This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2016 at 19:16:48 (UTC).

Bell v. Kaplan

Case Summary

On 06/25/2014 Bell filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kaplan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Senior Judge Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00352

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Judge

Senior Judge Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth D. Bell

Charlotte, NC 28202-4011

Defendant

Howard N. Kaplan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Irving M. Brenner

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

201 North Tryon St.

Charlotte, NC 28202

Kenneth D. Bell

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

201 North Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202-4011

Matthew E. Orso

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

201 North Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Cynthia L Van Horne

Attorney at Poyner & Spruill, LLP

One Wachovia Center, 301 S. College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28202

E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III

Attorney at Poyner & Spruill

One Wachovia Center, Suite 2300, 301 College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Joshua Blake Durham

Attorney at Poyner & Spruill LLP

One Wachovia Center, 301 S. College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDERED pending Motion to Dismiss 9 will be held in abeyance pending the mediation in Bell v. Grimes, 3:14CV351, SEC is directed to inform the Court as to whether it is willing to file an amicus brief in this matter if requested by the court. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/23/2015. (jlk) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Howard N. Kaplan. (Durham, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth D. Bell. Replies due by 9/22/2014 (Brenner, Irving) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Howard N. Kaplan. (Van Horne, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Howard N. Kaplan.Responses due by 9/11/2014 (Van Horne, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Howard N. Kaplan answer due 8/29/2014.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/18/14. (ssh) (Entered: 07/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint by Howard N. Kaplan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Horne, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Blake Durham on behalf of Howard N. Kaplan (Durham, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III on behalf of Howard N. Kaplan (Parnell, E.) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia L Van Horne on behalf of Howard N. Kaplan (Van Horne, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Howard N. Kaplan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Miscellaneous Filing by Kenneth D. Bell. Civil Cover Sheet (Orso, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Howard N. Kaplan with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2353166), filed by Kenneth D. Bell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Orso, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cynthia L Van Horne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Blake Durham