This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 14:23:09 (UTC).

Balderas v. Landau et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2014 Balderas filed an Other lawsuit against Landau. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hector H Balderas

Defendants

Scott Masami Murakami

Vincenzo S. Ammirato, II

American Express Company

Credence Professional Group, Inc.

State Marketing Group

Byron Lee Landau

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Consumer Alliance Referral Center

John and Jane Does

Estate Law Group.com

Danna Jarrard

Ariyo Mackay

Doe Corporations

Arman Khourshidian

Patty Walker

Financial Consulting Corporation

Prime Processing Group, LLC

Bank of America N.A.

Time 2 Settle, Inc.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen J. Meyers

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Drawer 1508

Santa Fe, NM 87504

David C Kramer

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

111 Lomas Nw, Suite 120

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Rebecca C. Branch

Attorney at New Mexico Attorney General's Office

111 Lomas Blvd. Nw, Suite 300

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Borchard

Attorney at Borchard & Callahan, APC

25909 Pala, Suite 300

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Marcus E. Garcia

Attorney at Law Office of Marcus E. Garcia

20 First Plaza, N.W., Suite 717

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Andrew G. Schultz

Attorney at RODEY, DICKASON, SLOAN, AKIN & ROBB, P. A.

201 3Rd Street Nw, Suite 2200

Albuquerque, NM 87102

William R. Keleher

Attorney at Tax, Estate & Business Law, Ltd.

4811 A-4 Hardware Drive, Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Spencer L Edelman

Attorney at Modrall, Sperling, Roehl, Harris, & Sisk, PA

Post Office Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Douglas R. Vadnais

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Po Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Violations of MARS Rule, NM Unfair Practices Act & Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Attorney General State of New Mexico.(Kramer, David) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

#2

(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

#3

(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Gary K King (Kramer, David) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

#4

(#4) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB026675 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/24/2014)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Keleher, William) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Bank of America N.A. re 1 Complaint, 5 Acknowledgment of Service Regarding Agreed Extension (Keleher, William) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#8

(#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of American Express Company (Schultz, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#80

(#80) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America N.A. re 55 Certificate of Service, 53 Certificate of Service (Edelman, Spencer) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

#79

(#79) NOTICE by Hector H Balderas Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Settlement Demand to Defendants Murakami and Mackay and to Defendant Landau (Kramer, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#78

(#78) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America N.A. (Edelman, Spencer) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#77

(#77) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#76

(#76) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Express Company (Schultz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#75

(#75) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO IDENTIFY ITS EXPERTS AND PRODUCE EXPERT REPORTS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline to Identify Its Experts and Produce Expert Reports (Doc. 74) is granted. Plaintiff is to make its expert disclosures by 5/22/2015. Defendants are to make their expert disclosures by 6/22/2015. (kmt) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

#74

(#74) MOTION to Extend (other) Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline to Identify its Experts and Produce Expert Reports by Hector H Balderas. (Kramer, David) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#73

(#73) MOTION for Protective Order by Hector H Balderas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed protective order)(Kramer, David) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#72

(#72) NOTICE by Hector H Balderas Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures from Defendants Murakami and McKay (Kramer, David) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America N.A. re 55 Certificate of Service, 53 Certificate of Service (Edelman, Spencer) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) NOTICE by Hector H Balderas Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Settlement Demand to Defendants Murakami and Mackay and to Defendant Landau (Kramer, David) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America N.A. (Edelman, Spencer) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Express Company (Schultz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO IDENTIFY ITS EXPERTS AND PRODUCE EXPERT REPORTS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline to Identify Its Experts and Produce Expert Reports (Doc. 74) is granted. Plaintiff is to make its expert disclosures by 5/22/2015. Defendants are to make their expert disclosures by 6/22/2015. (kmt) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) MOTION to Extend (other) Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline to Identify its Experts and Produce Expert Reports by Hector H Balderas. (Kramer, David) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) MOTION for Protective Order by Hector H Balderas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed protective order)(Kramer, David) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) NOTICE by Hector H Balderas Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures from Defendants Murakami and McKay (Kramer, David) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Jury Demand of Defendants Murakami and Mackay (Doc. 45) is granted. The jury demands of Defendants Murakami and Mackay are hereby stricken. (kmt) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by American Express Company of Agreed Extension (Schultz, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of American Express Company (Schultz, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Bank of America N.A. re 1 Complaint, 5 Acknowledgment of Service Regarding Agreed Extension (Keleher, William) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Keleher, William) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB026675 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Gary K King (Kramer, David) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Violations of MARS Rule, NM Unfair Practices Act & Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Attorney General State of New Mexico.(Kramer, David) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.