This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2018 at 23:20:30 (UTC).

American Vehicular Sciences LLC v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2015 American Vehicular Sciences LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Toyota Motor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Gandhi and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-01391

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jay C. Gandhi

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Vehicular Sciences LLC

Defendants

Autoliv ASP, Inc.

Toyoda Gosei North America Corp.

TK Holdings Inc.

Takata Corporation

Toyota Motor Corporation

Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd.

Autoliv, Inc.

Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amir H Alavi

Attorney at Ahmad Zvitsanos Anaipakos Alavi and Mensing PC

1221 Mckenney Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Brian E Simmons

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi and Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Douglas Quinton Hahn

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson and Rauth PC

660 Newport Center Drive Suite 1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Alisa A Lipski

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi and Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Jared Veliz

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson and Rauth PC

660 Newport Center Drive Suite 1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6422

Salil Bali

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth

660 Newport Center Drive Suite 1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Demetrios Anaipakos

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi and Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Kyril V Talanov

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi and Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorneys

David M Stein

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Kevin R Nowicki

Attorney at Gordee Nowicki and Blakeney LLP

8105 Irvine Center Drive Suite 870

Irvine, CA 92618

Hans Linden Mayer

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

John B Sganga, Jr

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Irfan A Lateef

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Brian Christopher Claassen

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Thomas R Makin

Attorney at Kenyon and Kenyon LLP

One Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Patrick R Colsher

Attorney at Kenyon and Kenyon LLP

One Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Mark A Chapman

Attorney at Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP

One Broadway

New York, NY 10004

John Flock

Attorney at Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP

One Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Matthew G Berkowitz

Attorney at Kenyon and Kenyon LLP

One Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Theodore W Chandler

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013-3000

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC, identifying Acacia Research Group; Acacia Research Corporation; Automotive Technologies International, Inc.. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Demetrios Anaipakos for Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#70

(#70) ORDER Granting Motion to Transfer #56 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motions to transfer this case to the EasternDistrict of Michigan are GRANTED. Five pending motions remain. Nihon filedmotions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction in both the 1390 Case and the 1392 Case. (1390 Case Dkt. 40; 1392 Case Dkt. 45.) Neaton did likewise. (1390 Case Dkt.38; 1392 Case Dkt. 49.) Key Safety Systems also filed a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, in the 1389 Case. (1389 Case Dkt. 47.) Due the Courts granting of the transfer motions, those other five pending motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See document for further information. (lwag) (Entered: 04/27/2016)

56 #8

Declaration of Russell Gans in Support of Defendants Motion to Transfer

56 #5

Declaration of Steven Roberts in Support of Defendants Joint Motion for Transfer

56 #14

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Based on Earlier Lit

56 #13

Exhibit Part 4 of 4 to the Declaration of David M. Stein

#56

(#68) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #56 filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Breed, #2 Declaration of Brian Simmons, #3 Exhibit A to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #4 Exhibit B to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #5 Exhibit C to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #6 Exhibit D to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #7 Declaration of Kyril Talanov, #8 Exhibit A to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #9 Exhibit B to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #10 Exhibit C-1 of Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #11 Exhibit C-2 to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #12 Exhibit D to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #13 Exhibit E to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #14 Exhibit F to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #15 Exhibit G to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #16 Exhibit H to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #17 Exhibit I to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #18 Proposed Order)(Bali, Salil) (Entered: 04/12/2016)

56 #4

Declaration of Ryan Brueckner in Support of Motion to Transfer

56 #6

Declaration of Matthew Hutchins in Support of Defendants Motion to Transfer Venu

56 #2

Declaration of Kurt Shanks in Support of Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ORDER Granting Motion to Transfer #56 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motions to transfer this case to the EasternDistrict of Michigan are GRANTED. Five pending motions remain. Nihon filedmotions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction in both the 1390 Case and the 1392 Case. (1390 Case Dkt. 40; 1392 Case Dkt. 45.) Neaton did likewise. (1390 Case Dkt.38; 1392 Case Dkt. 49.) Key Safety Systems also filed a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, in the 1389 Case. (1389 Case Dkt. 47.) Due the Courts granting of the transfer motions, those other five pending motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See document for further information. (lwag) (Entered: 04/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #56 filed by Defendants Autoliv ASP, Inc., TK Holdings Inc., Takata Corporation, Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd., Toyoda Gosei North America Corp., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Stein in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 7-13 to the Declaration of David M. Stein in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer)(Stein, David) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #56 filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Breed, #2 Declaration of Brian Simmons, #3 Exhibit A to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #4 Exhibit B to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #5 Exhibit C to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #6 Exhibit D to Decl. of Brian Simmons, #7 Declaration of Kyril Talanov, #8 Exhibit A to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #9 Exhibit B to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #10 Exhibit C-1 of Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #11 Exhibit C-2 to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #12 Exhibit D to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #13 Exhibit E to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #14 Exhibit F to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #15 Exhibit G to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #16 Exhibit H to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #17 Exhibit I to Decl. of Kyril Talanov, #18 Proposed Order)(Bali, Salil) (Entered: 04/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file its Responses in Opposition filed by plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Simmons, #2 Affidavit of Jennifer Crummett-Smith, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Jennifer Crummett-Smith, #4 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Jennifer Crummett-Smith, #5 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Jennifer Crummett-Smith, #6 Proposed Order) (Bali, Salil) (Entered: 04/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Salil Bali on behalf of Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC (Attorney Salil Bali added to party American Vehicular Sciences LLC(pty:pla))(Bali, Salil) (Entered: 04/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (mku) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 8/24/2017. Motions due by 10/23/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/19/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2017 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2017 at 8:30 a.m. (mku) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC.. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 03/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER on Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing #61 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Good cause being shown, the Hearing on Defendants Motion To Transfer Based On Earlier Litigation And The Convenience Factors (Dkt. 56), to be held before Hon. Cormac J. Carney, is continued from April 4, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. to May 2, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Opposition papers are due April 11, 2016 and reply papers are due April 18, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark A. Chapman on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc., designating Theodore W. Chandler as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Amir Alavi for Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Demetrios Anaipakos for Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. (lwag) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC, identifying Acacia Research Group; Acacia Research Corporation; Automotive Technologies International, Inc.. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16370838 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff American Vehicular Sciences LLC. (Attorney Douglas Quinton Hahn added to party American Vehicular Sciences LLC(pty:pla))(Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.