This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:24:54 (UTC).

Auto-Dril, Inc. v. Pason Systems USA, Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 Auto-Dril, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Pason Systems USA, Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Jeffrey C. Manske and Judge Walter S. Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Judge Jeffrey C. Manske

Judge

Judge Walter S. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Auto-Dril, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

Pason Systems USA, Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James L. Reed, Jr.

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Michael D. Ellis

Attorney at Gray, Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Russell Erin Jumper

Attorney at Gray Reed, & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

John P. Palmer

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

P.O. Box 1470

Waco, TX 76703-1470

David Greer Henry

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Meagan Glover

Attorney at Gray Reed and McGraw PC

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Hector Raul Chavez, III

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan and Veslka LLP

700 Louisiana - Ste 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Gordon T. Arnold

Attorney at Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, LLP

4900 Woodway, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Jeffrey A. Potts

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, L.L.P.

700 Louisiana, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7290457), filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (mc5) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

#7

(#7) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Auto-Dril, Inc.. Pason Systems USA, Corporation served on 4/17/2015, answer due 5/18/2015. (Reed, James) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#8

(#8) Defendant Pason Systems USA Corp.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses. Attorney Jeffrey A. Potts added to party Pason Systems USA, Corporation(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Dril, Inc. by Pason Systems USA, Corporation.(Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#9

(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#31

(#31) ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division.Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#30

(#30) Letter/Correspondence Gordan T. Arnold of admission status and pro hac vice procedures. (tb) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordon T. Arnold on behalf of Pason Systems USA, Corporation. Attorney Gordon T. Arnold added to party Pason Systems USA, Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Gordon T. Arnold added to party Pason Systems USA, Corporation(pty:dft) (Arnold, Gordon) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meagan Glover on behalf of Auto-Dril, Inc.. Attorney Meagan Glover added to party Auto-Dril, Inc.(pty:pla) (Glover, Meagan) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Filing PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS by Pason Systems USA, Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chavez, Hector) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

#26

(#26) ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDERS that plaintiff Auto-Drill's Motion to Consolidate for Pre-trial purposes be GRANTED and that the three actions specified in this order (No. 6:15-cv-091, No. 6:15-cv-093 and No. 6:15-cv-096) be consolidated under 6:15-cv-091 for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#25

(#25) ORDER DENYING 19 Motion for Reconsideration and this case shall remain in the Western District of Texas, Waco Division. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#24

(#24) Scheduling Recommendations of Plaintiff and Defendant by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation, re 19 MOTION for Reconsideration in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation (Chavez, Hector) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division.Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Letter/Correspondence Gordan T. Arnold of admission status and pro hac vice procedures. (tb) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordon T. Arnold on behalf of Pason Systems USA, Corporation. Attorney Gordon T. Arnold added to party Pason Systems USA, Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Gordon T. Arnold added to party Pason Systems USA, Corporation(pty:dft) (Arnold, Gordon) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meagan Glover on behalf of Auto-Dril, Inc.. Attorney Meagan Glover added to party Auto-Dril, Inc.(pty:pla) (Glover, Meagan) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Filing PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS by Pason Systems USA, Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chavez, Hector) (Entered: 07/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDERS that plaintiff Auto-Drill's Motion to Consolidate for Pre-trial purposes be GRANTED and that the three actions specified in this order (No. 6:15-cv-091, No. 6:15-cv-093 and No. 6:15-cv-096) be consolidated under 6:15-cv-091 for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER DENYING 19 Motion for Reconsideration and this case shall remain in the Western District of Texas, Waco Division. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Scheduling Recommendations of Plaintiff and Defendant by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation, re 19 MOTION for Reconsideration in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation (Chavez, Hector) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION for Reconsideration in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue Pason Systems USA Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply ISO its Motion to Transfer Venue by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Chavez, Hector) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Transfer Case by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant Pason Systems USA Corp.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses. Attorney Jeffrey A. Potts added to party Pason Systems USA, Corporation(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Dril, Inc. by Pason Systems USA, Corporation.(Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Auto-Dril, Inc.. Pason Systems USA, Corporation served on 4/17/2015, answer due 5/18/2015. (Reed, James) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (mc5) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7290457), filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.