This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 13:17:54 (UTC).

Amaya et al v. Bregman et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Amaya filed an Other lawsuit against Bregman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge William P. Johnson and Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00599

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge William P. Johnson

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crystal Amaya

Brad Cates

Brian Moore

Kim Ronquillo

Defendants

Michael Corwin

Jamie Estrada

Sam Bregman

Jason Loera

Bruce Wetherbee

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Anissa Galassini-Ford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angelo J Artuso

Po Box 51763

Albuquerque, NM 87181

Mark E. Braden

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Theodore J. Kobus, III

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10111

Eric A. Packel

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

Marc David Flink

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Patrick Joseph Rogers

Attorney at Patrick J. Rogers, LLC

20 First Plaza, Ste. 725

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Brendan K. Egan

Attorney at The Rothstein Law Firm

500 4Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Carolyn M. Nichols

Attorney at Rothstein, Donatelli LLP

500 4Th St. Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Kristina Martinez

Attorney at Coberly and Martinez LLC

1322 Pase De Peralta

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Matthew L. Garcia

Attorney at Garcia Ives Nowara LLC

924 Second Street Nw, Suite A

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara

Attorney at GARCIA IVES NOWARA

924 Second Street Nw, Suite A

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Zachary A Ives

Attorney at GARCIA IVES NOWARA

924 Second Street Nw, Suite A

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Taylor Lueras

Attorney at Dixon, Scholl & Bailey, P.A.

Po Box 94147

Albuquerque, NM 87199-4147

Steven S. Scholl

Attorney at Dixon Scholl & Bailey PA

Po Box 94147

Albuquerque, NM 87199

James C. Wilkey

Attorney at Dixon, Scholl & Bailey PA

6700 Jefferson St. Ne, Bldg. B, #1

Albuquerque, NM 87109-4381

Jerry Todd Wertheim

Attorney at Jones, Snead, Wertheim & Wentworth PA

Po Box 2228

Santa Fe, NM 87504-2228

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Violations of the Federal Wiretap Act, the Stored Communications Act and Conspiracy against Sam Bregman, Michael Corwin, Jamie Estrada, Anissa Galassini-Ford, Jason Loera ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Brian Moore, Brad Cates, Crystal Amaya, Kim Ronquillo.(Artuso, Angelo) Modified docket text on 6/30/2014 (ln). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#2

(#2) Appendix/Supplement filed by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo re 1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Artuso, Angelo) Modified on 6/27/2014 (iad). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo and Certificate of Good Standing for Mark Braden, Theodore J. Kobus, III and Eric A. Packel (Artuso, Angelo) Modified text on 7/1/2014 (mr). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#4

(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#5

(#5) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB026465 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)

#6

(#6) Association Dues: $ 300 paid, receipt number # ALB026466 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)

#8

(#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#9

(#9) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo by Angelo J Artuso on behalf of: Mark E. Braden Baker & Hostetler LLP Washington Square, Suite 1100, Connecticut Ave. NWWashington, DC 20036-5304 202-861-1504 Fax 202-861-1783 MBraden@bakerlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Artuso, Angelo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#10

(#10) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo by Angelo J Artuso on behalf of: Theodore J. Kobus, III Baker & Hostetler LLP 45 Rockefeller Plaza 14th FloorNew York, NY 10111 212-589-4200 Fax 212-589-4201 tkobus@bakerlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Artuso, Angelo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#201

(#201) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 195 Plaintiffs Amaya, Cates, and Moore's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Corwin's First Set of Discovery until November 27, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#200

(#200) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 194 Plaintiffs Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Wetherbee's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to November 20, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#199

(#199) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 193 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Corwin's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to November 20, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#198

(#198) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 192 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Estrada's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to November 20, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#197

(#197) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 190 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Bregman's First Set of Discovery until November 11, 2015. (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#196

(#196) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 189 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Bregman's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to October 30, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#195

(#195) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Answers, Objections, and Responses to Defendant Michael Corwin's First Sets of Discovery Propounded to Plaintiffs by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#194

(#194) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Address Defendant Bruce Wetherbee's Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production, and First Set of Requests for Admissions by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#193

(#193) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Address Defendant Michael Corwin's Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production, First Set of Requests for Admissions, and First Request for Inspection by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#201) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 195 Plaintiffs Amaya, Cates, and Moore's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Corwin's First Set of Discovery until November 27, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#200) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 194 Plaintiffs Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Wetherbee's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to November 20, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#199) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 193 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Corwin's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to November 20, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#198) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 192 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Estrada's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to November 20, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#197) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 190 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Bregman's First Set of Discovery until November 11, 2015. (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#196) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 189 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Proceed under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 26.6 and 37.1 with respect to Defendant Bregman's objections to Plaintiffs' first set of discovery. Such deadline is extended to October 30, 2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (gc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#195) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Answers, Objections, and Responses to Defendant Michael Corwin's First Sets of Discovery Propounded to Plaintiffs by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Address Defendant Bruce Wetherbee's Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production, and First Set of Requests for Admissions by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#193) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Address Defendant Michael Corwin's Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production, First Set of Requests for Admissions, and First Request for Inspection by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#192) Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Address Defendant Jamie Estrada's Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production, and First Set of Requests for Admissions by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flink, Marc) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo by Angelo J Artuso on behalf of: Eric A. Packel Baker & Hostetler LLP Circa Centre, 12th Floor, 2929 Arch StreetPhiladelphia, PA 19104-2891 215-564-3031 Fax 215-566-3439 epackel@bakerlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Artuso, Angelo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo by Angelo J Artuso on behalf of: Theodore J. Kobus, III Baker & Hostetler LLP 45 Rockefeller Plaza 14th FloorNew York, NY 10111 212-589-4200 Fax 212-589-4201 tkobus@bakerlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Artuso, Angelo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo by Angelo J Artuso on behalf of: Mark E. Braden Baker & Hostetler LLP Washington Square, Suite 1100, Connecticut Ave. NWWashington, DC 20036-5304 202-861-1504 Fax 202-861-1783 MBraden@bakerlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Artuso, Angelo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Association Dues: $ 300 paid, receipt number # ALB026466 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB026465 (mmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iad) (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo and Certificate of Good Standing for Mark Braden, Theodore J. Kobus, III and Eric A. Packel (Artuso, Angelo) Modified text on 7/1/2014 (mr). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Appendix/Supplement filed by Crystal Amaya, Brad Cates, Brian Moore, Kim Ronquillo re 1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Artuso, Angelo) Modified on 6/27/2014 (iad). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Violations of the Federal Wiretap Act, the Stored Communications Act and Conspiracy against Sam Bregman, Michael Corwin, Jamie Estrada, Anissa Galassini-Ford, Jason Loera ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Brian Moore, Brad Cates, Crystal Amaya, Kim Ronquillo.(Artuso, Angelo) Modified docket text on 6/30/2014 (ln). (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.