This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2016 at 23:57:31 (UTC).

Anderson v. RentGrow, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against RentGrow, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-13582

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Edward Anderson

Defendant

RentGrow, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory J. Gorski

Attorney at Francis & Mailman, P.C.

100 South Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19110

Danielle M. Spang

Attorney at Law Office of Danielle Spang

Po Box 183

Somerville, MA 02143

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew R. Sperl

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

30 S. 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Gregory S. Bombard

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110-1724

Dana Klinges

Attorney at Wolf, Block, Schorr and Solis-Cohen LLP

250 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10179

 

Court Documents

#9

No Description Available

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against RentGrow, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5794176 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gregory Edward Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Spang, Danielle) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RentGrow, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gregory Gorski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5804558 by Gregory Edward Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Gregory Gorski)(Spang, Danielle) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory Edward Anderson. RentGrow, Inc. waiver sent on 10/26/2015, answer due 12/25/2015. (Spang, Danielle) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by RentGrow, Inc..(Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RentGrow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Yardi Systems, Inc. for RentGrow, Inc... (Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

9 #1

Standing Orders

#10

(#10) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Fed R. 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1. (Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) of RENTGROW, INC.. (Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dana B. Klinges Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5936401 by RentGrow, Inc..(Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew R. Sperl Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5936417 by RentGrow, Inc..(Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Gregory Edward Anderson. (Gorski, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#15

(#15) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Klinges. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#16

(#16) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sperl. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#17

(#17) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered CANCELING the Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2016 and setting the deadlines as follows 10 : Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/16; Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2016; Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/24/2016; Plaintiff shall designate experts pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) on or before 7/25/16; Defendant shall designate experts pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) on or before 8/24/16; Expert discovery shall be completed by 9/23/16; Dispositive Motions due on or before 10/21/2016; If no Experts are utilized, Dispositive Motion due on or before 7/25/16; Opposition due within 21 days of filing of dispositive motion; Reply, if any, by Leave of Court. If no dispositive motion filed, the parties must advise the court within seven days of the last scheduled deadline regarding the expected length of trial and suggested trial dates.(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#18

(#18) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling the Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2016 in light of the Order entered setting the deadlines. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling the Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2016 in light of the Order entered setting the deadlines. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered CANCELING the Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2016 and setting the deadlines as follows 10 : Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/16; Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2016; Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/24/2016; Plaintiff shall designate experts pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) on or before 7/25/16; Defendant shall designate experts pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) on or before 8/24/16; Expert discovery shall be completed by 9/23/16; Dispositive Motions due on or before 10/21/2016; If no Experts are utilized, Dispositive Motion due on or before 7/25/16; Opposition due within 21 days of filing of dispositive motion; Reply, if any, by Leave of Court. If no dispositive motion filed, the parties must advise the court within seven days of the last scheduled deadline regarding the expected length of trial and suggested trial dates.(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sperl. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Klinges. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Gregory Edward Anderson. (Gorski, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew R. Sperl Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5936417 by RentGrow, Inc..(Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dana B. Klinges Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5936401 by RentGrow, Inc..(Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) of RENTGROW, INC.. (Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference Pursuant to Fed R. 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1. (Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2016 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The parties are ORDERED TO FILE, on or before 1/20/16, a JOINT STATEMENT containing a proposed pretrial schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Orders)(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RentGrow, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Yardi Systems, Inc. for RentGrow, Inc... (Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by RentGrow, Inc..(Bombard, Gregory) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory Edward Anderson. RentGrow, Inc. waiver sent on 10/26/2015, answer due 12/25/2015. (Spang, Danielle) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gorski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gregory Gorski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5804558 by Gregory Edward Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Gregory Gorski)(Spang, Danielle) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to RentGrow, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RentGrow, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5794176 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gregory Edward Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Spang, Danielle) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rentgrow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory S. Bombard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Ronald Sperl