This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 15:55:01 (UTC).

Anna Andrews v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Anna Andrews filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich and Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:14-CV-01239

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich

Judge

Judge Otis D. Wright, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anna Andrews

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve W Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1918 Eighth Avenue Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98101

Scot D Wilson

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Andrew M Volk

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 5Th Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98101

Mark P Robinson, Jr

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kevin Frank Calcagnie

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Robinson Shapiro Davis Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Elaine T Byszewski

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey S Sinek

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13980553 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews. (Attorney Elaine T Byszewski added to party Anna Andrews(pty:pla))(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews, (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (lmu) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Steve W. Berman, Andrew M Volk for Plaintiff Anna Andrews. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lmu) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Andrew M Volk for Plaintiff Anna Andrews. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lmu) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

#21

(#21) RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case transferred from California Central; case has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:14-cv-05351 (mg) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

#20

(#20) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Entire case and documents electronially sent to USDC Southern District of New York at New York, New York on 7/16/14. (lc) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

#19

(#19) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 2543, transferring case to USDC Southern District of New York, at New York assigned to Judge Jesse M Furman. Documents electronically transferred to USDC Southern District of New York, at New York on 7/16/14. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Modified on 7/16/2014 (lc). (Entered: 07/16/2014)

#18

(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 17 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulation to extend time to answer 30 days or less. Note: no time to answer was extended by the wrong event.In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint 13 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC.(Sinek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant General Motors LLC identifying General Motors Company as Corporate Parent. (Sinek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey S Sinek on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Attorney Jeffrey S Sinek added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Sinek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrewsto Order to Show Cause, 12 Response to Order to Show Cause Re. Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#13

(#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant General Motors LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by plaintiff Anna Andrews (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case transferred from California Central; case has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:14-cv-05351 (mg) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter. Entire case and documents electronially sent to USDC Southern District of New York at New York, New York on 7/16/14. (lc) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 2543, transferring case to USDC Southern District of New York, at New York assigned to Judge Jesse M Furman. Documents electronically transferred to USDC Southern District of New York, at New York on 7/16/14. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Modified on 7/16/2014 (lc). (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 17 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulation to extend time to answer 30 days or less. Note: no time to answer was extended by the wrong event.In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint 13 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC.(Sinek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant General Motors LLC identifying General Motors Company as Corporate Parent. (Sinek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey S Sinek on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Attorney Jeffrey S Sinek added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Sinek, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrewsto Order to Show Cause, 12 Response to Order to Show Cause Re. Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant General Motors LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by plaintiff Anna Andrews (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff Andrews to SHOW CAUSE in writing by Tuesday, July 8, 2014, why the Court should not dismiss her action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. No hearing will be held; Andrews shall respond in writing. Failure to timely respond will result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. (lc) (Entered: 06/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. ( SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; AND REFER TO JUDGES PROCEDURES AND SCHEDULES FOR DETAILED INSTRUCTIONS RE SUBMISSION OF SEALED DOCUMENTS, EXCLUDING THOSE SUBMITTED BY PRO SE PARTIES AND IN CAMERA FILINGS ). (lc) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Andrew M Volk for Plaintiff Anna Andrews. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lmu) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Steve W. Berman, Andrew M Volk for Plaintiff Anna Andrews. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lmu) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (lmu) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews, (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13980553 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anna Andrews. (Attorney Elaine T Byszewski added to party Anna Andrews(pty:pla))(Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.