This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:25:43 (UTC).

Anderson v. GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 Anderson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00206

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Justin Green

Dean Anderson

William H. Sallee

Defendants

GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC

GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Fibich, Leebron, Copeland, Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Lindsay R. Itkin

Attorney at Fibich Leebron Copeland Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Fibich, Leebron, Copeland, Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Defendant Attorneys

Shawn C. Golden

Attorney at Golden & Barrera, LLP

424 East Nueva

San Antonio, TX 78205

Roy R. Barrera, III

Attorney at Golden & Barrera LLP

424 E. Nueva

San Antonio, TX 78205

David A. Harris

Attorney at Golden & Barrera

424 East Nueva

San Antonio, TX 78205

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7292265), filed by Dean Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Consent form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dean Anderson. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsay R. Itkin on behalf of Dean Anderson. Attorney Lindsay R. Itkin added to party Dean Anderson(pty:pla) (Itkin, Lindsay) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Dean Anderson. Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Dean Anderson(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC amending, filed by Dean Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC. (wg) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dean Anderson. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dean Anderson. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC., GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC (wg) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#25

(#25) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Dean Anderson. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#24

(#24) NOTICE and Advisory to the Court by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC (Harris, David) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#23

(#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING AND STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference set for 7/16/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,) Parties should file an Advisory no later than 07/15/2015 issues related to case as listed in this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#22

(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Dean Anderson. (Itkin, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#21

(#21) Proposed Pretrial Order on Scheduling by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harris, David) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#20

(#20) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC. (Harris, David) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#19

(#19) ORDER and ADVISORY, the Parties shall submit a Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2015. The Parties are further ordered to notify the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order whether or not they consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney David A. Harris added to party GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC(pty:dft) by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC.(Harris, David) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Dean Anderson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Dean Anderson. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE and Advisory to the Court by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC (Harris, David) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING AND STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference set for 7/16/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,) Parties should file an Advisory no later than 07/15/2015 issues related to case as listed in this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Dean Anderson. (Itkin, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Proposed Pretrial Order on Scheduling by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harris, David) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC. (Harris, David) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER and ADVISORY, the Parties shall submit a Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2015. The Parties are further ordered to notify the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order whether or not they consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (sf) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney David A. Harris added to party GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC(pty:dft) by GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC.(Harris, David) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Dean Anderson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard J. Burch on behalf of Dean Anderson. Attorney Richard J. Burch added to party Dean Anderson(pty:pla) (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Anderson. (Itkin, Lindsay) answer due May 5, 2015. (wg). (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC., GES Gladiator Energy Services Texas, LLC (wg) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dean Anderson. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dean Anderson. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC. (wg) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLADIATOR ENERGY SERVICES, LLC amending, filed by Dean Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent form)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Dean Anderson. Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Dean Anderson(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsay R. Itkin on behalf of Dean Anderson. Attorney Lindsay R. Itkin added to party Dean Anderson(pty:pla) (Itkin, Lindsay) (Entered: 03/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dean Anderson. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7292265), filed by Dean Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Consent form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.