Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/13/2018 at 01:23:15 (UTC).

Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. v. Solonova, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2015 Antiaging Institute of California, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Solonova, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-03416

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Solonova, LLC

Easy Living Health

Deepak Chopra

Does 1 to 100

Tishcon Corp.

Raj Chopra

Not Classified By Court

Alan G Dowling

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Drew Harris Sherman

Attorney at Adli Law Group PC

444 South Flower Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Anthony Tyler Mellos

Attorney at Adli Law Group PC

444 South Flower Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas Sean Butler

Attorney at Thomas S Butler Law Offices

11835 W Olympic Boulevard Suite 1090

Los Angeles, CA 90064-5001

Dariush G Adli

Attorney at Adli Law Group PC

444 South Flower Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Anthony M Keats

Attorney at Keats Law

120 S. El Camino Drive, Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Preston H Lim

Attorney at Lim Law Group, P.C.

3435 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 2350

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Zahir Virani

Attorney at McCarthy Fingar LLP

11 Martine Avenue 12Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10606-1934

Phillip C Landrigan

11 Martine Avenue 12Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10606-1934

Peter D Aufrichtig

Attorney at McCarthy Finger LLP

11 Martine Avenue 12Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10606-1934

Konrad Karl Gatien

Attorney at Keats Gatien LLP

120 S. El Camino Drive, Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Alan Glenn Dowling

Attorney at Alan G Dowling Law Offices

1043 Pacific Street

Santa Monica, CA 90405

 

Court Documents

227 #1

Stipulated Final Judgment

#227

(#227) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Final Judgment) (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2017)

#226

(#226) STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff hereby abandons its applications with the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office ("USPTO") seeking to trademark "LiquiCalcium" (Serial No. 86507597), and "LiquiCalcium 6 Plus" (Serial No. 86513049). Plaintiff and its officers, agents, directors, and employees, or affiliates, whether acting directly or indirectly, are hereby permanently enjoined from any use of the marks "LiquiCalcium," "LiquiCalcium 6 Plus," "LIQUI-CALCIUM" or any mark that is substantially similar to the Marks. Plaintiff hereby dismisses, with prejudice, all claims against Defendants, their employees, directors, officers, agents, or successors and assigns, contained in the First Amended Complaint. Tishcon hereby dismisses all claims against Plaintiff, their employees, directors, officers, agents, or successors and assigns, contained in Tishcon's counterclaims contained in the answer to the FAC. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2017)

225 #1

Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment

#225

(#225) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Stipulated Final Judgment re Amended Complaint/Petition #75 , Answer to Complaint, #103 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#224

(#224) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Response #222 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. The docket clerk will amend the docket entry text to reflect the correct title of the attached document. Any document, incorrectly filed in the future, will be stricken. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/21/2017)

#222

(#222) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Counter Defendant Antiaging Institute of California, Inc., Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. to OSC re: new counsel (Butler, Thomas) Modified on 2/21/2017 (mrgo). (Entered: 02/09/2017)

#103

(#225) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Stipulated Final Judgment re Amended Complaint/Petition #75 , Answer to Complaint, #103 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#75

(#225) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Stipulated Final Judgment re Amended Complaint/Petition #75 , Answer to Complaint, #103 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Deppak Chopra, Easy Living Health, Solonova, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

6 #1

CV11-C Statement of Consent

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: #1 CV11-C Statement of Consent) (et) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc., (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Deppak Chopra, Easy Living Health, Solonova, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

366 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#227) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Final Judgment) (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#226) STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff hereby abandons its applications with the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office ("USPTO") seeking to trademark "LiquiCalcium" (Serial No. 86507597), and "LiquiCalcium 6 Plus" (Serial No. 86513049). Plaintiff and its officers, agents, directors, and employees, or affiliates, whether acting directly or indirectly, are hereby permanently enjoined from any use of the marks "LiquiCalcium," "LiquiCalcium 6 Plus," "LIQUI-CALCIUM" or any mark that is substantially similar to the Marks. Plaintiff hereby dismisses, with prejudice, all claims against Defendants, their employees, directors, officers, agents, or successors and assigns, contained in the First Amended Complaint. Tishcon hereby dismisses all claims against Plaintiff, their employees, directors, officers, agents, or successors and assigns, contained in Tishcon's counterclaims contained in the answer to the FAC. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#225) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Stipulated Final Judgment re Amended Complaint/Petition #75 , Answer to Complaint, #103 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#224) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Response #222 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. The docket clerk will amend the docket entry text to reflect the correct title of the attached document. Any document, incorrectly filed in the future, will be stricken. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#223) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response #222 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice -- Appearance. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#222) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Counter Defendant Antiaging Institute of California, Inc., Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. to OSC re: new counsel (Butler, Thomas) Modified on 2/21/2017 (mrgo). (Entered: 02/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#221) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Tishcon Corp., re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, #220 Proof of Service of Order (Dkt. No. 220) served on February 2, 2017. (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 02/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#220) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order DISCHARGING OSC as to Tishcon, and EXTENDING OSC Response Deadline for AntiAging by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 9/21/2016, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause #206 requiring Plaintiff AntiAging Institute of California, Inc. ("AntiAging") and Counterclaimant Tishcon Corp. ("Tishcon") to demonstrate that there is at least a triable issue on the matters their claims raise, or the Court would dismiss their respective claims sua sponte #206 . Tishcon filed a Response #218 , and AntiAging filed neither a Response by the January 10 deadline, nor a Reply by the January 24 deadline. The Court finds Tishcon's Response satisfactory and DISCHARGES the OSC as to Tishcon. AntiAging is currently without counsel and has until 2/10/2017, to obtain counsel. Out of an abundance of caution, the court EXTENDS to 2/27/2017, AntiAging's deadline to respond to the OSC. Tishcon may reply by 3/6/2017. Because AntiAging is currently unrepresented, the Court ORDERS Tishcon to assist the Court by serving this Order on AntiAging and filing a proof of service within five days of the issuance of this order. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 02/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#219) DECLARATION of Sandeep Chopra re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #206 Declaration of Sandeep Chopra in Support of Defendant Tishon's Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 206) filed by Defendant Tishcon Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response-OSC (Dkt. 206)-Decl (Chopra)-EXHIBITS A-F)(Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#218) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Tishcon Corp.to Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #206 Defendant Tishcon's Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 206) (Keats, Anthony) (Entered: 01/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc., upon Defendant Deppak Chopra served on 5/11/2015, answer due 6/1/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Adli, Dariush) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • (#9) TEXT ENTRY ONLY: Judge Suzanne H. Segal is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email address at SS_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: This action has been assigned for all purposes to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (mr) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Deppak Chopra, Easy Living Health, Solonova, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: #1 CV11-C Statement of Consent) (et) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc., (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15672419 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Drew Harris Sherman added to party Antiaging Institute of California, Inc.(pty:pla))(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Antiaging Institute of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Konrad Karl Gatien

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony M Keats