This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 09:20:49 (UTC).

AS PTO, LLC et al v. JBI, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2014 AS PTO, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JBI, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-10209

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ES Resources, LLC

Plastic 2 Oil of Clearwater 1, LLC

AS PTO, LLC

Defendant

JBI, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

James R. Case

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Holly M. Polglase

Attorney at Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C.

265 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110

James Marshall Fry

Suite 228, 905 E Mlk Dr

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendant Attorneys

Brian D. Lipkin

Attorney at Rose, Chinitz & Rose

One Beacon Street, 23Rd Floor

Boston, MA 02108

Gregory M. Cesarano

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Suite 4200, 100 Se 2Nd St

Miami, FL 33131-9101

Amanda Arnold Sansone

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Suite 1000, 4221 W Boy Scout Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

Not Classified By Court Attorney

James R. Case

Attorney at Law Office of James Case

205 Palm Island Nw

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

 

Court Documents

#14

No Description Available

#17

(#17) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/11/2014) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AS PTO, LLC, ES Resources, LLC, Plastic 2 Oil of Clearwater 1, LLC. (Polglase, Holly) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

#1

No Description Available

2 #1

No Description Available

#2

No Description Available

#4

(#4) ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension through June 18, 2013, of the time within which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/24/2013. (Entered: 05/24/2013)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in opposition re 6 Motion to dismiss of Defendant filed by AS PTO, LLC, ES Resources, LLC, Plastic 2 Oil of Clearwater 1, LLC. (Fry, James) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 10/29/2013 9:30 a.m. before James R. Case. (Fry, James) (Entered: 08/01/2013)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III, Bench Trial set for the September, 2014, trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/12/2013. (TKD) (TKD). (Entered: 08/12/2013)

#11

(#11) MEDIATION report. Hearing held on 10/29/2013. Hearing outcome: Impasse. (SRC) (Entered: 11/04/2013)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting 6 --motion to transfer; this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts; directing the Clerk to CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/12/2013. (BK) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

#13

(#13) TRANSFER to the District of Massachusettes. Case Closed. (EJC) (Entered: 11/13/2013)

14 #1

No Description Available

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/28/2014)

#16

(#16) Set/Reset Hearings: This case is placed on the running trial list for the month of September 2014. A final pretrial conference will be held during the month of July 2014. Any motions for summary judgment are due on or before June 2, 2014. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AS PTO, LLC, ES Resources, LLC, Plastic 2 Oil of Clearwater 1, LLC. (Polglase, Holly) (Entered: 06/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/11/2014) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Set/Reset Hearings: This case is placed on the running trial list for the month of September 2014. A final pretrial conference will be held during the month of July 2014. Any motions for summary judgment are due on or before June 2, 2014. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:13-cv-01336. (Entered: 01/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TRANSFER to the District of Massachusettes. Case Closed. (EJC) (Entered: 11/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting 6 --motion to transfer; this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts; directing the Clerk to CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/12/2013. (BK) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEDIATION report. Hearing held on 10/29/2013. Hearing outcome: Impasse. (SRC) (Entered: 11/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III, Bench Trial set for the September, 2014, trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/12/2013. (TKD) (TKD). (Entered: 08/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 10/29/2013 9:30 a.m. before James R. Case. (Fry, James) (Entered: 08/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sansone, Amanda) (Entered: 07/31/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in opposition re 6 Motion to dismiss of Defendant filed by AS PTO, LLC, ES Resources, LLC, Plastic 2 Oil of Clearwater 1, LLC. (Fry, James) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Claims in Counts II and III of Plaintiffs' Complaint by JBI, Inc.. (Sansone, Amanda) (Entered: 06/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (TKD) (Entered: 06/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension through June 18, 2013, of the time within which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/24/2013. (Entered: 05/24/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint by JBI, Inc.. (Sansone, Amanda) (Entered: 05/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against JBI, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by AS PTO, LLC, Plastic 2 Oil of Clearwater 1, LLC, ES Resources, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(EJC) (Entered: 05/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit, Pinellas County, case number 13-3971-CI filed in State Court on 4/11/13. Filing fee $400, receipt number TPA-17509 filed by JBI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJC) (Entered: 05/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.