This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 03:13:16 (UTC).

Appel v. Schoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2014 Appel filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Schoeman Updike Kaufman Stern Ascher L L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-02065

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronit D. Appel

New York, NY 10024

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Michael J. Rattacasa

Avant-Garde Group, Inc.

Schoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P.

Cross Claimant

H&B Construction Services, Inc.

Cross Defendants

Susan S. Casero

Stuart J. Boesky

Beth L. Kaufman

Madison 96 Associates, L.L.C.

Cindy Nygaard

John Francis Borrelli Architect, P.C.

Laurie Zeligson

M&B Construction Services

The Feil Organization, Inc.

Joseph Bruzzese

Jeffrey Management Corp.

Schoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P.

Andrea D. Ascher

Charles B. Updike

French Partners, L.L.C.

Interior Construction Corp.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronit Danielle Appel

Attorney at Ronot D. Appel

322 West 78Th Street

New York, NY 10024

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Gregory James Couillou

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP (Newark)

One Newark Center, 18Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Bettina Barasch Plevan

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP (NY)

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Nikolas S Komyati

Patrick Michael Kennell

Attorney at Kaufman, Dolowich & Voluck LLP

60 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Stephen A. Hoffman

Attorney at Nelson Levine De Luca & Hamilton, LLC

17 State St, 29 Fl

New York, NY 10004

Stephen M. Harnik

James Francis O'Brien

William Louis Schleifer

Mili Makhijani

Argyrios Gary Petropoulos

Lee Henig-Elona

Michael Roy Galina

Cross Claimant Attorney

Michael P. Beckley

Other Attorneys

Benjamin Scott Weisfelner

Robert M Abrahams

Randall Thomas Adams

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Reed Smith L.L.P..(Abrahams, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with exhibits served on Ronit D. Appel, Co-defendants Interior Construction Corp., Joseph Bruzzese, French Partners, LLC, The Feil Organization, Inc., Jeffrey Management Corp., Jeffrey Feil and the County Clerk, Supreme Court NY County on 3/25/14. Service was made by Electronic Filing. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#270

(#270) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 137 Motion to Dismiss; granting 141 Motion to Dismiss; granting 145 Motion to Dismiss; granting 149 Motion to Dismiss; granting 152 Motion to Dismiss; granting 155 Motion to Dismiss; granting 158 Motion to Dismiss; granting 170 Motion to Dismiss; granting 174 Motion to Dismiss; granting 176 Motion to Dismiss; granting 184 Motion to Dismiss; granting 192 Motion to Dismiss; granting 262 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, they are either moot or without merit. Therefore, for the reasons stated herein, the Defendants' motions are GRANTED in their entirety. This resolves Dkt. Nos. 119, 137, 141, 145, 149, 152, 155, 158, 170, 174, 176, 184, 192, and 262. (Dkt. Nos. 43, 56, 62, 66, 72, 75, 82, and 86 were superseded by subsequent motions to dismiss or for summary judgment per Dkt. No. 92.). In addition, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is to pay the AGG Defendants $5,000 pursuant to Rule 11. The Court also finds pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 445 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/26/2015) (ama) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P..(Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151541-2014. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1090774).Document filed by Charles B. Updike, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Susan S. Casero, Veronica Law, Andrea D. Ascher, Cindy Nygaard, Beth L. Kaufman, Mindy H. Stern. (Attachments: # 1 a 1, # 2 a 2, # 3 a 3, # 4 a 4, # 5 b 1, # 6 b 2, # 7 b 3, # 8 b 4, # 9 b 5, # 10 c)(laq) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#6

(#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bettina B. Plevan dated 3/28/2014. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M Abrahams on behalf of Paul E. Breene, Reed Smith L.L.P.. (Abrahams, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

#265

(#265) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). . Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#263

(#263) DECLARATION of Sergei Goloubenko in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#267

(#267) DECLARATION of Ronit D. Appel in Opposition re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Ronit D. Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A Part 4 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A Part 5 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A Part 6 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 6)(Appel, Ronit) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#269

(#269) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Patrick Michael Kennell on behalf of Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. New Address: Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP, 60 Broad Street - 36th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10038, 212-485-9600. (Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with exhibits, ECF Rules, Individual Practices of Judge Alison J. Nathan, Special Rules of the practice in Civil Pro Se Cases, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Statement served on Ronit D. Appel, Co-defendants French Partners, LLC, The Feil Organization, Inc.,Jeffrey Management Corp., Jeffrey Feil, Interior Construction Corp., Joseph Bruzzese, Madison 96 Associates LLC, Stuart J. Boesky, Jamison Weiner, Reed Smith LLP, Paul E. Breene, John Francis Borrelli, John Francis Borrelli Architect, P.C., Laurie Zeligson, The Zeligson Firm, Creative Environment Solutions Corp., and H & B Construction Services, Inc. on 3/25/2014. Service was made by Electronic Filing. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Schoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher LLPs Rule 7.1 Statement, two (2) Affidavits of Service for the Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, and Defendants March 28, 2014 Letter to Judge Nathan with enclosed exhibits served on Ronit D. Appel, Co-defendants French Partners, LLC, The Feil Organization, Inc.,Jeffrey Management Corp., Jeffrey Feil, Interior Construction Corp., Joseph Bruzzese, Madison 96 Associates LLC, Stuart J. Boesky, Jamison Weiner, Reed Smith LLP, Paul E. Breene, John Francis Borrelli, John Francis Borrelli Architect, P.C., Laurie Zeligson, The Zeligson Firm, Creative Environment Solutions Corp., M&B Construction Services, M&B Construction, and H & B Construction Services, Inc. on 3/28/2014. Service was made by E-Mail and Mail. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Couillou, Gregory) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#266

(#266) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). . Document filed by Ronit D. Appel. (Appel, Ronit) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#264

(#264) DECLARATION of Patrick M. Kennell in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#262

(#262) MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Pro Se Party)(Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#268

(#268) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). . Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Pro Se Party)(Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

258 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#270) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 137 Motion to Dismiss; granting 141 Motion to Dismiss; granting 145 Motion to Dismiss; granting 149 Motion to Dismiss; granting 152 Motion to Dismiss; granting 155 Motion to Dismiss; granting 158 Motion to Dismiss; granting 170 Motion to Dismiss; granting 174 Motion to Dismiss; granting 176 Motion to Dismiss; granting 184 Motion to Dismiss; granting 192 Motion to Dismiss; granting 262 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, they are either moot or without merit. Therefore, for the reasons stated herein, the Defendants' motions are GRANTED in their entirety. This resolves Dkt. Nos. 119, 137, 141, 145, 149, 152, 155, 158, 170, 174, 176, 184, 192, and 262. (Dkt. Nos. 43, 56, 62, 66, 72, 75, 82, and 86 were superseded by subsequent motions to dismiss or for summary judgment per Dkt. No. 92.). In addition, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is to pay the AGG Defendants $5,000 pursuant to Rule 11. The Court also finds pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 445 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/26/2015) (ama) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#269) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Patrick Michael Kennell on behalf of Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. New Address: Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP, 60 Broad Street - 36th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10038, 212-485-9600. (Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#268) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). . Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Pro Se Party)(Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#267) DECLARATION of Ronit D. Appel in Opposition re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Ronit D. Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A Part 4 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A Part 5 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A Part 6 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 6)(Appel, Ronit) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#266) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). . Document filed by Ronit D. Appel. (Appel, Ronit) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#265) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). . Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#264) DECLARATION of Patrick M. Kennell in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#263) DECLARATION of Sergei Goloubenko in Support re: 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#262) MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs). Document filed by Avant-Garde Group, Inc., Sergei Goloubenko. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Pro Se Party)(Kennell, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#261) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Ronit D. Appel in Opposition re: 258 MOTION for Attorney Fees (To Recover Attorneys Fees and Costs).. Document filed by Ronit D. Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A Part 4 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A Part 5 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A Part 6 - Amended Verified Complaint Part 6)(Appel, Ronit) Modified on 12/15/2014 (db). (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
250 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Paul E. Breene, Reed Smith L.L.P..(Abrahams, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Reed Smith L.L.P..(Abrahams, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M Abrahams on behalf of Paul E. Breene, Reed Smith L.L.P.. (Abrahams, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Schoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher LLPs Rule 7.1 Statement, two (2) Affidavits of Service for the Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, and Defendants March 28, 2014 Letter to Judge Nathan with enclosed exhibits served on Ronit D. Appel, Co-defendants French Partners, LLC, The Feil Organization, Inc.,Jeffrey Management Corp., Jeffrey Feil, Interior Construction Corp., Joseph Bruzzese, Madison 96 Associates LLC, Stuart J. Boesky, Jamison Weiner, Reed Smith LLP, Paul E. Breene, John Francis Borrelli, John Francis Borrelli Architect, P.C., Laurie Zeligson, The Zeligson Firm, Creative Environment Solutions Corp., M&B Construction Services, M&B Construction, and H & B Construction Services, Inc. on 3/28/2014. Service was made by E-Mail and Mail. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Couillou, Gregory) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bettina B. Plevan dated 3/28/2014. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with exhibits, ECF Rules, Individual Practices of Judge Alison J. Nathan, Special Rules of the practice in Civil Pro Se Cases, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Statement served on Ronit D. Appel, Co-defendants French Partners, LLC, The Feil Organization, Inc.,Jeffrey Management Corp., Jeffrey Feil, Interior Construction Corp., Joseph Bruzzese, Madison 96 Associates LLC, Stuart J. Boesky, Jamison Weiner, Reed Smith LLP, Paul E. Breene, John Francis Borrelli, John Francis Borrelli Architect, P.C., Laurie Zeligson, The Zeligson Firm, Creative Environment Solutions Corp., and H & B Construction Services, Inc. on 3/25/2014. Service was made by Electronic Filing. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with exhibits served on Ronit D. Appel, Co-defendants Interior Construction Corp., Joseph Bruzzese, French Partners, LLC, The Feil Organization, Inc., Jeffrey Management Corp., Jeffrey Feil and the County Clerk, Supreme Court NY County on 3/25/14. Service was made by Electronic Filing. Document filed by Andrea D. Ascher, Susan S. Casero, Beth L. Kaufman, Veronica Law, Cindy Nygaard, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Mindy H. Stern, Charles B. Updike. (Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P..(Plevan, Bettina) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151541-2014. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1090774).Document filed by Charles B. Updike, Shoeman Updike Kaufman Stern & Ascher L.L.P., Susan S. Casero, Veronica Law, Andrea D. Ascher, Cindy Nygaard, Beth L. Kaufman, Mindy H. Stern. (Attachments: # 1 a 1, # 2 a 2, # 3 a 3, # 4 a 4, # 5 b 1, # 6 b 2, # 7 b 3, # 8 b 4, # 9 b 5, # 10 c)(laq) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.