This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2016 at 05:14:21 (UTC).

AmTrust North America, Inc. et al v. Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2014 AmTrust North America, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Colleen McMahon and Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-09494

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Colleen McMahon

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge James L. Cott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Technology Insurance Company, Inc.

AmTrust North America, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

David E. Pike

Preferred Global Holdings, Inc.

Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc.

Salmen Insurance Services, Inc.

Carl M Savoia

John Doe Corporations 1-5

The Taft Companies, LLC

John Does 1-5

David E. Pike, Inc.

Philip Salvagio

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

AmTrust North America, Inc.

Defendants, Counter Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc.

Salmen Insurance Services, Inc.

David E. Pike, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendants

Preferred Reinsurance Intermediaries

John Doe Brokers 1-5

John Doe Brokerages 1-5

Network Adjusters, Inc.

Robert Sanders

John Does 6-15

John Doe Corporations 6-15

Builders & Tradesmen's Insurance Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Defendant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael D. Brown

Attorney at Orenstein & Brown, LLP

1305 Franlin Avenue, Suite 300

New York, NY 11530

Matthew Bryant

Attorney at Ohrenstein & Brown LLP

1305 Franklin Avenue Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

Lisa Ann Marcoccia

Attorney at The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

225 Park Avenue South

New York, NY 10003

Gerard Craig Morici

Attorney at Mendes & Mount, LLP (NYC)

750 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Daniel Walter Gerber

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP (Buffalo)

665 Main Street, Suite 400

Buffalo, NY 14203

Dove Ann Elise Burns

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP (NY)

600 Lexington Avenue, Suite 900

New York, NY 10022

Michael Francis Lettiero

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

100 Pearl Street

Hartford, CT 00000

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Steven A. Stadtmauer

Attorney at Harris Beach, PLLC (NYC)

100 Wall Street, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10005

Abbie Lynn Eliasberg Fuchs

Attorney at Harris Beach, PLLC (NYC)

100 Wall Street, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10005

Brian Andrew Bender

Attorney at Harris Beach, PLLC (NYC)

100 Wall Street, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10005

Peri Avishai Berger

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP (NYC)

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jom) (jom). (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against David E. Pike, Inc., John Does 1-5, John Doe Corporations 1-5, David E. Pike, Preferred Global Holdings, Inc., Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc., Salmen Insurance Services, Inc., Philip Salvagio, The Taft Companies, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401111077)Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(jom) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2014: # 1 Exhibit) (jom). (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/15/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Ann Marcoccia on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Marcoccia, Lisa) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. David E. Pike served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. Service was accepted by Mirabel Robles, Secretary. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. David E. Pike, Inc. served on 12/5/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. Service was accepted by Chris Alizaga, Process Specialist. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc. served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. Service was accepted by Timothy S. Dobrenen, Esq, General Counsel. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The Taft Companies, LLC served on 12/8/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. Service was accepted by Mary Claire Goff, Authorized Agent. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

#194

(#194) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Brian A. Bender dated 03/11/2016 re: 193 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and in Reply to Defendants' March 2, 2016 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Michael D. Brown dated March 8, 2016. . Document filed by David E. Pike, Inc., David E. Pike, Preferred Global Holdings, Inc., Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc., Salmen Insurance Services, Inc., Philip Salvagio, Carl M Savoia, The Taft Companies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bender, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

#196

(#196) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Michael D. Brown dated March 15, 2016 re: Opposition to Defendants' Letter Motion dated March 11, 2016. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#198

(#198) ORDER withdrawing 136 Motion to Strike; terminating 136 Motion to Preclude; terminating 136 Motion for Default Judgment; terminating 193 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; terminating 195 Letter Motion to Compel. The Court held a conference yesterday at which it resolved the outstanding discovery disputes raised by the parties in their recent letters to the Court. (Dkt. Nos. 186, 189, 193, 194, 195, 196, 197). The parties are directed to the transcript of that proceeding for the Court's rulings. As to Plaintiffs' motion to strike dated September 17, 2015 (Dkt. No. 136), the Court clarified the status of that motion with the parties at the conference, and the parties informed the Court that the motion has been withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to close docket entries 136, 193, and 195. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/18/2016) (mro) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

#199

(#199) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and request a forty-five (45) day extension of the current discovery deadlines addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Michael D. Brown dated March 23, 2016. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

#200

(#200) ORDER granting 199 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/24/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

#201

(#201) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Argument held on 3/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2016.(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#202

(#202) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Argument proceeding held on 3/17/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

220 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#202) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Argument proceeding held on 3/17/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#201) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Argument held on 3/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2016.(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#200) ORDER granting 199 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/24/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 03/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#199) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and request a forty-five (45) day extension of the current discovery deadlines addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Michael D. Brown dated March 23, 2016. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#198) ORDER withdrawing 136 Motion to Strike; terminating 136 Motion to Preclude; terminating 136 Motion for Default Judgment; terminating 193 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; terminating 195 Letter Motion to Compel. The Court held a conference yesterday at which it resolved the outstanding discovery disputes raised by the parties in their recent letters to the Court. (Dkt. Nos. 186, 189, 193, 194, 195, 196, 197). The parties are directed to the transcript of that proceeding for the Court's rulings. As to Plaintiffs' motion to strike dated September 17, 2015 (Dkt. No. 136), the Court clarified the status of that motion with the parties at the conference, and the parties informed the Court that the motion has been withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to close docket entries 136, 193, and 195. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/18/2016) (mro) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#197) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Dove Burns dated March 15, 2016 re: Opposition to Defendants' Letter Motion Dated March 11, 2016 (Doc. 195). Document filed by Network Adjusters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Lettiero, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#196) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Michael D. Brown dated March 15, 2016 re: Opposition to Defendants' Letter Motion dated March 11, 2016. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#195) LETTER MOTION to Compel Network Adjusters, Inc. to produce addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Brian A. Bender dated 03/11/2016. Document filed by David E. Pike, Inc., David E. Pike, Preferred Global Holdings, Inc., Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc., Salmen Insurance Services, Inc., Philip Salvagio, Carl M Savoia, The Taft Companies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Network Adjuster Subpoenas Combined, # 2 Exhibit B - Confidential Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit C - Confidential Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit D - Confidential Exhibit)(Bender, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Brian A. Bender dated 03/11/2016 re: 193 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and in Reply to Defendants' March 2, 2016 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Michael D. Brown dated March 8, 2016. . Document filed by David E. Pike, Inc., David E. Pike, Preferred Global Holdings, Inc., Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc., Salmen Insurance Services, Inc., Philip Salvagio, Carl M Savoia, The Taft Companies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bender, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#193) LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and in Reply to Defendants' March 2, 2016 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Michael D. Brown dated March 8, 2016. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SubLimit subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Pac Re Prop Management Subpoena, # 3 Exhibit San Diego Sockers Subpoena, # 4 Exhibit Sub Limit Objection Letter, # 5 Exhibit Pac Re Prop Management Objection Letter, # 6 Exhibit San Diego Sockers Objection Letter, # 7 Exhibit Pref Global First Supp Reponses, # 8 Exhibit Salvagio Exhibit 61A, # 9 Exhibit Hancock Spreadsheet, # 10 Exhibit Special Counsel Statement of Work)(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Preferred Global Holdings, Inc. served on 12/8/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. Service was accepted by John Jones, Authorized Agent. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The Taft Companies, LLC served on 12/8/2014, answer due 12/29/2014. Service was accepted by Mary Claire Goff, Authorized Agent. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc. served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. Service was accepted by Timothy S. Dobrenen, Esq, General Counsel. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. David E. Pike, Inc. served on 12/5/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. Service was accepted by Chris Alizaga, Process Specialist. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. David E. Pike served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. Service was accepted by Mirabel Robles, Secretary. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc.; Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Ann Marcoccia on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Marcoccia, Lisa) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/15/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(Bryant, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against David E. Pike, Inc., John Does 1-5, John Doe Corporations 1-5, David E. Pike, Preferred Global Holdings, Inc., Safebuilt Insurance Services, Inc., Salmen Insurance Services, Inc., Philip Salvagio, The Taft Companies, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401111077)Document filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Technology Insurance Company, Inc..(jom) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2014: # 1 Exhibit) (jom). (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jom) (jom). (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Builders & Tradesmen's Insurance Services is a litigant

Latest cases where NETWORK ADJUSTERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAFT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFEBUILT INSURANCE SERVICES AKA is a litigant