Tucson, AZ

1 S Church Ave., Ste. 1500

Tucson, AZ 85701-1630

Angela Z Miller

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

3400 Hsbc Center

Buffalo, NY 14203

Jonathan Marc Saffer

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Tucson, AZ

1 S Church Ave., Ste. 1500

Tucson, AZ 85701-1630

Jeffrey Lynn Willis

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

1 S Church Ave, Ste 1500

Tucson, AZ 85701-1612

Debtor / Appellee Attorney

Eric Slocum Sparks

Attorney at Eric Slocum Sparks PC

110 S Church Ave, Ste 2270

Tucson, AZ 85701

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: 4:14-cv-01664-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02107-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02198-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02200-JGZ consolidated. All future filings shall be under cause number CV-14-1664-TUC-JGZ. It is further ORDERED that all four cases are set for status conference before the Hon. Jennifer G. Zipps on July 16, 2014 at 1:30 p.m.. The Scheduling Order issued in CV-14-2107-TUC-JGZ (Doc. 8) is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that on or before July 14, 2014, the parties shall file a Joint Report. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/2/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) Associated Cases: 4:14-cv-01664-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02107-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02198-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02200-JGZ. (KAH) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Perrella, Jill) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, Winchester Auto Retail. (DLC) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (DLC) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#8

(#8) VACATED by (Doc. 9 ) SCHEDULING ORDER BANKRUPTCY APPEAL: IT IS ORDERED this Bankruptcy Appeal is designated an expedited track case. Appellant shall file and serve its Opening Brief in support of its Appeal by 14 days from this date of entry in the docket of the appeal; Appellees shall file and serve Answering Brief by 14 days from service of the appellant's brief; Appellant may file and serve a Reply Brief by 7 days after service of Appellee's brief. All briefs shall conform with the limits and requirements of Rule 8010, Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and this Order may result in the Court taking actions for failure to perfect appeal, including possible dismissal for failure to prosecute.(BAC) Modified on 7/7/2014 (KAH). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bentley Holdings. (DLC) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bentley Holdings Inc. (Solot, Alan) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#1

(#1) Transmittal of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#10

(#10) ORDER: In the interest of judicial economy, the cases are reassigned back to Judge Jennifer G. Zipps. It is FURTHER ORDERED the case number will bear the following initials: CV-14-2107-TUC-JGZ. It is further ordered confirming the Status Conference set before Judge Zipps on 8/14/14 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/5/14.(BAC) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: In the interest of judicial economy, the cases are reassigned back to Judge Jennifer G. Zipps. It is FURTHER ORDERED the case number will bear the following initials: CV-14-2107-TUC-JGZ. It is further ordered confirming the Status Conference set before Judge Zipps on 8/14/14 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/5/14.(BAC) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: 4:14-cv-01664-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02107-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02198-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02200-JGZ consolidated. All future filings shall be under cause number CV-14-1664-TUC-JGZ. It is further ORDERED that all four cases are set for status conference before the Hon. Jennifer G. Zipps on July 16, 2014 at 1:30 p.m.. The Scheduling Order issued in CV-14-2107-TUC-JGZ (Doc. 8) is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that on or before July 14, 2014, the parties shall file a Joint Report. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/2/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) Associated Cases: 4:14-cv-01664-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02107-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02198-JGZ, 4:14-cv-02200-JGZ. (KAH) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) VACATED by (Doc. 9 ) SCHEDULING ORDER BANKRUPTCY APPEAL: IT IS ORDERED this Bankruptcy Appeal is designated an expedited track case. Appellant shall file and serve its Opening Brief in support of its Appeal by 14 days from this date of entry in the docket of the appeal; Appellees shall file and serve Answering Brief by 14 days from service of the appellant's brief; Appellant may file and serve a Reply Brief by 7 days after service of Appellee's brief. All briefs shall conform with the limits and requirements of Rule 8010, Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and this Order may result in the Court taking actions for failure to perfect appeal, including possible dismissal for failure to prosecute.(BAC) Modified on 7/7/2014 (KAH). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bentley Holdings Inc. (Solot, Alan) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Perrella, Jill) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, Winchester Auto Retail. (DLC) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bentley Holdings. (DLC) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (DLC) (Entered: 05/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Transmittal of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.