This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2017 at 11:45:34 (UTC).

Aqua Shield v. Interpool Pool Cover Team

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 Aqua Shield filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Interpool Pool Cover Team. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-2009

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aqua Shield

Defendant

Interpool Pool Cover Team

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2015. [271141]Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/09/2015.

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Interpool Pool Cover Team. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274861]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Alukov Hz Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274864]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Alukov Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274867]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Pool & Spa Enclosures. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274870]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Interpool Pool Cover Team. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274872]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Alukov Hz Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274874]

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Alukov Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274876]

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Pool & Spa Enclosures. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274878]

#31

(#31) BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellant Aqua Shield [29]. Number of Pages: 66. Service: 01/27/2016 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/09/2016. Appellant's reply brief is due 03/10/2016. [308567]

#33

(#33) MOTION of Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures to extend the time to 03/24/2016 at 11:59 pm to file the reply brief. Response/Opposition is due 03/17/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/03/2016 by email. [315802]

#35

(#35) MOTION of Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures to extend the time to 03/28/2016 at 11:59 pm to file the reply brief. Response/Opposition is due 04/04/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/22/2016 by email. [320916]

#38

(#38) NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures[37], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Reply brief is due 04/12/2016. Cross-Appellant's reply brief due 04/12/2016. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [322517]

#39

(#39) TENDERED from Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures. Title: CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF. Service: 03/29/2016 by email. [322663]

#40

(#40) CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures [39]. Number of Pages: 22. Service: 03/29/2016 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 04/04/2016. [322792]

#0130698409

(#0130698409) TENDERED from Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 12/04/2015 by email. [293825]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc No.[21]

#0130725304

(#0130725304) TENDERED from Cross-Appellant Aqua Shield. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/27/2016 by email. [306423]

#0130758563

(#0130758563) TENDERED from Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 03/28/2016 by email. [322266] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [38]

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130758563) TENDERED from Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 03/28/2016 by email. [322266] This brief has been rejected. See Doc No. [38]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130725304) TENDERED from Cross-Appellant Aqua Shield. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/27/2016 by email. [306423]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#0130698409) TENDERED from Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 12/04/2015 by email. [293825]. This brief has been rejected. See Doc No.[21]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures [39]. Number of Pages: 22. Service: 03/29/2016 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 04/04/2016. [322792]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) TENDERED from Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures. Title: CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF. Service: 03/29/2016 by email. [322663]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE OF REJECTION: The brief of Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures[37], is not in compliance with the rules of this court and is therefore rejected for filing. Reply brief is due 04/12/2016. Cross-Appellant's reply brief due 04/12/2016. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [322517]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION of Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures to extend the time to 03/28/2016 at 11:59 pm to file the reply brief. Response/Opposition is due 04/04/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/22/2016 by email. [320916]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION of Appellants Alukov Hz Spol Sro, Alukov Spol Sro, Interpool Pool Cover Team and Pool & Spa Enclosures to extend the time to 03/24/2016 at 11:59 pm to file the reply brief. Response/Opposition is due 03/17/2016 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/03/2016 by email. [315802]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) BRIEF FILED for Cross-Appellant Aqua Shield [29]. Number of Pages: 66. Service: 01/27/2016 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 02/09/2016. Appellant's reply brief is due 03/10/2016. [308567]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file cross-appellant's opening brief [28] filed by Cross-Appellant Aqua Shield. Service: 02/04/2016 by clerk. [308382]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Interpool Pool Cover Team. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274879]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Pool & Spa Enclosures. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274878]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Alukov Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274876]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Alukov Hz Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274874]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Interpool Pool Cover Team. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274872]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Pool & Spa Enclosures. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274870]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Alukov Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274867]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Alukov Hz Spol Sro. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274864]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Gregory J. Coffey as principal counsel for Appellant Interpool Pool Cover Team. Service: 09/24/2015 by email. [274861]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2015. [271141]Entry of Appearance due 09/24/2015. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2015. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2015. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.