This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 08:42:03 (UTC).

Barbosa et al v. DIRECTV, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 Barbosa filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DIRECTV, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-13896

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laszlo Kakuk

Jose Barbosa

Juan Leiniz

Defendants

DIRECTV, Inc.

Multiband Corp.

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan D. O'Dell

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Suite 1750, 550 West C

San Diego, CA 92101

George A. Hanson

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Harold L. Lichten

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Matthew W. Thomson

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Tiliakos

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

Natalie Hrubos

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

Bronwyn L. Roberts

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110-1724

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of George Hanson and Ryan O'Dell Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-5289110 by Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Hanson, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of O'Dell)(Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#5

(#5) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George A. Hanson and Ryan D. O'Dell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of DIRECTV, Inc. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed DIRECTV, Inc. served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Hanson, George) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed DIRECTV, LLC served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Hanson, George) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#15

(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST MULTIBAND by Multiband Corp..(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST MULTIBAND filed by Multiband Corp.. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Thomson on behalf of Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz (Thomson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

#18

(#18) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Natalie F. Hrubos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5402637 by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Multiband Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#19

(#19) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Tiliakos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5402660 by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Multiband Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#20

(#20) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Natalie F. Hrubos and 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Tiliakos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#22

(#22) Opposition re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST MULTIBAND, 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST DIRECTV filed by Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz. (Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandums of Law in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Multiband Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandums of Law in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Multiband Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Opposition re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST MULTIBAND, 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST DIRECTV filed by Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz. (Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Jose Barbosa Notice of Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Dell, Ryan) (Entered: 02/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Natalie F. Hrubos and 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Tiliakos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Tiliakos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5402660 by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Multiband Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Natalie F. Hrubos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5402637 by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Multiband Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Thomson on behalf of Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz (Thomson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST MULTIBAND filed by Multiband Corp.. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST MULTIBAND by Multiband Corp..(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST DIRECTV filed by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed Multiband Corp. served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Hanson, George) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed DIRECTV, LLC served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Hanson, George) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed DIRECTV, Inc. served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Hanson, George) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of DIRECTV, Inc. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George A. Hanson and Ryan D. O'Dell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of George Hanson and Ryan O'Dell Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-5289110 by Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Hanson, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of O'Dell)(Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5238667 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jose Barbosa, Laszlo Kakuk, Juan Leiniz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement Category Sheet)(Lichten, Harold) (Entered: 10/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less