This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 20:56:19 (UTC).

Arteaga-Ruiz et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 02/25/2014 Arteaga-Ruiz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga

Jose Arteaga-Ruiz

Jose Arteaga-Arteaga

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria E Andrade

Attorney at ANDRADE LEGAL, INC

Po Box 2109

Boise, ID 83701

Benjamin Edward Stein

Attorney at Andrade Legal

P.O. Box 2109

Boise, ID 83701

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas J Woychick

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

800 Park Blvd #600

Boise, ID 83712

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1125730.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 5, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 5, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 5, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 5 of 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 2-10, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 2, # 9 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons, # 11 Summons Summons)(Andrade, Maria)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(cjm)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Jose Arteaga-Arteaga. United States of America served on 3/12/2014, answer due 5/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Andrade, Maria)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Jose Arteaga-Arteaga. United States of America served on 3/4/2014, answer due 5/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Andrade, Maria)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Jose Arteaga-Arteaga. United States of America served on 3/25/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Andrade, Maria)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Woychick, Nicholas)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, United States of America re 1 Complaint,, 6 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/17/2014. (cjm)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/18/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(jlg)

#9

(#9) MOTION Change Time of Scheduling Conference Maria E Andrade appearing for Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga. Responses due by 6/16/2014 (Andrade, Maria)

#24

(#24) ORDER Defendant United States of Americas Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 18 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and with leave to re-file after the Supreme Court issues its decision in the cases referenced in the stipulation. Defendant United States of America's Motion to Seal Presentence Investigation Report (Dkt. 19 ) is GRANTED. The parties' Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance (Dkt. 23 ) is GRANTED and ADOPTED by the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Dismiss Nicholas J Woychick appearing for Defendant United States of America. Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Woychick, Nicholas)

#26

(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss Maria E Andrade appearing for Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga. Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Andrade, Maria)

#27

(#27) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting in part 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs do not need to file a response by May 18, 2015. But Plaintiffs shall file their motion to amend on or before May 18, 2015. The government shall file a response to the motion to amend on or before May 26, 2015. Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before May 28, 2015. Depending on how the Court rules on the motion to amend, the Court will set a schedule for finalizing the briefing on the pending motion to dismiss or setting a briefing schedule on a likely motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (js)

#28

(#28) MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint Maria E Andrade appearing for Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga. Responses due by 6/11/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support)(Andrade, Maria)

#29

(#29) RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint Defendant United States of America's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' [Second] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. Replies due by 6/12/2015.(Woychick, Nicholas)

#30

(#30) ERRATA by Defendant United States of America re 29 Response to Motion, . (Woychick, Nicholas)

#31

(#31) REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint filed by Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga.(Andrade, Maria)

#32

(#32) ERRATA by Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga re 31 Reply to Response to Motion . (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Cert. of Service)(Stein, Benjamin)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ERRATA by Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga re 31 Reply to Response to Motion . (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Cert. of Service)(Stein, Benjamin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint filed by Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga.(Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ERRATA by Defendant United States of America re 29 Response to Motion, . (Woychick, Nicholas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint Defendant United States of America's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' [Second] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. Replies due by 6/12/2015.(Woychick, Nicholas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Amended Complaint Maria E Andrade appearing for Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga. Responses due by 6/11/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support)(Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting in part 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs do not need to file a response by May 18, 2015. But Plaintiffs shall file their motion to amend on or before May 18, 2015. The government shall file a response to the motion to amend on or before May 26, 2015. Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before May 28, 2015. Depending on how the Court rules on the motion to amend, the Court will set a schedule for finalizing the briefing on the pending motion to dismiss or setting a briefing schedule on a likely motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (js)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss Maria E Andrade appearing for Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga. Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION to Dismiss Nicholas J Woychick appearing for Defendant United States of America. Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Woychick, Nicholas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER Defendant United States of Americas Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 18 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and with leave to re-file after the Supreme Court issues its decision in the cases referenced in the stipulation. Defendant United States of America's Motion to Seal Presentence Investigation Report (Dkt. 19 ) is GRANTED. The parties' Stipulation to Hold Case in Abeyance (Dkt. 23 ) is GRANTED and ADOPTED by the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION to Hold Case in Abeyance by United States of America. (Woychick, Nicholas)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 9 Motion. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/19/2014 at 11:00. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (js)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION Change Time of Scheduling Conference Maria E Andrade appearing for Plaintiffs Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga. Responses due by 6/16/2014 (Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 6/18/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(jlg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jose Arteaga-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, United States of America re 1 Complaint,, 6 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/17/2014. (cjm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Woychick, Nicholas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Jose Arteaga-Arteaga. United States of America served on 3/25/2014, answer due 5/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Jose Arteaga-Arteaga. United States of America served on 3/4/2014, answer due 5/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia Ruiz-Arteaga, Jose Arteaga-Ruiz, Jose Arteaga-Arteaga. United States of America served on 3/12/2014, answer due 5/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(cjm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1125730.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 5, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 5, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 5, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 5 of 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 2-10, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 2, # 9 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons, # 11 Summons Summons)(Andrade, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less