This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:30:24 (UTC).

Azure Networks LLC v. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2015 Azure Networks LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azure Networks LLC

Defendants

Toshiba Corporation

Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kirk Austin Voss

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach, LLP - Irving

5215 North O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Michael A. Benefield

Attorney at Albritton Law Firm

222 North Fredonia, P O Box 2649 - 75606

Longview, TX 75601

Eric M. Albritton

Attorney at Albritton Law Firm

222 North Fredonia, P O Box 2649 - 75606

Longview, TX 75601

Edward K Chin

Attorney at Albritton Law Firm - Longview

P O Box 2649

Longview, TX 75606

Ross Leonoudakis

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach, LLP - Irving

5215 North O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Andrew Joseph Wright

Attorney at Bruster PLLC

P O Box 92091

Southlake, TX 76092

Richard Benjamin King

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach LLP - Texarkana

2900 Saint Michael Drive, Suite 500

Texarkana, TX 75503

Robert Winn Cutler

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach, LLP - Irving

5215 North O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Derek Tod Gilliland

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach LLP - Daingerfield

205 Linda Drive

Daingerfield, TX 75638

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy R Geiger

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani LLP - Houston

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002-2770

Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani - Seattle

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6200

Seattle, WA 98104

Douglas F Stewart

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani - Seattle

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6200

Seattle, WA 98104

Andrew W Zeve

Attorney at Bracewell & Giuliani LLP - Houston

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002-2770

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward K Chin on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Chin, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirk Austin Voss on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Voss, Kirk) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Joseph Wright on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Benefield, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#24

(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba Corporation (Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#27

(#27) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15-cv-18 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/08/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#25

(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, by Toshiba Corporation.(Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy R Geiger on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Geiger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Schuettenhelm, Jared) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4999372.), filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A US7756129B2, # 2 Exhibit B US8582570B2, # 3 Exhibit C US8582571B2, # 4 Exhibit D US8588196B2, # 5 Exhibit E US8588231B2, # 6 Exhibit F US8589599B1, # 7 Exhibit G US8675590B2, # 8 Exhibit H US8683092B1, # 9 Exhibit I US8732347B2, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#26

(#26) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew J. Wright as Attorney of Record, and Request for Termination of His Electronic Notices by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Joseph Wright terminated as counsel for Azure. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/7/15. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc..(Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Azure Networks LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Joseph Wright terminated as counsel for Azure. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/7/15. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15-cv-18 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/08/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew J. Wright as Attorney of Record, and Request for Termination of His Electronic Notices by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba Corporation (Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc..(Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, by Toshiba Corporation.(Stewart, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy R Geiger on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Geiger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Schuettenhelm, Jared) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeve, Andrew) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Joseph Wright on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirk Austin Voss on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Voss, Kirk) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward K Chin on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Chin, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Azure Networks LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Benefield, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4999372.), filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A US7756129B2, # 2 Exhibit B US8582570B2, # 3 Exhibit C US8582571B2, # 4 Exhibit D US8588196B2, # 5 Exhibit E US8588231B2, # 6 Exhibit F US8589599B1, # 7 Exhibit G US8675590B2, # 8 Exhibit H US8683092B1, # 9 Exhibit I US8732347B2, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.