This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 08:39:27 (UTC).

Atchafalaya Basinkeeper et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers

Case Summary

On 12/22/2015 Atchafalaya Basinkeeper filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S Army Corps of Engineers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-06982

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West

Gulf Restoration Network

Atchafalaya Basinkeeper

Defendants

U.S. Army Corps of Engineers

Thomas P Bostick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon

Attorney at Tulane Environmental Law Clinic (New Orleans)

6329 Freret St.

New Orleans, LA 70118

Adam Babich

Attorney at Tulane Environmental Law Clinic (New Orleans)

6329 Freret St.

New Orleans, LA 70118

Defendant Attorneys

Reuben Stolov Schifman

Attorney at U. S. Department of Justice (Environment & Natural Resources

601 D Street, Nw, Room 3131

Washington, DC 20004

John E. Sullivan

Attorney at U. S. Department of Justice (Environmental Enforcement)

P. O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Thomas P Bostick served on 1/19/2016, answer due 3/21/2016. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5159905) filed by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Gulf Restoration Network Inc., Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dean's Certification for Student Practice, # 2 Exhibit Client Consent for Student Practice, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons for Attorney General, # 5 Summons for US Army Corps of Engineers, # 6 Summons for Lt. Gen. Bostick, # 7 Summons for U.S. Attorney EDLA)Attorney Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon added to party Atchafalaya Basinkeeper(pty:selreq), Attorney Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon added to party Gulf Restoration Network Inc.(pty:selreq), Attorney Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon added to party Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West(pty:selreq).(Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/31/2015) (ajn). Modified on 12/31/2015 (ajn). (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#3

(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint - Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (ajn) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

#5

(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Gulf Restoration Network, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#2

(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (jeg) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Sullivan on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney John E. Sullivan added to party Thomas P Bostick(pty:dft), Attorney John E. Sullivan added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft).(Sullivan, John) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben Stolov Schifman on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney Reuben Stolov Schifman added to party Thomas P Bostick(pty:dft), Attorney Reuben Stolov Schifman added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft).(Schifman, Reuben) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2017 03:00 PM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Bench Trial set for 2/13/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.Issued by Clerk for Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form, # 2 Standing Order)(jrc) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

#12

(#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West, Gulf Restoration Network.(Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Thomas P Bostick, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(ajn) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

#11

(#11) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:50 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers through U.S. Attorney General served on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016.. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/21/2016 (cms). (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers through U.S. Attorney served on 1/15/2016, answer due 3/15/2016. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/21/2016 (cms). (Entered: 01/20/2016)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2017 03:00 PM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Bench Trial set for 2/13/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.Issued by Clerk for Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form, # 2 Standing Order)(jrc) (Entered: 03/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Sullivan on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney John E. Sullivan added to party Thomas P Bostick(pty:dft), Attorney John E. Sullivan added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft).(Sullivan, John) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West, Gulf Restoration Network.(Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:50 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben Stolov Schifman on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney Reuben Stolov Schifman added to party Thomas P Bostick(pty:dft), Attorney Reuben Stolov Schifman added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft).(Schifman, Reuben) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers through U.S. Attorney served on 1/15/2016, answer due 3/15/2016. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/21/2016 (cms). (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Thomas P Bostick served on 1/19/2016, answer due 3/21/2016. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Army Corps of Engineers through U.S. Attorney General served on 1/11/2016, answer due 3/11/2016.. (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) Modified text on 1/21/2016 (cms). (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Gulf Restoration Network, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West (Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Thomas P Bostick, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(ajn) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint - Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (ajn) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (jeg) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5159905) filed by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Gulf Restoration Network Inc., Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dean's Certification for Student Practice, # 2 Exhibit Client Consent for Student Practice, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons for Attorney General, # 5 Summons for US Army Corps of Engineers, # 6 Summons for Lt. Gen. Bostick, # 7 Summons for U.S. Attorney EDLA)Attorney Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon added to party Atchafalaya Basinkeeper(pty:selreq), Attorney Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon added to party Gulf Restoration Network Inc.(pty:selreq), Attorney Elizabeth Livingston de Calderon added to party Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West(pty:selreq).(Livingston de Calderon, Elizabeth) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/31/2015) (ajn). Modified on 12/31/2015 (ajn). (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.