This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 10:26:02 (UTC).

Andrade et al v. Dragon House, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 Andrade filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Dragon House, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00299

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jose Andrade

Maria Andrade

Defendants

Dragon House, LLC

Jian Liu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gilda A. Hernandez

Attorney at The Law Offices of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC

315 S. Salem St., Suite 310

Apex, NC 27502

Defendant Attorney

Kyle Richard Still

Attorney at Wyrick Robbins Yates & Ponton, LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Suite 300, P. O. Drawer 17803

Raleigh, NC 27607-7506

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal OF CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Gilda A. Hernandez on behalf of Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Downing, L.) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#2

(#2) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jose Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle Richard Still on behalf of Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

#3

(#3) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#10

(#10) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

#13

(#13) Memorandum in Support regarding 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Prejudice filed by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ramirez v. Amazing Home Contractors, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B - Zaldivar v. Anna Bella's Cafe, LLC, # 3 Exhibit C - Morrow v. JW Electric, Inc., # 4 Exhibit D - Lopez-Santiago v. Coconut Thai Grill, # 5 Exhibit E - Duran v. Wong, # 6 Exhibit F - Alvarez v. 40 Mulberry Restaurant, Inc.) (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 25M6EHN5.), filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Dragon House LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons Jian Liu, # 4 Exhibit Consent to File Suit as Party Plaintiff - Jose Andrade, # 5 Exhibit Consent to File Suit as Part Plaintiff - Maria Andrade) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#5

(#5) Notice filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade regarding 1 Complaint, of Filing of Amended Proposed Summons for All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons Defendant Dragon House, # 2 Proposed Summons Defendant Jian Liu) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Jian Liu, Dragon House LLC on 8-12-2015, filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service of Process by Process Server on Defendants) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Gilda A. Hernandez on behalf of Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal OF CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Memorandum in Support regarding 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Prejudice filed by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ramirez v. Amazing Home Contractors, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B - Zaldivar v. Anna Bella's Cafe, LLC, # 3 Exhibit C - Morrow v. JW Electric, Inc., # 4 Exhibit D - Lopez-Santiago v. Coconut Thai Grill, # 5 Exhibit E - Duran v. Wong, # 6 Exhibit F - Alvarez v. 40 Mulberry Restaurant, Inc.) (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle Richard Still on behalf of Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu. (Still, Kyle) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Jian Liu, Dragon House LLC on 8-12-2015, filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service of Process by Process Server on Defendants) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Downing, L.) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Gilda A. Hernandez on behalf of Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade regarding 1 Complaint, of Filing of Amended Proposed Summons for All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons Defendant Dragon House, # 2 Proposed Summons Defendant Jian Liu) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Gilda A. Hernandez on behalf of Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jose Andrade. (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dragon House, LLC, Jian Liu ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 25M6EHN5.), filed by Jose Andrade, Maria Andrade. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Dragon House LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons Jian Liu, # 4 Exhibit Consent to File Suit as Party Plaintiff - Jose Andrade, # 5 Exhibit Consent to File Suit as Part Plaintiff - Maria Andrade) (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.