This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:22:15 (UTC).

Auto-Dril, Inc. v. National Oilwell Varco, L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 Auto-Dril, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against National Oilwell Varco, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Jeffrey C. Manske and Judge Walter S. Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:15-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Judge Jeffrey C. Manske

Judge

Judge Walter S. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Auto-Dril, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Pason Systems USA, Corporation

Canrig Drilling Technology, Ltd.

National Oilwell Varco, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James L. Reed, Jr.

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Michael D. Ellis

Attorney at Gray, Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Russell Erin Jumper

Attorney at Gray Reed, & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

John P. Palmer

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

P.O. Box 1470

Waco, TX 76703-1470

David Greer Henry

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Meagan Glover

Attorney at Gray Reed and McGraw PC

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Hector Raul Chavez, III

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan and Veslka LLP

700 Louisiana - Ste 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Gordon T. Arnold

Attorney at Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, LLP

4900 Woodway, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Jeffrey A. Potts

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, L.L.P.

700 Louisiana, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Robert M. Bowick

Attorney at Raley & Bowick, LLP

1800 Augusta Drive, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77057

Bradford T. Laney

Attorney at Raley & Bowick, LLP

1800 Augusta Dr., Ste. 300

Houston, TX 77057

John Wesley Raley

Attorney at Raley & Bowick, LLP

1800 Augusta Drive, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7290353), filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. (ad) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#7

(#7) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Auto-Dril, Inc.. National Oilwell Varco, L.P. served on 4/17/2015, answer due 5/18/2015. (Reed, James) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney John Wesley Raley, III added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Dril, Inc. by National Oilwell Varco, L.P..(Raley, John) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M. Bowick on behalf of National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. Attorney Robert M. Bowick added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:cc), Attorney Robert M. Bowick added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:dft) (Bowick, Robert) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#88

(#88) ORDER GRANTING 77 Motion to Transfer Case. ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston division. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#87

(#87) AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#86

(#86) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#85

(#85) NOTICE of Joinder in NOV's and Pason's Replies to Auto-Dril's Response to Motion to Transfer by Canrig Drilling Technology, Ltd. re 83 Reply to Response to Motion, 84 Reply to Response to Motion (Raley, John) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#84

(#84) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by National Oilwell Varco, L.P., re 77 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant National Oilwell Varco, L.P. (tb) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#83

(#83) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation, re 66 MOTION to Join NOV's Motion to Transfer Venue and Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Pason Systems USA, Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#82

(#82) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#81

(#81) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 NOV's Reply to Auto-Dril's Response to Motion to Transfer Venue). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Raley, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#80

(#80) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Auto-Dril, Inc., re 76 MOTION to Join in NOV's Motion to Transfer Venue to Houston or in the Alternative to Texarkana filed by Defendant Canrig Drilling Technology, Ltd., 77 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant National Oilwell Varco, L.P. , and 73 Pason's Supplement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) ORDER GRANTING 77 Motion to Transfer Case. ORDERED that the Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston division. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) NOTICE of Joinder in NOV's and Pason's Replies to Auto-Dril's Response to Motion to Transfer by Canrig Drilling Technology, Ltd. re 83 Reply to Response to Motion, 84 Reply to Response to Motion (Raley, John) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by National Oilwell Varco, L.P., re 77 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant National Oilwell Varco, L.P. (tb) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pason Systems USA, Corporation, re 66 MOTION to Join NOV's Motion to Transfer Venue and Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Pason Systems USA, Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Pason Systems USA, Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Potts, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 NOV's Reply to Auto-Dril's Response to Motion to Transfer Venue). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Raley, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Auto-Dril, Inc., re 76 MOTION to Join in NOV's Motion to Transfer Venue to Houston or in the Alternative to Texarkana filed by Defendant Canrig Drilling Technology, Ltd., 77 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant National Oilwell Varco, L.P. , and 73 Pason's Supplement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Response to Motion to Transfer Venue by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford T. Laney on behalf of National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. Attorney Bradford T. Laney added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:cc), Attorney Bradford T. Laney added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:dft) (Laney, Bradford) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M. Bowick on behalf of National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. Attorney Robert M. Bowick added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:cc), Attorney Robert M. Bowick added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:dft) (Bowick, Robert) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney John Wesley Raley, III added to party National Oilwell Varco, L.P.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Dril, Inc. by National Oilwell Varco, L.P..(Raley, John) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Auto-Dril, Inc.. National Oilwell Varco, L.P. served on 4/17/2015, answer due 5/18/2015. (Reed, James) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. (ad) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7290353), filed by Auto-Dril, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.