This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2018 at 09:39:10 (UTC).

AstraZeneca AB v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2014 AstraZeneca AB filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Gregory M. Sleet. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00664

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Gregory M. Sleet

 

Party Details

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Inc.

Wockhardt USA LLC

Apotex Corp.

Apotex Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Glenmark Generics Ltd.

Wockhardt Bio AG

Glenmark Generics Inc. USA

Counter Defendant

AstraZeneca AB

Counter Claimants

Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.

Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.

Actavis LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Actavis Laboratories FL Inc.

Actavis Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Katharine Lester Mowery

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard William Riley

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1600

Wilmington, DE 19801-1659

Aaron S. Lukas

Barry P. Golob

W. Blake Coblentz

Mark D. Schuman

Stephanie E. O'Byrne

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Peter S. Kang

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman & Spence, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Christopher P. Wilson

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman & Spence, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

James F. Hurst

James L. Higgins

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Adam Wyatt Poff

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael Baniak

Shashank T. Upadhye

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Ralph J. Gabric

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#318

#319

#320

#321

#322

#323

#324

#325

#326

317 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#326) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of James C. Powers, Ph.D. filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC.(Riley, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#325) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of David P. Rotella Ph.D. on the Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. RE 44,186 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#324) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 6 of Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Defendants Second Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 10 and 11) filed by AstraZeneca AB.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#323) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John K. Hsu - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#322) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Amneal; and (2) Defendants Sun Pharma Global FZE and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Sun filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#321) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#320) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Wockhardt's Response To Plaintiffs' Third Set Of Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC.(Riley, Richard) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#319) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.s Objections and Response to AstraZeneca ABs Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#318) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's objections and responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) AstraZeneca ABs Objections and Responses to Defendants Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and (2) Bristol-Myers Squibb Companys Objections and Responses to Defendants Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action filed by AstraZeneca AB.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
306 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SO ORDERED - re 9 Stipulation filed by AstraZeneca AB, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. answer due 7/18/2014; Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. answer due 7/18/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/18/2014. (mdb) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint is Extended to July 18, 2014 (from June 18, 2014) by AstraZeneca AB. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by AstraZeneca AB. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. served on 5/28/2014, answer due 6/18/2014. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Mailing Regarding Service on Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. made on May 29, 2014 by AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC, Corporate Parent Zeneca Wilmington Inc. for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (cla, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,951,400;. (cla, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/18/14. Date of Expiration of Patent: 11/30/28.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/19/2016. (cla, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1521343.) - filed by AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wockhardt Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENMARK GENERICS INC USA is a litigant