This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2016 at 19:32:31 (UTC).

Alverson et al v. Community Health Systems Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2014 Alverson filed an Other lawsuit against Community Health Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01620

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cynthia K Horgan

Joel Lovelace

Joshua Capps

Richard Dale Floyd

Janet F Bearden

Stephen Ziegler

Steve Percox

Martin J Griffin

Robert Cadle

Dallas W Richard

Lanny C Reeves

Christopher L Brown

Bobbie Jean Richard

Kristopher J Byrum

Denise B Alverson

Defendants

Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice LLC

Foley Hospital Corporation

Anniston HMA LLC

Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation

Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald W Stewart

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART PC

1000 Quintard Avenue, Sutie 500, P O Box 2274

Anniston, AL 36202

Greg William Foster

Attorney at FOSTER LAW FIRM PC

300 Vestavia Parkway Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35216-3788

Joshua Patrick Hayes

Attorney at Prince, Glover & Hayes P.C.

Po Box 20149

Tuscaloosa, AL 35402

Robert F Prince

Attorney at Prince, Glover and Hayes, P.C.

P O Box 20149

Tuscaloosa, AL 35402

T Dylan Reeves

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD

2100 Southbridge Pkwy, Ste. 650

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy Lloyd Carlson

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203-2696

Richard E Smith

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

505 20Th Street North, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203-2696

Jonathan W Macklem

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203-2696

J Paul Zimmerman

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203

Theodore Joseph Kobus, III

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Daniel Rubin Warren

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

3200 Pnc Center, 1900 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Paul Gregory Karlsgodt

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

David Alan Carney

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

3200 Pnc Center, 1900 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jimmy Dale Parrish

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

P.O. Box 112 (32802-0112), 200 South Orange Avenue, Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Other Attorneys

Jacob M Tubbs

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jackson R Sharman, III

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Wynn M Shuford

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Anniston HMA LLC, Community Health Systems Inc, Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC, Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC, filed by Bobbie Jean Richard, Janet F Bearden, Denise B Alverson, Dallas W Richard, Robert Cadle.(SAC ) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE regarding consent of a civil action to a magistrate judge. (SAC ) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Robert Cadle, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard. (Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants; sent to Defendants via certified mail. (SAC ) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Anniston HMA LLC served on 9/2/2014; Foley Hospital Corporation served on 9/2/2014; Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC served on 9/2/2014; Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC served on 9/2/2014. (SAC ) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation served on 9/2/2014. (SAC ) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Community Health Systems Inc served on 9/2/2014. (SAC ) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT as a matter of course against All Defendants, filed by Bobbie Jean Richard, Janet F Bearden, Denise B Alverson, Dallas W Richard, Robert Cadle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reeves, T) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#9

(#9) (Corrected) AMENDED COMPLAINT as a matter of course against All Defendants, filed by Bobbie Jean Richard, Janet F Bearden, Denise B Alverson, Dallas W Richard, Robert Cadle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reeves, T) Modified on 9/18/2014 (SAC, ). (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#65

(#65) ORDER finding as moot 54 "Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Party Plaintiffs," upon express agreement of the Plaintiffs, as communicated by counsel for the Plaintiffs in MDL 2595 (15-CV-222), including counsel representing the Plaintiffs in Alverson v. Community Health Systems, Inc., 14-CV-1620. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8-7-15. (AMW, ) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#64

(#64) TEXT ORDER: The court construes the Notice of Withdrawal of Jeremy Lloyd Carlson as Counsel for Community Health Systems, Inc., Gadsden Regional Medical Center, Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Anniston HMA, LLC, Affinity Hospital, LLC, and Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice, LLC (doc. 63) as a motion to withdraw and GRANTS the motion. Attorney Jeremy Lloyd Carlson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/3/15. (MMW) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

#63

(#63) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Affinity Hospital LLC, Anniston HMA LLC, Community Health Systems Inc, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC, Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice LLC, Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC. (Carlson, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#62

(#62) ORDER-re: Motion for More Definite Statement 40 ; Motion to Dismiss 41 ; Motion for a More Definite Statement under Rule 12(e) and to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) 42 ; Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement 44 ; and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Party Plaintiffs 54 . The court FINDS the Dfts' motions 40 , 41 , 42 & 44 to be MOOT. The court DEFERS ruling at this time on the Pltfs' motion to amend 54 , pending a determination regarding an appropriate procedural mechanism for inclusion of Plaintiffs named in the Consolidated Class Action Complaint but not named in any underlying cases consolidated in the MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/15/2015. (AVC) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#61

(#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Patrick Hayes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hayes, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#60

(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Prince on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#59

(#59) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE This matter is SET for a status conference on Tuesday, April 14, 2015, at 1:30 P.M., in Courtroom 5A at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse; Joint Preliminary Report due on or before Tuesday, March 31, 2015; Attorneys interested in serving as Lead, Liaison, or Coordinating Counsel or on a committee of counsel to assist in coordination and management of the litigation, including temporary Lead, Liaison, or Coordinating Counsel, SHALL also submit to the undersigned via email on or before Tuesday, March 31, 2015 a request for appointment; Pending status conference set for 4/14/15, deadlines as set out within are STAYED; see within for further direction and deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/13/15. (SAC) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#58

(#58) REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Christopher L Brown, Kristopher J Byrum, Robert Cadle, Joshua Capps, Richard Dale Floyd, Lynda Granthan, Martin J Griffin, Cynthia K Horgan, Crystal Johnson, Hixie Lewis, Joel Lovelace, Johannes A Nhete, Steve Percox, Lanny C Reeves, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard, Patricia Saye, Sarah Truman, Stephen Ziegler re: 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Amended Complaint filed by Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Christopher L Brown, Kristopher J Byrum, Robert Cadle, Joshua Capps, Richard Dale Floyd, Lynda Granthan, Martin J Griffin, Cynthia K Horgan, Crystal Johnson, Hixie Lewis, Joel Lovelace, Johannes A Nhete, Steve Percox, Lanny C Reeves, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard, Patricia Saye, Sarah Truman, Stephen Ziegler. (Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#57

(#57) JOINDER in re 56 filed by Affinity Hospital LLC, Anniston HMA LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC, Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice LLC, Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC. (Smith, Richard) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER finding as moot 54 "Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Party Plaintiffs," upon express agreement of the Plaintiffs, as communicated by counsel for the Plaintiffs in MDL 2595 (15-CV-222), including counsel representing the Plaintiffs in Alverson v. Community Health Systems, Inc., 14-CV-1620. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8-7-15. (AMW, ) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) TEXT ORDER: The court construes the Notice of Withdrawal of Jeremy Lloyd Carlson as Counsel for Community Health Systems, Inc., Gadsden Regional Medical Center, Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Anniston HMA, LLC, Affinity Hospital, LLC, and Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice, LLC (doc. 63) as a motion to withdraw and GRANTS the motion. Attorney Jeremy Lloyd Carlson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/3/15. (MMW) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Affinity Hospital LLC, Anniston HMA LLC, Community Health Systems Inc, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC, Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice LLC, Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC. (Carlson, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER-re: Motion for More Definite Statement 40 ; Motion to Dismiss 41 ; Motion for a More Definite Statement under Rule 12(e) and to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) 42 ; Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement 44 ; and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Party Plaintiffs 54 . The court FINDS the Dfts' motions 40 , 41 , 42 & 44 to be MOOT. The court DEFERS ruling at this time on the Pltfs' motion to amend 54 , pending a determination regarding an appropriate procedural mechanism for inclusion of Plaintiffs named in the Consolidated Class Action Complaint but not named in any underlying cases consolidated in the MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/15/2015. (AVC) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Patrick Hayes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hayes, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Prince on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE This matter is SET for a status conference on Tuesday, April 14, 2015, at 1:30 P.M., in Courtroom 5A at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse; Joint Preliminary Report due on or before Tuesday, March 31, 2015; Attorneys interested in serving as Lead, Liaison, or Coordinating Counsel or on a committee of counsel to assist in coordination and management of the litigation, including temporary Lead, Liaison, or Coordinating Counsel, SHALL also submit to the undersigned via email on or before Tuesday, March 31, 2015 a request for appointment; Pending status conference set for 4/14/15, deadlines as set out within are STAYED; see within for further direction and deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/13/15. (SAC) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Christopher L Brown, Kristopher J Byrum, Robert Cadle, Joshua Capps, Richard Dale Floyd, Lynda Granthan, Martin J Griffin, Cynthia K Horgan, Crystal Johnson, Hixie Lewis, Joel Lovelace, Johannes A Nhete, Steve Percox, Lanny C Reeves, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard, Patricia Saye, Sarah Truman, Stephen Ziegler re: 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Amended Complaint filed by Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Christopher L Brown, Kristopher J Byrum, Robert Cadle, Joshua Capps, Richard Dale Floyd, Lynda Granthan, Martin J Griffin, Cynthia K Horgan, Crystal Johnson, Hixie Lewis, Joel Lovelace, Johannes A Nhete, Steve Percox, Lanny C Reeves, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard, Patricia Saye, Sarah Truman, Stephen Ziegler. (Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) JOINDER in re 56 filed by Affinity Hospital LLC, Anniston HMA LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC, Gadsden Regional Physician Group Practice LLC, Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC. (Smith, Richard) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Amended Complaint filed by Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation. (Warren, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Kristopher J Byrum, Robert Cadle, Joshua Capps, Richard Dale Floyd, Lynda Granthan, Martin J Griffin, Cynthia K Horgan, Crystal Johnson, Joel Lovelace, Johannes A Nhete, Steve Percox, Lanny C Reeves, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard, Patricia Saye, Sarah Truman, Stephen Ziegler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint)(Reeves, T) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (Corrected) AMENDED COMPLAINT as a matter of course against All Defendants, filed by Bobbie Jean Richard, Janet F Bearden, Denise B Alverson, Dallas W Richard, Robert Cadle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reeves, T) Modified on 9/18/2014 (SAC, ). (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT as a matter of course against All Defendants, filed by Bobbie Jean Richard, Janet F Bearden, Denise B Alverson, Dallas W Richard, Robert Cadle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reeves, T) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Community Health Systems Inc served on 9/2/2014. (SAC ) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation served on 9/2/2014. (SAC ) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Anniston HMA LLC served on 9/2/2014; Foley Hospital Corporation served on 9/2/2014; Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC served on 9/2/2014; Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC served on 9/2/2014. (SAC ) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants; sent to Defendants via certified mail. (SAC ) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Denise B Alverson, Janet F Bearden, Robert Cadle, Bobbie Jean Richard, Dallas W Richard. (Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE regarding consent of a civil action to a magistrate judge. (SAC ) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Anniston HMA LLC, Community Health Systems Inc, Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center LLC, Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC, filed by Bobbie Jean Richard, Janet F Bearden, Denise B Alverson, Dallas W Richard, Robert Cadle.(SAC ) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.