This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 11:21:15 (UTC).

Begin v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2015 Begin filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid System Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson and Judge Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson

Judge

Judge Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Air & Liquid System Corporation

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Crane Co.

Warren Pumps LLC

Viking Pumps, Inc

Flowserve Corporation

Pneumo Abex Corporation

General Gasket Corporation

Riley Power Inc.

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.

Certain-Teed Corporation

Honeywell International Inc.

Lamons Gasket Company

Weil-Mclain Company

Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc

CSR, Ltd

Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC

Georgia-Pacific LLC

Whitney Automotive Group, Inc.

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

Air & Liquid System Corporation

Warren Pumps LLC

Viking Pumps, Inc

Pneumo Abex Corporation

Riley Power Inc.

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.

Certain-Teed Corporation

Honeywell International Inc.

Lamons Gasket Company

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.

Attorney at Kurowski Shultz LLC

228 West Pointe Drive

Swansea, IL 62226

James R. Grabowski

Attorney at Heyl, Royster et al. - Edwardsville

105 West Vandalia St., Ste. 100, P.O. Box 467

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Bradley R. Bultman

Attorney at Segal, McCambridge et al.

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

A. J. Bronsky

Attorney at Brown & James

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Meredith S Hudgens

Attorney at O'Connell , Tivin, Miller & Burns L.L.C.

135 S. Lasalle St., Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60603

Kathleen Ann Hardee

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Kansas City

900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Kirra N. Jones

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Kansas City

900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Other Attorneys

Michael J. Kanute

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels - Chicago

311 South Wacker Dr., Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606-6622

Justin S. Zimmerman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Edwardsville

103 West Vandalia Street

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Troy D. Hoyt

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP - Chicago

131 South Dearborn Street, 30Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Madeline Victoria Tzall

Attorney at Segal, McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Julia Yasmin Tayyab

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis et al. - Chicago, IL

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 500, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Dayna L. Johnson

Attorney at Greensfelder, Hemker et al. - Belleville

12 Wolf Creek Drive, Suite 100

Belleville, IL 62226

Trisha M. Rich

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP - Chicago

131 South Dearborn Street, 30Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Mindy A. Finnigan

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels - Chicago

311 South Wacker Dr., Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606-6622

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105-1810

Undray Wilks

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis et al. - Chicago, IL

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 500, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeffrey T. Bash

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Edwardsville

103 West Vandalia Street

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Nicole E. Rice

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP-Belleville

521 West Main St., Suite 300, P.O.Box 509

Belleville, IL 62222-0509

John Backes Prior

Attorney at Hart McLaughlin & Eldridge, LLC

116 West Illinois St., Ste. 3E

Chicago, IL 60654

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit Madison County, case number 15-L-796 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2684216), filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Pantaleoni, # 3 Exhibit 3: Affidavit of Sargent Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 4: Affidavit of Sargent Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 5: Affidavit of Sargent Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 6: Affidavit of Sargent Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 7: Affidavit of Sargent Part 5, # 8 Exhibit 8: Affidavit of Forman Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 9: Affidavit of Forman Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 10: Affidavit of Forman Part 3, # 11 Exhibit 11: Affidavit of Forman Part 4, # 12 Exhibit 12: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet 13: Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Exhibit 14: State Court Docket Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 15: State Court Docket Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 16: State Court Docket Part 3, # 17 Exhibit 17: State Court Docket Part 4, # 18 Exhibit 18: State Court Docket Part 5, # 19 Exhibit 19: State Court Docket Part 6, # 20 Exhibit 20: State Court Docket Part 7)(Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#4

(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 15-830-SMY-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (slh) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Hulla on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hulla, Timothy) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#316

(#316) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 309 Notice of Hearing,, Notice to Counsel of Status Conference (Hulla, Timothy) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#315

(#315) ANSWER to 303 Amended Complaint and Affirmatived Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid System Corporation.(Hill, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#314

(#314) ANSWER to 303 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hill, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#313

(#313) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , General and Specific, filed by General Electric Company [Doc. 11], Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company [Doc. 19], and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CBS Corporation [Doc. 62]. MOOTING First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by General Electric Company [Doc. 310]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/19/2016. (mah) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#312

(#312) ORDER MOOTING Motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V filed by Aurora Pump Company 71 and Motion to Dismiss Spoliation Claims filed by Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co. 25 per the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/19/2016. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#311

(#311) ANSWER to 303 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#310

(#310) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by General Electric Company. Responses due by 2/22/2016 (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#309

(#309) NOTICE of Hearing: Due to the Court's trial schedule, the Status Conference originally set for 1/20/16 is RESET to 1/27/2016 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The status conference will be by TELEPHONE. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference. If a call-in conference number is used, Plaintiff shall file a notice in this matter setting forth the call-in information by 1/26/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#308

(#308) ORDER GRANTING IN PART 298 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Only attorneys Voss and Maschhoff have entered an appearance in this matter on behalf of BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. To the extent that other attorneys seek to represent that Defendant in this Court, they must enter an appearance. At no time have Attorneys Hatch or Ward entered an appearance in this matter. If an attorney seeks to withdraw, that attorney must file the appropriate motion. The parties should also review CM/ECF guidelines for redaction of signatures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/19/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

306 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#316) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 309 Notice of Hearing,, Notice to Counsel of Status Conference (Hulla, Timothy) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#315) ANSWER to 303 Amended Complaint and Affirmatived Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid System Corporation.(Hill, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#314) ANSWER to 303 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hill, Keith) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#313) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , General and Specific, filed by General Electric Company [Doc. 11], Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company [Doc. 19], and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CBS Corporation [Doc. 62]. MOOTING First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by General Electric Company [Doc. 310]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/19/2016. (mah) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#312) ORDER MOOTING Motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V filed by Aurora Pump Company 71 and Motion to Dismiss Spoliation Claims filed by Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co. 25 per the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/19/2016. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#311) ANSWER to 303 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#310) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by General Electric Company. Responses due by 2/22/2016 (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#309) NOTICE of Hearing: Due to the Court's trial schedule, the Status Conference originally set for 1/20/16 is RESET to 1/27/2016 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The status conference will be by TELEPHONE. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference. If a call-in conference number is used, Plaintiff shall file a notice in this matter setting forth the call-in information by 1/26/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#308) ORDER GRANTING IN PART 298 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Only attorneys Voss and Maschhoff have entered an appearance in this matter on behalf of BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. To the extent that other attorneys seek to represent that Defendant in this Court, they must enter an appearance. At no time have Attorneys Hatch or Ward entered an appearance in this matter. If an attorney seeks to withdraw, that attorney must file the appropriate motion. The parties should also review CM/ECF guidelines for redaction of signatures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/19/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#307) ORDER MOOTING 18 21 30 31 38 98 199 200 207 260 261 262 263 264 265 266 267 268 269 270 271 272 273 274 275 276 277 278 279 280 281 282 283 284 285 286 287 288 289 290 291 292 293 294 295 296 per the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/19/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
296 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINDER by General Electric Company. Joinder in 1 Notice of Removal,,,, and Notice of Removal Based on Assertion of Independent Federal Officer Grounds for Jurisdiction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories)(Fournie, Raymond) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Hulla on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hulla, Timothy) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 15-830-SMY-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (slh) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit Madison County, case number 15-L-796 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2684216), filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Pantaleoni, # 3 Exhibit 3: Affidavit of Sargent Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 4: Affidavit of Sargent Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 5: Affidavit of Sargent Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 6: Affidavit of Sargent Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 7: Affidavit of Sargent Part 5, # 8 Exhibit 8: Affidavit of Forman Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 9: Affidavit of Forman Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 10: Affidavit of Forman Part 3, # 11 Exhibit 11: Affidavit of Forman Part 4, # 12 Exhibit 12: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet 13: Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Exhibit 14: State Court Docket Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 15: State Court Docket Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 16: State Court Docket Part 3, # 17 Exhibit 17: State Court Docket Part 4, # 18 Exhibit 18: State Court Docket Part 5, # 19 Exhibit 19: State Court Docket Part 6, # 20 Exhibit 20: State Court Docket Part 7)(Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.