This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 08:35:45 (UTC).

Altair Instruments, Inc. et al v. Silkn USA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 Altair Instruments, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Silkn USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-08125

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge S. James Otero

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Altair Instruments, Inc.

Defendants

Kohl s Corporation

Camelot Venture Group, LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Nordstrom, Inc

Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc

Home Skinovations, Ltd

Silkn USA LLC

Ebay, Inc.

Ulta Salon, Cosmetics and Fragrance, Inc.

Macys.com, Inc.

The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc.

Target Corporation

Home Skinovations, Inc.

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald P Oines

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Kathryn Diane Zajec Domin

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Benjamin C Deming

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin J Fox

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Ryan James Malloy

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Hubert T Lee

Attorney at Morris Polich and Purdy LLP

1055 West Seventh Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Wendy J Ray

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16625339 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Altair Instruments, Inc.(pty:pla))(Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc., identifying Silkn USA LLC, Home Skinovations LTD, Home Skinovations Inc, Amazon.com, Inc., Target Corporation, Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Ebay, Inc., The Bon-Ton Stores Inc., Nordstrom Inc., Camelot Venture Group, LLC, Macys.com, Inc., Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#82

(#82) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

#81

(#81) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: During the Scheduling Conference to be held on Monday, March 21, 2016, the Court wishes tohave the parties provide a technology tutorial and overview of likely contested and potentially dispositive issues. Each side will have 20 minutes each to present their tutorials. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#80

(#80) ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY 28 DAYS 78 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court continues the Scheduling Conference currently set for February 22, 2016, to March 21, 2016 @ 8:30 a.m. (vv) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#79

(#79) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Settlement, 78 the proposed order was efiled within the Notice of settlement and request to continue scheduling conference as 1 pdf.. The following error(s) was found: Proposed order should have been submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#78

(#78) NOTICE of Settlement (Conditional) and Joint Request to Continue Scheduling Conference by 30 Days or, in the Alternative, to Limit Discussion at Conference to the Progress of Settlement filed by Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc, Home Skinovations, Inc., Kohl s Corporation, Macys.com, Inc., Silkn USA LLC, The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc., Ulta Salon, Cosmetics and Fragrance, Inc.. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#77

(#77) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), 76 . pdf is a combined notice of conditional settlement with request to continue scheduling conference. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of settlement; or Request: order... to which the Missing proposed order should have been submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#76

(#76) NOTICE Notice of Conditional Settlement and Joint Request to Continue Scheduling Conference by 30 Days or, in the Alternative, to Limit Discussion at Conference to the Progress of Settlement filed by Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc, Home Skinovations, Inc., Kohl s Corporation, Macys.com, Inc., Silkn USA LLC, The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc., Ulta Salon, Cosmetics and Fragrance, Inc.. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#75

(#75) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. and Proof of Service to all Parties (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#74

(#74) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Home Skinovations, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Malloy, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: During the Scheduling Conference to be held on Monday, March 21, 2016, the Court wishes tohave the parties provide a technology tutorial and overview of likely contested and potentially dispositive issues. Each side will have 20 minutes each to present their tutorials. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY 28 DAYS 78 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court continues the Scheduling Conference currently set for February 22, 2016, to March 21, 2016 @ 8:30 a.m. (vv) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Settlement, 78 the proposed order was efiled within the Notice of settlement and request to continue scheduling conference as 1 pdf.. The following error(s) was found: Proposed order should have been submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) NOTICE of Settlement (Conditional) and Joint Request to Continue Scheduling Conference by 30 Days or, in the Alternative, to Limit Discussion at Conference to the Progress of Settlement filed by Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc, Home Skinovations, Inc., Kohl s Corporation, Macys.com, Inc., Silkn USA LLC, The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc., Ulta Salon, Cosmetics and Fragrance, Inc.. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), 76 . pdf is a combined notice of conditional settlement with request to continue scheduling conference. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of settlement; or Request: order... to which the Missing proposed order should have been submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) NOTICE Notice of Conditional Settlement and Joint Request to Continue Scheduling Conference by 30 Days or, in the Alternative, to Limit Discussion at Conference to the Progress of Settlement filed by Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc, Home Skinovations, Inc., Kohl s Corporation, Macys.com, Inc., Silkn USA LLC, The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc., Ulta Salon, Cosmetics and Fragrance, Inc.. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. and Proof of Service to all Parties (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Home Skinovations, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Malloy, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Malloy, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc., identifying Silkn USA LLC, Home Skinovations LTD, Home Skinovations Inc, Amazon.com, Inc., Target Corporation, Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance Inc., Kohl's Corporation, Ebay, Inc., The Bon-Ton Stores Inc., Nordstrom Inc., Camelot Venture Group, LLC, Macys.com, Inc., Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16625339 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Altair Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Altair Instruments, Inc.(pty:pla))(Oines, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less