This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2016 at 15:49:38 (UTC).

Bakko Bros., Inc., Genesis III, Inc. Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 Bakko Bros , Inc , Genesis III, Inc was filed as an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Stephanie M. Rose

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bakko Bros., Inc.

Genesis III, Inc.

Defendant

Jacobs Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brett J Trout

Attorney at BRETT J. TROUT, P.C.

516 Walnut Street

Desmoines, IA 50309

Alexander JSW Johnson

Attorney at HAMILTON IP LAW

201 W. Second Street, Suite 400

Davenport, IA 52801

Charles A. Damschen

Attorney at HAMILTON IP LAW

201 W. Second Street, Suite 400

Davenport, IA 52801

Jay R Hamilton

Attorney at HAMILTON IP LAW

201 W. Second Street, Suite 400

Davenport, IA 52801

Nathan Andrew Russell

Attorney at BRANSTAD LAW

2501 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50312

Defendant Attorney

Stephen R Eckley

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#32

#33

#34

#35

#36

#37

#38

#39

#40

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND/OR FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTING NEW DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 5/8/2017 at 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 145 - 1st Floor South before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Est. 15 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 11:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/20/2016. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/21/2016. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 8/22/2016. Dispositive motions due by 9/21/2016. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 2/29/2016. (kln) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) TEXT ORDER: ORDER denying without prejudice 35 Joint Motion for Protective Order. There is an existing protective order in the case 16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 2/26/2016. (kln) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R): Status Conference held on 2/26/2016. Attorney Brett Trout appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Stephen Eckley appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate order to follow. Total Court Time: 1 hr. 40 minutes. (kln) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 36 Joint Request for Status Conference. In-Person Status Conference is set for 2/26/2016 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters(R) on 2/16/2016. (kln) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION Joint Motion for Status Conference by Jacobs Corp..Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 2/29/2016 (Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jacobs Corp..Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 2/29/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) TEXT ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexander JSW Johnson. Signed by Clerk Marjorie E. Krahn on 12/2/2015. (mlp) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2791180 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Genesis III, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 31 joint motion to modify scheduling order and discovery plan. Defendant's expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) are due by 9/30/2015. Plaintiff's rebuttal expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) are due by 10/30/2015. Discovery shall close by 2/29/2016. Dispositive motions are due by 3/31/2016. Final pretrial is continued to 9/1/2016 at 11:00 AM. Jury trial before Judge Rose is continued to 9/19/2016 at 9:00 AM at the Des Moines Courthouse. Estimated length of trial is 15 days. Counsel should note this case is the second case set during that trial-setting period. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters (R) on 8/20/2015. (kln) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN of def experts,pltf rebuttal,discovery,dispositive motions,trial readiness by Jacobs Corp..Motions referred to Ross A Walters (R). Responses due by 9/8/2015 (Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Discovery Plan FRCP 16 & FRCP 26(f)(3) by Bakko Bros., Inc., Genesis III, Inc..Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/7/2014 (Trout, Brett) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Jacobs Corp.. (Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER: On April 28, 2014, the Court entered an order 4 directing Plaintiffs and Defendant to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Local Rule 7.1 requires that a disclosure statement be filed on the form attached to the Local Rules as appendix A (the form is also available on the courts website). The disclosure statement was to be filed by May 12, 2014, and as of this date, Defendant has not complied with that order. Defendant shall have until June 24, 2014, to comply with the April 28, 2014 order. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 6/10/2014. (nsr) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GIVING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Rule 16 Dismissal deadline set for 6/23/2014.. Signed by Clerk Marjorie Krahn on 6/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 LR 41, # 2 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discover Plan) (sk, ) (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Genesis III, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bakko Bros., Inc.. (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER: A review of the docket reveals that neither Plaintiffs nor Defendant has filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement as required by Local Rule 7.1. Local Rule 7.1 requires that a disclosure statement be filed on the form attached to the Local Rules as appendix A (the form is also available on the courts website). Bakko Bros., Inc.; Genesis III, Inc.; and Jacobs Corp. are each given until May 12, 2014, to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Local Rule 7.1.Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 4/28/2014. (nsr) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint by Jacobs Corp..(Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (sk, ) (Entered: 01/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT Plaintiffs against Jacobs Corp. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-2222594., filed by Bakko Bros., Inc., Genesis III, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/15/2014. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F)(Trout, Brett) (Entered: 01/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen R. Eckley