This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:00:35 (UTC).

AlphaCap Ventures LLC v. Gust, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2015 AlphaCap Ventures LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Gust, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiff

AlphaCap Ventures, LLC

Counter Defendant

AlphaCap Ventures LLC

Counter Claimants

Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust

Gust, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Scott Woloson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd M Kennedy

Robert Christopher Bunt

Marie Ann McCrary

Seth A Safier

Charles Ainsworth

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Frank A Bruno

Elizabeth L DeRieux

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#69

#70

#71

#72

#73

#74

#75

#76

#77

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE by Gust, Inc. Regarding Argument at Motion to Transfer (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Court)(Bruno, Frank) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 02/26/16 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2016. (bhs, ) (Entered: 02/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2016 re 20 MOTION to Change Venue (Gust's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 or in the Alternative Under 1406) filed by Gust, Inc., and 52 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses from AlphaCap filed by Gust, Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Gust, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Joint Claim Construction Chart by AlphaCap Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kennedy, Todd) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/19/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/19/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) REPLY to 64 Claim Construction Brief filed by AlphaCap Ventures LLC. (Kennedy, Todd) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION for Protective Order by AlphaCap Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Gust's Response to 64 Claim Construction Brief filed by Gust, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bruno, Frank) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AlphaCap Ventures LLC. Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust served on 2/3/2015, answer due 2/24/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Kennedy on behalf of AlphaCap Ventures LLC (Kennedy, Todd) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Safier on behalf of AlphaCap Ventures LLC (Safier, Seth) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marie Ann McCrary on behalf of AlphaCap Ventures LLC (McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of AlphaCap Ventures LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AlphaCap Ventures LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Angelsoft LLC d/b/a Gust ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5025186.), filed by AlphaCap Ventures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '976 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '208 Patent, # 4 Exhibit C - '630 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less