This case was last updated from PACER on 06/24/2016 at 09:38:39 (UTC).

Bay Area Toll Authority v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2014 Bay Area Toll Authority filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-03094

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Berkshire Bank

Bay Area Toll Authority

Direcors Financial Group

Defendants

Portigon AG

BBA Enterprises Ltd.

HSBC Holdings plc

Credit Suisse Group AG

Lloyds Banking Group plc

Royal Bank of Canada

UBS AG

Bank of America Corporation

HBOS PLC

Deutsche Bank AG

British Bankers Association

Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.

WestDeutsche Immobilienbank AG

JPMorgan & Chase Co.

Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.

The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc

HSBC Bank PLC

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein,LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Brendan Patrick Glackin

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, NY 94111

Marc Pilotin

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann and Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Defendant Attorneys

Jeff G. Hammel

Attorney at Latham and Watkins (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Lilia Borislavova Vazova

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gregory Thomas Casamento

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP (NYC)

3 World Financial Center, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Kevin Timothy Baumann

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (nyc)

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jessica Lillian Brach

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Moses Silverman

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Mark David Villaverde

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP (NYC)

1 Chase Manhattan Plaza

New York, NY 10005

Melanie Westover Yanez

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP (NYC)

1 Chase Manhattan Plaza

New York, NY 10005

Omari Largos Royter Mason

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017

Thomas C. Rice

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Jeffery Li Ding

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave.

New York, NY 10017

Shannon Price Torres

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Paul Christopher Gluckow

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Fraser Lee Hunter, Jr

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP (NYC)

7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

Other Attorneys

Alan M. Unger

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Andrew W. Stern

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Kenneth Benjamin Meyer

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP(NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#114

(#114) CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (127 in 1:13-cv-07394-NRB, 164 in 1:11-cv-06409-NRB, 152 in 1:13-cv-05186-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00625-NRB, 96 in 1:11-cv-05638-NRB, 69 in 1:11-cv-05927-NRB, 145 in 1:13-cv-05569-NRB, 97 in 1:13-cv-01198-NRB, 251 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 145 in 1:13-cv-05221-NRB, 173 in 1:13-cv-07005-NRB, 154 in 1:13-cv-03952-NRB, 73 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 88 in 1:13-cv-02343-NRB, 94 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 94 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB, 155 in 1:13-cv-05616-NRB, 169 in 1:11-cv-06411-NRB, 125 in 1:13-cv-08644-NRB, 81 in 1:13-cv-03010-NRB, 59 in 1:12-cv-04205-NRB, 1015 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 159 in 1:13-cv-00626-NRB, 69 in 1:14-cv-04189-NRB, 88 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 161 in 1:13-cv-00597-NRB, 152 in 1:13-cv-05187-NRB, 79 in 1:13-cv-05511-NRB, 113 in 1:14-cv-01757-NRB, 121 in 1:13-cv-06013-NRB, 72 in 1:11-cv-03128-NRB, 101 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB, 84 in 1:12-cv-06056-NRB, 36 in 1:14-cv-07720-NRB, 98 in 1:12-cv-01025-NRB, 122 in 1:13-cv-00598-NRB, 88 in 1:11-cv-05640-NRB, 70 in 1:13-cv-08799-NRB, 69 in 1:13-cv-01456-NRB, 123 in 1:12-cv-05723-NRB, 73 in 1:11-cv-02883-NRB, 113 in 1:14-cv-03094-NRB, 51 in 1:11-cv-07715-NRB, 53 in 1:11-cv-07676-NRB, 102 in 1:11-cv-05641-NRB, 121 in 1:13-cv-06014-NRB, 94 in 1:13-cv-00407-NRB, 78 in 1:11-cv-05931-NRB, 73 in 1:12-cv-07461-NRB, 104 in 1:13-cv-01016-NRB, 64 in 1:11-cv-05930-NRB, 174 in 1:11-cv-06412-NRB, 75 in 1:11-cv-05928-NRB, 159 in 1:13-cv-00627-NRB, 74 in 1:11-cv-05929-NRB, 193 in 1:13-cv-02297-NRB, 73 in 1:11-cv-03249-NRB, 97 in 1:13-cv-06020-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00667-NRB, 96 in 1:13-cv-07720-NRB) Notice of Appeal, (71 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 1008 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 99 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB, 86 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 249 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 92 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 91 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB) Order,,,, (250 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB) Clerk's Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#113

(#113) FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10592956. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) Modified on 2/13/2015 (tp). (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER terminating (396) Motion for Reconsideration; denying (418) Motion for Reconsideration; terminating (428) Motion to Strike; denying (453) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (507) Motion to Dismiss; granting (516) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-md-02262-NRB. For the reasons stated above, exchange-based plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of our ruling on trader-based claims is denied, but their motion for leave to amend their complaint is granted; defendants' motion to dismiss CEA claims on scienter grounds is denied; defendants' motion to dismiss CEA claims arising out of contracts purchased between May 30, 2008 and April 14, 2009 is granted; defendants' motion to dismiss OTC plaintiffs' contract and unjust enrichment claims is granted in part and denied in part; and defendant Societe Generale's motion to dismiss the exchange-based plaintiffs' complaint is granted. It has been nearly two years since defendants first moved to dismiss plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaints. Since then, this Court has issued three major opinions and the parties have submitted hundreds, if not thousands, of pages of briefing materials, all in an attempt to resolve the threshold question of any litigation: what claims, if any, have plaintiffs adequately pled? Now, at long last, there is clarity. OTC plaintiffs may state claims for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, and claims for unjust enrichment, but only against those defendant banks with which OTC plaintiffs transacted directly. Exchange-based plaintiffs may state claims under the CEA based on contracts purchased between April 15, 2009 and the end of the Class Period, based on a theory that defendants' alleged persistent suppression of LIBOR caused them damages; however, no such claim may lie against Societe Generale, as those claims are time barred. Exchange-based plaintiffs may also state claims against Barclays and Rabobank based on the alleged day-to-day, trader-based manipulation that occurred between January 1, 2005 and August 2007. This Memorandum and Order resolves docket entry nos. 396, 418, 428, 453, 507, and 516. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al. ***Docketed in all member and related cases pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mro). (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#115

(#115) ORDER: Individual plaintiffs in eighteen cases (see appendix) have requested the entry of partial judgment in order to allow them to participate in the pending appeal from final judgment in Gelboim v. Credit Suisse Group AG, No. 12-cv-1025. See Leveridge Letter, MDL ECF No. 1018. For the reasons expressed in the Orders of March 29, 2013 (MDL ECF No. 286), August 23, 2013 (MDL ECF No. 389), October 17, 2013 (MDL ECF No. 490), and February 5, 2015 (MDL ECF No. 1008), and in open court on February 5, 2015, these requests are granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter partial judgments pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to the Sherman Act claims listed in the appendix. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 02/17/2015)

#117

(#117) CLERK'S PARTIAL JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated February 13, 2015, the requests are granted; there is no just reason for delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), partial judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants as to the Sherman Act claims listed in the appendix. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/23/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(dt) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 3/31/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation; Bank Of America, N.A.; Bank Of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.; Barclays Bank plc; Citigroup, Inc.; Citigroup Financial Products, Inc; Citibank, N.A.; Coperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.; Credit Suisse Group AG; Deutsche Bank AG; HSBC Holdings plc; HSBC Bank plc; JPMorgan Chase & Co.; JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association; Lloyds Banking Group Plc; HBOS Plc; Royal Bank Of Canada; The Norinchukin Bank; The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc; UBS AG; Portigon AG (f/k/a Westlb AG); Westdeutsche Immobilienbank AG; British Bankers Association; BBA Enterprises Ltd.; BBA LIBOR Ltd. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8494872.). Filed byBay Area Toll Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 3/31/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#119

(#119) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Oral Argument held on 2/5/2015 re: (752 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) MOTION to Dismiss . NOTICE OF DEFENDANT SOCIETE GENERALE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINTS. filed by Societe Generale, (743 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) MOTION to Dismiss Direct Action Claims. filed by The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., Barclays Capital Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citibank, N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse AG, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Portigon AG, HBOS plc, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, HSBC Bank plc, RBS Citizens, N.A., BBA Enterprises, Ltd., Barclays PLC, Merrill Lynch & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation, Ltd., CITI SWAPCO INC., Credit Suisse Group AG, The Norinchukin Bank, WestDeutsche Immobilienbank AG, RBS Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., UBS AG, Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd., HBOS PLC, HSBC USA Inc., Chase Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Bank plc, British Bankers Association, Lloyds Bank PLC (formerly known as Lloyds TSB Bank PLC), Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Funding Inc., Credit Suisse (USA) Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., HSBC Holdings plc, Societe Generale, Bank of America, N.A., HBOS Plc, Citigroup, Inc., Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Harris, Karen) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

#120

(#120) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from (1053 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) Clerk's Judgment,,. Document filed by Bay Area Toll Authority. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10699545. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 1:14-cv-03094-NRB(Fineman, Steven) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#116

(#116) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (174 in 1:13-cv-07005-NRB, 99 in 1:12-cv-01025-NRB, 75 in 1:11-cv-03128-NRB, 153 in 1:13-cv-05187-NRB, 114 in 1:14-cv-03094-NRB, 156 in 1:13-cv-05616-NRB, 128 in 1:13-cv-07394-NRB, 76 in 1:11-cv-02883-NRB, 170 in 1:11-cv-06411-NRB, 54 in 1:11-cv-07676-NRB, 153 in 1:13-cv-05186-NRB, 105 in 1:13-cv-01016-NRB, 161 in 1:13-cv-00667-NRB, 114 in 1:14-cv-01757-NRB, 97 in 1:13-cv-07720-NRB, 1019 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00626-NRB, 89 in 1:11-cv-05640-NRB, 161 in 1:13-cv-00625-NRB, 75 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 37 in 1:14-cv-07720-NRB, 76 in 1:11-cv-05928-NRB, 82 in 1:13-cv-03010-NRB, 60 in 1:12-cv-04205-NRB, 70 in 1:14-cv-04189-NRB, 95 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 98 in 1:13-cv-06020-NRB, 89 in 1:13-cv-02343-NRB, 175 in 1:11-cv-06412-NRB, 75 in 1:11-cv-05929-NRB, 253 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 70 in 1:13-cv-01456-NRB, 95 in 1:13-cv-00407-NRB, 80 in 1:13-cv-05511-NRB, 162 in 1:13-cv-00597-NRB, 123 in 1:13-cv-00598-NRB, 70 in 1:11-cv-05927-NRB, 165 in 1:11-cv-06409-NRB, 65 in 1:11-cv-05930-NRB, 54 in 1:11-cv-07715-NRB, 89 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 126 in 1:13-cv-08644-NRB, 102 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB, 122 in 1:13-cv-06013-NRB, 71 in 1:13-cv-08799-NRB, 194 in 1:13-cv-02297-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00627-NRB, 97 in 1:11-cv-05638-NRB, 146 in 1:13-cv-05221-NRB, 95 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB, 74 in 1:12-cv-07461-NRB, 85 in 1:12-cv-06056-NRB, 122 in 1:13-cv-06014-NRB, 79 in 1:11-cv-05931-NRB, 98 in 1:13-cv-01198-NRB, 76 in 1:11-cv-03249-NRB, 146 in 1:13-cv-05569-NRB, 155 in 1:13-cv-03952-NRB, 103 in 1:11-cv-05641-NRB, 124 in 1:12-cv-05723-NRB) Corrected Notice of Appeal,,,,,,, (1024 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 96 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 90 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 96 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB, 254 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 76 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 104 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB) Clerk's Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#7

(#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to BBA Enterprises Ltd., BBA LIBOR Ltd., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Barclays Bank PLC, British Bankers' Association, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HBOS PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, JPMorgan & Chase Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Portigon AG, Royal Bank of Canada, The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, UBS AG, Westdeutsche Immobilienbank AG. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#8

(#8) MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:14-cv-01493. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#121

(#121) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William Christopher Carmody dated March 16, 2015 re: OTC plaintiffs' request to add Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc. as a named plaintiff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#118

(#118) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeffrey T. Scott dated February 24, 2015 re: Response to the Direct Action Plaintiffs' Letter of February 19, 2015. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William Christopher Carmody dated March 16, 2015 re: OTC plaintiffs' request to add Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc. as a named plaintiff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from (1053 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) Clerk's Judgment,,. Document filed by Bay Area Toll Authority. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10699545. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 1:14-cv-03094-NRB(Fineman, Steven) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Oral Argument held on 2/5/2015 re: (752 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) MOTION to Dismiss . NOTICE OF DEFENDANT SOCIETE GENERALE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINTS. filed by Societe Generale, (743 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) MOTION to Dismiss Direct Action Claims. filed by The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., Barclays Capital Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citibank, N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse AG, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Portigon AG, HBOS plc, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, HSBC Bank plc, RBS Citizens, N.A., BBA Enterprises, Ltd., Barclays PLC, Merrill Lynch & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation, Ltd., CITI SWAPCO INC., Credit Suisse Group AG, The Norinchukin Bank, WestDeutsche Immobilienbank AG, RBS Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., UBS AG, Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd., HBOS PLC, HSBC USA Inc., Chase Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Bank plc, British Bankers Association, Lloyds Bank PLC (formerly known as Lloyds TSB Bank PLC), Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Funding Inc., Credit Suisse (USA) Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc, JPMorgan Chase & Co., HSBC Holdings plc, Societe Generale, Bank of America, N.A., HBOS Plc, Citigroup, Inc., Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Harris, Karen) (Entered: 02/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeffrey T. Scott dated February 24, 2015 re: Response to the Direct Action Plaintiffs' Letter of February 19, 2015. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) CLERK'S PARTIAL JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated February 13, 2015, the requests are granted; there is no just reason for delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), partial judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants as to the Sherman Act claims listed in the appendix. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/23/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(dt) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (174 in 1:13-cv-07005-NRB, 99 in 1:12-cv-01025-NRB, 75 in 1:11-cv-03128-NRB, 153 in 1:13-cv-05187-NRB, 114 in 1:14-cv-03094-NRB, 156 in 1:13-cv-05616-NRB, 128 in 1:13-cv-07394-NRB, 76 in 1:11-cv-02883-NRB, 170 in 1:11-cv-06411-NRB, 54 in 1:11-cv-07676-NRB, 153 in 1:13-cv-05186-NRB, 105 in 1:13-cv-01016-NRB, 161 in 1:13-cv-00667-NRB, 114 in 1:14-cv-01757-NRB, 97 in 1:13-cv-07720-NRB, 1019 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00626-NRB, 89 in 1:11-cv-05640-NRB, 161 in 1:13-cv-00625-NRB, 75 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 37 in 1:14-cv-07720-NRB, 76 in 1:11-cv-05928-NRB, 82 in 1:13-cv-03010-NRB, 60 in 1:12-cv-04205-NRB, 70 in 1:14-cv-04189-NRB, 95 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 98 in 1:13-cv-06020-NRB, 89 in 1:13-cv-02343-NRB, 175 in 1:11-cv-06412-NRB, 75 in 1:11-cv-05929-NRB, 253 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 70 in 1:13-cv-01456-NRB, 95 in 1:13-cv-00407-NRB, 80 in 1:13-cv-05511-NRB, 162 in 1:13-cv-00597-NRB, 123 in 1:13-cv-00598-NRB, 70 in 1:11-cv-05927-NRB, 165 in 1:11-cv-06409-NRB, 65 in 1:11-cv-05930-NRB, 54 in 1:11-cv-07715-NRB, 89 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 126 in 1:13-cv-08644-NRB, 102 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB, 122 in 1:13-cv-06013-NRB, 71 in 1:13-cv-08799-NRB, 194 in 1:13-cv-02297-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00627-NRB, 97 in 1:11-cv-05638-NRB, 146 in 1:13-cv-05221-NRB, 95 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB, 74 in 1:12-cv-07461-NRB, 85 in 1:12-cv-06056-NRB, 122 in 1:13-cv-06014-NRB, 79 in 1:11-cv-05931-NRB, 98 in 1:13-cv-01198-NRB, 76 in 1:11-cv-03249-NRB, 146 in 1:13-cv-05569-NRB, 155 in 1:13-cv-03952-NRB, 103 in 1:11-cv-05641-NRB, 124 in 1:12-cv-05723-NRB) Corrected Notice of Appeal,,,,,,, (1024 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 96 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 90 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 96 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB, 254 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 76 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 104 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB) Clerk's Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) ORDER: Individual plaintiffs in eighteen cases (see appendix) have requested the entry of partial judgment in order to allow them to participate in the pending appeal from final judgment in Gelboim v. Credit Suisse Group AG, No. 12-cv-1025. See Leveridge Letter, MDL ECF No. 1018. For the reasons expressed in the Orders of March 29, 2013 (MDL ECF No. 286), August 23, 2013 (MDL ECF No. 389), October 17, 2013 (MDL ECF No. 490), and February 5, 2015 (MDL ECF No. 1008), and in open court on February 5, 2015, these requests are granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter partial judgments pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to the Sherman Act claims listed in the appendix. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 02/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (127 in 1:13-cv-07394-NRB, 164 in 1:11-cv-06409-NRB, 152 in 1:13-cv-05186-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00625-NRB, 96 in 1:11-cv-05638-NRB, 69 in 1:11-cv-05927-NRB, 145 in 1:13-cv-05569-NRB, 97 in 1:13-cv-01198-NRB, 251 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 145 in 1:13-cv-05221-NRB, 173 in 1:13-cv-07005-NRB, 154 in 1:13-cv-03952-NRB, 73 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 88 in 1:13-cv-02343-NRB, 94 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 94 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB, 155 in 1:13-cv-05616-NRB, 169 in 1:11-cv-06411-NRB, 125 in 1:13-cv-08644-NRB, 81 in 1:13-cv-03010-NRB, 59 in 1:12-cv-04205-NRB, 1015 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 159 in 1:13-cv-00626-NRB, 69 in 1:14-cv-04189-NRB, 88 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 161 in 1:13-cv-00597-NRB, 152 in 1:13-cv-05187-NRB, 79 in 1:13-cv-05511-NRB, 113 in 1:14-cv-01757-NRB, 121 in 1:13-cv-06013-NRB, 72 in 1:11-cv-03128-NRB, 101 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB, 84 in 1:12-cv-06056-NRB, 36 in 1:14-cv-07720-NRB, 98 in 1:12-cv-01025-NRB, 122 in 1:13-cv-00598-NRB, 88 in 1:11-cv-05640-NRB, 70 in 1:13-cv-08799-NRB, 69 in 1:13-cv-01456-NRB, 123 in 1:12-cv-05723-NRB, 73 in 1:11-cv-02883-NRB, 113 in 1:14-cv-03094-NRB, 51 in 1:11-cv-07715-NRB, 53 in 1:11-cv-07676-NRB, 102 in 1:11-cv-05641-NRB, 121 in 1:13-cv-06014-NRB, 94 in 1:13-cv-00407-NRB, 78 in 1:11-cv-05931-NRB, 73 in 1:12-cv-07461-NRB, 104 in 1:13-cv-01016-NRB, 64 in 1:11-cv-05930-NRB, 174 in 1:11-cv-06412-NRB, 75 in 1:11-cv-05928-NRB, 159 in 1:13-cv-00627-NRB, 74 in 1:11-cv-05929-NRB, 193 in 1:13-cv-02297-NRB, 73 in 1:11-cv-03249-NRB, 97 in 1:13-cv-06020-NRB, 160 in 1:13-cv-00667-NRB, 96 in 1:13-cv-07720-NRB) Notice of Appeal, (71 in 1:12-cv-06693-NRB, 1008 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 99 in 1:13-cv-01135-NRB, 86 in 1:13-cv-00346-NRB, 249 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB, 92 in 1:13-cv-00398-NRB, 91 in 1:12-cv-05822-NRB) Order,,,, (250 in 1:11-cv-02613-NRB) Clerk's Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10592956. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Carmody, William) Modified on 2/13/2015 (tp). (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) NOTICE of Amended Declaration of Patrick Gonsalves in Support of Barclays Bank PLC's Motion to Dismiss Certain Direct Actions for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re: (759 in 1:11-md-02262-NRB) Declaration in Support of Motion. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Declaration of Patrick Gonsalves in Support of Barclays Bank PLC's Motion to Dismiss Certain Direct Actions for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.(Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE: Within the next ten days, the Court will issue a communication addressing issues related to the next steps in this litigation and inviting submissions from the parties. Before receiving our communication, counsel are directed not to make any submissions to the Court. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/2/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al. ***Docketed in all member and related cases pursuant to instructions from Chambers.(mro) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER terminating (396) Motion for Reconsideration; denying (418) Motion for Reconsideration; terminating (428) Motion to Strike; denying (453) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (507) Motion to Dismiss; granting (516) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:11-md-02262-NRB. For the reasons stated above, exchange-based plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of our ruling on trader-based claims is denied, but their motion for leave to amend their complaint is granted; defendants' motion to dismiss CEA claims on scienter grounds is denied; defendants' motion to dismiss CEA claims arising out of contracts purchased between May 30, 2008 and April 14, 2009 is granted; defendants' motion to dismiss OTC plaintiffs' contract and unjust enrichment claims is granted in part and denied in part; and defendant Societe Generale's motion to dismiss the exchange-based plaintiffs' complaint is granted. It has been nearly two years since defendants first moved to dismiss plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaints. Since then, this Court has issued three major opinions and the parties have submitted hundreds, if not thousands, of pages of briefing materials, all in an attempt to resolve the threshold question of any litigation: what claims, if any, have plaintiffs adequately pled? Now, at long last, there is clarity. OTC plaintiffs may state claims for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, and claims for unjust enrichment, but only against those defendant banks with which OTC plaintiffs transacted directly. Exchange-based plaintiffs may state claims under the CEA based on contracts purchased between April 15, 2009 and the end of the Class Period, based on a theory that defendants' alleged persistent suppression of LIBOR caused them damages; however, no such claim may lie against Societe Generale, as those claims are time barred. Exchange-based plaintiffs may also state claims against Barclays and Rabobank based on the alleged day-to-day, trader-based manipulation that occurred between January 1, 2005 and August 2007. This Memorandum and Order resolves docket entry nos. 396, 418, 428, 453, 507, and 516. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al. ***Docketed in all member and related cases pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mro). (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:14-cv-01493. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to BBA Enterprises Ltd., BBA LIBOR Ltd., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Barclays Bank PLC, British Bankers' Association, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, HBOS PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, JPMorgan & Chase Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Portigon AG, Royal Bank of Canada, The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, UBS AG, Westdeutsche Immobilienbank AG. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 3/31/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation; Bank Of America, N.A.; Bank Of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.; Barclays Bank plc; Citigroup, Inc.; Citigroup Financial Products, Inc; Citibank, N.A.; Coperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.; Credit Suisse Group AG; Deutsche Bank AG; HSBC Holdings plc; HSBC Bank plc; JPMorgan Chase & Co.; JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association; Lloyds Banking Group Plc; HBOS Plc; Royal Bank Of Canada; The Norinchukin Bank; The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc; UBS AG; Portigon AG (f/k/a Westlb AG); Westdeutsche Immobilienbank AG; British Bankers Association; BBA Enterprises Ltd.; BBA LIBOR Ltd. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8494872.). Filed byBay Area Toll Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 3/31/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/1/2014.] (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.