This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:27:17 (UTC).

Azure Networks LLC v. LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2015 Azure Networks LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azure Networks LLC

Defendants

LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.

LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.

LG Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kirk Austin Voss

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach, LLP - Irving

5215 North O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Michael Aaron Benefield

Attorney at Benefield Law

P O Box 4296

Longview, TX 75606-4296

Eric M. Albritton

Attorney at Albritton Law Firm

222 North Fredonia, P O Box 2649 - 75606

Longview, TX 75601

Edward K Chin

Attorney at Albritton Law Firm - Longview

P O Box 2649

Longview, TX 75606

Ross Leonoudakis

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach, LLP - Irving

5215 North O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Andrew Joseph Wright

Attorney at Bruster PLLC

P O Box 92091

Southlake, TX 76092

Richard Benjamin King

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach LLP - Texarkana

2900 Saint Michael Drive, Suite 500

Texarkana, TX 75503

Robert Winn Cutler

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach, LLP - Irving

5215 North O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Derek Tod Gilliland

Attorney at Nix Patterson & Roach LLP - Daingerfield

205 Linda Drive

Daingerfield, TX 75638

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Jason Maiers

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Herbert H Finn

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Rene Trevino

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Joseph Wright on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#27

(#27) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/26/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Benefield, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#28

(#28) NOTICE by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. for Request for Termination of Electornic Notices (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#26

(#26) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15-cv-18 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/08/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Winn Cutler on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Cutler, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirk Austin Voss on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Voss, Kirk) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Azure Networks LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward K Chin on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Chin, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#22

(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew J. Wright as Attorney of Record, and Request for Termination of His Electronic Notices by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement filed by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. for Request for Termination of Electornic Notices (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/26/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15-cv-18 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/08/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement filed by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew J. Wright as Attorney of Record, and Request for Termination of His Electronic Notices by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Dismiss the Inducement of Infringement and Willful Infringement Claims in the Plaintiffs Original Complaint for Infringement by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Winn Cutler on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Cutler, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rene Trevino on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Trevino, Rene) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert H Finn on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Finn, Herbert) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Joseph Wright on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirk Austin Voss on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Voss, Kirk) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward K Chin on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Chin, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Azure Networks LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Benefield, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Azure Networks LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4999307.), filed by Azure Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A US7756129B2, # 2 Exhibit B US8582570B2, # 3 Exhibit C US8582571B2, # 4 Exhibit D US8588196B2, # 5 Exhibit E US8588231B2, # 6 Exhibit F US8589599B1, # 7 Exhibit G US8675590B2, # 8 Exhibit H US8683092B1, # 9 Exhibit I US8700815B2, # 10 Exhibit J US8732347B2, # 11 Exhibit K US8732361B2, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.